Original Case: 3:09-cv-00109

Sixth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv-05369
Typecivil / private / diversity
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Case Filed:Apr 26, 2023
Terminated:Jan 10, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jan 12, 2024 3:14 AM CST
Defendant - Appellee
SPRINT COMMUNICATIONS COMPANY L.P.
Represented By
Philip Rawson Schenkenberg IV
Taft Stettinius & Hollister
contact info
Anne Marie McClellan
Taft, Stettinius & Hollister
contact info
Matthew R. Lindblom
Stoll Keenon Ogden
contact info
Philip D. Williamson
Taft, Stettinius & Hollister
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
BRANDENBURG TELEPHONE COMPANY
Represented By
Edward T. Depp
Dinsmore & Shohl
contact info
Annie Stewart Myers
Dinsmore & Shohl
contact info
Robert Brooks Herrick
Dinsmore & Shohl
contact info
John E. Selent
Dinsmore & Shohl
contact info

GPO Jan 10 2024
OPINION and JUDGMENT filed : AFFIRMED. Mandate to issue. Decision not for publication. Jeffrey S. Sutton, Chief Judge (AUTHORING); Jane Branstetter Stranch and Andre B. Mathis, Circuit Judges.

Docket last updated: 01/12/2024 3:14 AM CST
Wednesday, April 26, 2023
The case manager for this case is: Jennifer Strobel (JAS)
Related: [-]
3 pgs Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Brandenburg Telephone Company. Transcript needed: y. (JAS)
Related: [-]