Kentucky Western District Court
Judge:Claria H Boom
Referred: Regina S Edwards
Case #: 3:09-cv-00109
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Contract Dispute
Case Filed:Feb 25, 2009
Last checked: Thursday Jun 16, 2016 6:27 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
Sprint Communications Company LP
Represented By
Douglas F. Brent
Stoll Keenon Ogden Pllc - Louisville
contact info
Philip R. Schenkenberg
Briggs & Morgan, P.A.
contact info
Counter Defendant
Brandenburg Telephone Company
Represented By
Holly C. Wallace
Dinsmore & Shohl Llp - Louisville
contact info
Edward Tipton Depp
Dinsmore & Shohl Llp - Louisville
contact info
John E. Selent
Dinsmore & Shohl Llp - Louisville
contact info
Michael P. Abate
Dinsmore & Shohl Llp - Louisville
contact info
Defendant
Sprint Communications Company LP
Represented By
Douglas F. Brent
Stoll Keenon Ogden Pllc - Louisville
contact info
Philip R. Schenkenberg
Briggs & Morgan, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Brandenburg Telephone Company
Represented By
Nicholas M. Haering
Dinsmore & Shohl Llp - Louisville
contact info
Holly C. Wallace
Dinsmore & Shohl Llp - Louisville
contact info
Edward Tipton Depp
Dinsmore & Shohl Llp - Louisville
contact info
John E. Selent
Dinsmore & Shohl Llp - Louisville
contact info
Michael P. Abate
Dinsmore & Shohl Llp - Louisville
contact info

GPO Sep 29 2009
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION by Chief Judge Thomas B. Russell on 9/28/09; re 9 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay and For Oral Argument filed by Sprint Communications Company LP ; an appropriate order shall issuecc:counsel (KJS)
GPO Mar 05 2010
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION by Chief Judge Thomas B. Russell on 03/04/2010; re 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Brandenburg Telephone Company, 9 MOTION to Dismiss Sprint Communications Company, L.P.'s Counterclaim filed by Brandenburg Telephone Company cc:counsel (CSD) Modified to correct link to DN 9 on 4/1/2010 (CSD).
GPO Apr 01 2010
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER granting in part and denying in part 34 Motion to Dismiss; matter stayed pending resolution of parallel state court proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas B. Russell on 04/01/2010. cc:counsel (CSD)
GPO Feb 28 2023
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 2/28/23: Defendant Sprint Communications Company, L.P.'s Motion for Judicial Notice, [R. 100], is GRANTED. Plaintiff Brandenburg Telephone Companys Motion for Summary Judgment, [R. 101], is GRANTED. Defendant Sprint Communications Company, L.P.s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, [R. 102], is DENIED. On or before 3/14/2023, the parties SHALL submit simultaneous briefs, not to exceed ten (10) pages, on the interest rate and damages issues outlined above. The parties may file simultaneous response briefs, not to exceed five (5) pages, on or before 3/21/2023. Upon issuing its additional findings related to the applicable interest rate and damages, the Court will enter a final and appealable judgment. cc: Counsel(DJT)
GPO Mar 31 2023
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 3/31/23: Plaintiff Brandenburg Telephone Company is AWARDED damages in the amount of $6,501,574, as of 2/28/2023. The pre-judgment interest rate of 8% per annum SHALL apply through the date of entryof this Memorandum Opinion and Order and its corresponding judgment. Post-judgment interest SHALL accrue at 8% per annum. This matter is STRICKEN from the Court's active docket. A separate judgment shall follow. cc: Counsel (DJT)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.