Original Case: 2:23-cv-01390

Sixth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cv-03230
Typecivil / private / civil rights - title vii
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Case Filed:Mar 19, 2024
Terminated:Oct 25, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 29, 2024 3:23 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
THE OHIO STATE UNIVERSITY
Represented By
Drew C. Piersall
Zashin & Rich
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
THE OHIO STATE UNIVERSITY WEXNER MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By
Katie Rose Talley
Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Thomas Elliot Gaiser
Office of the Attorney General
contact info
Drew C. Piersall
Zashin & Rich
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
STEPHANIE SOLIS
Represented By
Ellen Maglicic Kramer
Cohen, Rosenthal & Kramer
contact info

GPO Oct 25 2024
UNPUBLISHED OPINION and JUDGMENT filed : AFFIRMED. Mandate to issue. Decision not for publication. Richard Allen Griffin, Raymond M. Kethledge, and John K. Bush (AUTHORING), Circuit Judges.

Docket last updated: 10/29/2024 3:23 AM CDT
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
The case manager for this case is: Beverly Harris (BLH)
Related: [-]
3 pgs Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Stephanie Solis. Transcript needed: n. (BLH)
Related: [-]
6 pgs BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 04/29/2024; appellee brief due 05/28/2024. (BLH)
Related: [-]
1 pgs APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Stephanie Solis by Ellen M. Kramer. Certificate of Service: 03/19/2024. 24-3230 (EMK)
Related: [-]
2 pgs CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Ellen Maglicic Kramer for Appellant Stephanie Solis Certificate of Service: 03/19/2024. 24-3230 (EMK)
Related: [-]