Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:22-bk-31641

Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Michelle V Larson
Case #: 3:23-ap-03036
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:May 04, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
James Frinzi
Represented By
James Frinzi
contact info
Defendant
Frinzi Family Trust
Represented By
Frinzi Family Trust
contact info
Defendant
Multiband Global Resources, LLC
Represented By
Multiband Global Resources, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Scott M. Seidel
Represented By
Davor Rukavina
Munsch, Hardt, Kopf & Harr
contact info
Julian Preston Vasek
Munsch Hardt Kopf & Harr P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
GNET ATC, LLC
Represented By
Davor Rukavina
Munsch, Hardt, Kopf & Harr
contact info
Plaintiff
Multiband Field Services, Inc.
Represented By
Davor Rukavina
Munsch, Hardt, Kopf & Harr
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 1:10 PM CDT
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
168 168 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Wed 05/07 11:22 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 05/07/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 164 Order withdrawing150 Federal Insurance Companys Motion for Extension of Time to File itsResponsive Pleading to Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint is deemed withdrawn as moot. Entered on 5/5/2025. (Blanco, J.)
167 167 court Transcript Wed 05/07 3:58 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 01/08/2025 RE: DOCS 102, 103, and 104. THIS TRANSCRIPT WILL BE MADE ELECTRONICALLY AVAILABLE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC 90 DAYS AFTER THE DATE OF FILING. TRANSCRIPT RELEASE DATE IS 08/5/2025. Until that time the transcript may be viewed at the Clerk's Office or a copy may be obtained from the official court transcriber. Court Reporter/Transcriber Transcripts Plus, Inc., Telephone number 215-862-1115 (CourtTranscripts@aol.com). Related [+]. Transcript to be made available to the public on 08/5/2025. (Hartmann, Karen)
Related: [-] 121 Hearing held on 1/8/2025. (RE: related document(s)102 Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding Claims brought under Section 542 filed by Defendant Federal Insurance Company (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),103 Motion to extend time to file its Responsive Pleading to the Remaining Claims in Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Federal Insurance Company (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),104 Motion for withdrawal of reference. Fee amount $199, filed by Defendant Federal Insurance Company (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Withdrawal of Reference # 2 Proposed Order)) (Counsel appeared for Chapter 7 Trustee (S. Seidel) and Federal Insurance Company. Oral argument taken on Motion to Dismiss. Matter taken under advisement. Status conference conducted on Motion to Withdraw the Reference. Court to issue report and recommendation on motions to withdraw the reference. Motion to Extend Time GRANTED as unopposed.)
Monday, May 05, 2025
166 166 court Notice of transmission of motion for leave to appeal Mon 05/05 5:23 PM
DISTRICT COURT Notice of transmission of motion for leave to appeal re: Civil Case # 3:25-cv-01124-S Related [+] (Whitaker, Sheniqua)
Related: [-] 159 Motion for leave to appeal (related document(s):148 Order on motion to dismiss adversary proceeding) filed by Defendant Federal Insurance Company Objections due by 5/15/2025.
165 165 appeal Certificate of mailing regarding appeal Mon 05/05 4:58 PM
Certificate of mailing regarding appeal Related [+] (Whitaker, Sheniqua)
Related: [-] 162 Second Amended notice of appeal filed by Defendant Federal Insurance Company (RE: related document(s)154 Notice of appeal).
Att: 1 Service List
164 164 order Extend/Shorten time Mon 05/05 3:44 PM
Order withdrawing150 Federal Insurance Companys Motion for Extension of Time to File itsResponsive Pleading to Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint is deemed withdrawn as moot. Entered on 5/5/2025. (Blanco, J.)
Related: [-]
162 162 appeal Amended notice of appeal Mon 05/05 11:36 AM
Second Amended notice of appeal filed by Defendant Federal Insurance Company Related [+]. (Schmookler, Scott)
Related: [-] 154 Notice of appeal
161 161 court Clerk's correspondence Mon 05/05 10:26 AM
Clerk's correspondence requesting to amend notice of appeal from attorney for defendant. Related [+] Responses due by 5/7/2025. (Whitaker, Sheniqua)
Related: [-] 158 Amended notice of appeal filed by Defendant Federal Insurance Company (RE: related document(s)154 Notice of appeal).
160 160 misc Request for transcript Mon 05/05 8:56 AM
Request for transcript regarding a hearing held on 1/8/2025. The requested turn-around time is 3-day expedited filed by Defendant Federal Insurance Company. (Todd, Iga)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
159 159 motion Leave to appeal Thu 05/01 7:26 PM
Motion for leave to appeal Related [+] filed by Defendant Federal Insurance Company Objections due by 5/15/2025. (Schmookler, Scott)
Related: [-] 148 Order on motion to dismiss adversary proceeding
158 158 appeal Amended notice of appeal Thu 05/01 6:34 PM
Amended notice of appeal filed by Defendant Federal Insurance Company Related [+]. (Schmookler, Scott)
Related: [-] 154 Notice of appeal
157 157 court Clerk's correspondence Thu 05/01 3:48 PM
Clerk's correspondence requesting to amend document from attorney for defendant. Related [+] Responses due by 5/5/2025. (Whitaker, Sheniqua)
Related: [-] 154 Notice of appeal . Fee Amount $298 filed by Defendant Federal Insurance Company (RE: related document(s)148 Order on motion to dismiss adversary proceeding). Appellant Designation due by 05/13/2025. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Decision Denying MTD # 2 Exhibit Motion for Leave to Appeal)
156 156 court Clerk's correspondence Thu 05/01 3:18 PM
Clerk's correspondence requesting to file document from attorney for defendant. Related [+] Responses due by 5/5/2025. (Whitaker, Sheniqua)
Related: [-] 154 Notice of appeal . Fee Amount $298 filed by Defendant Federal Insurance Company (RE: related document(s)148 Order on motion to dismiss adversary proceeding). Appellant Designation due by 05/13/2025. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Decision Denying MTD # 2 Exhibit Motion for Leave to Appeal)