Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Michelle V Larson
Case #: 3:22-bk-31641
Case Filed:Sep 06, 2022
Creditor Meeting:Jan 10, 2023
Claims Deadline:Apr 10, 2023

Debtor
Goodman Networks, Inc.
2801 Networks Blvd. Suite 300
Frisco, TX 75034
Represented By
Goodman Networks, Inc.
contact info
Debtor
Goodman Networks Inc d/b/a Goodman Solutions

,
Represented By
David William Parham
Akerman LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
3rd Pty Defendant
Auerbach Family Dynasty Trust u/a/d October 9, 2012
Represented By
Michael A Cancienne
Jordan, Lynch & Cancienne PLLC
contact info
Joseph Webster Golinkin, II
Jordan, Lynch & Cancienne PLLC
contact info
3rd Pty Defendant
Steven Zakharyayev
Represented By
Michael A Cancienne
Jordan, Lynch & Cancienne PLLC
contact info
Joseph Webster Golinkin, II
Jordan, Lynch & Cancienne PLLC
contact info
3rd Pty Defendant
Evelina Pinkhasova
Represented By
Michael A Cancienne
Jordan, Lynch & Cancienne PLLC
contact info
Joseph Webster Golinkin, II
Jordan, Lynch & Cancienne PLLC
contact info
3rd Pty Defendant
Hudson Clean Energy Enterprises, LLC
Represented By
Michael A Cancienne
Jordan, Lynch & Cancienne PLLC
contact info
Joseph Webster Golinkin, II
Jordan, Lynch & Cancienne PLLC
contact info
3rd Pty Defendant
Alliance Texas Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Michael A Cancienne
Jordan, Lynch & Cancienne PLLC
contact info
Joseph Webster Golinkin, II
Jordan, Lynch & Cancienne PLLC
contact info
3rd Pty Defendant
Neil Auerbach
Represented By
Michael A Cancienne
Jordan, Lynch & Cancienne PLLC
contact info
Joseph Webster Golinkin, II
Jordan, Lynch & Cancienne PLLC
contact info
3rd Pty Defendant
Judith Auerbach
Represented By
Michael A Cancienne
Jordan, Lynch & Cancienne PLLC
contact info
Joseph Webster Golinkin, II
Jordan, Lynch & Cancienne PLLC
contact info
3rd Pty Defendant
Auerbach Partners, L.P.
Represented By
Michael A Cancienne
Jordan, Lynch & Cancienne PLLC
contact info
Joseph Webster Golinkin, II
Jordan, Lynch & Cancienne PLLC
contact info
3rd Pty Defendant
Auerbach Childrens Dynasty Trust u/a/d October 9, 2012
Represented By
Michael A Cancienne
Jordan, Lynch & Cancienne PLLC
contact info
Joseph Webster Golinkin, II
Jordan, Lynch & Cancienne PLLC
contact info
Petitioning Creditor
Alimco Re Ltd.
2336 SE Ocean Blvd., 400
Stuart, FL 34996
Represented By
Philip Michael Guffy
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
contact info
Petitioning Creditor
JLP Institutional Credit Master Fund LP
420 Lexington Ave. Suite 300
New York, NY 10170
Represented By
Philip Michael Guffy
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
contact info
Petitioning Creditor
JLP Credit Opportunity IDF Series Interests of the SALI Multi-Series Fund, L.P.
420 Lexington Ave. Suite 300
New York, NY 10170
Represented By
Philip Michael Guffy
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
contact info
Petitioning Creditor
JLP Credit Opportunity Master Fund Ltd.
420 Lexington Ave. Suite 300
New York, NY 10170
Represented By
Philip Michael Guffy
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
contact info
Trustee
Scott M. Seidel
Seidel Law Firm 6505 W. Park Blvd., Suite 306
Plano, TX 75093
Represented By
Anne-Alise Hinckley
Munsch Hardt Kopf Harr, P.C.
contact info
Julian Preston Vasek
Munsch Hardt Kopf And Harr
contact info
Munsch, Hardt, Kopf & Harr, P.C.
contact info
Thomas Daniel Berghman
Munsch Hardt Kopf & Harr PC
contact info
Davor Rukavina
Munsch, Hardt, Kopf & Harr
contact info
Garrick Chase Smith
Munsch Hardt Kopf & Harr, P.C.
contact info
Michael J. Quilling
Quilling Selander Lownds Winslett Moser
contact info
Jacob J King
Munsch Hardt Kopf & Harr, P.C.
contact info
Conor White
Munsch Hardt Kopf & Harr, PC
contact info
Scott M. Seidel
contact info
Brenda L Funk
Munsch Hardt Kopf & Harr, PC
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75202


Docket last updated: 02/04/2025 8:59 AM CST
Tuesday, September 06, 2022
crditcrd none Tue 09/06 1:54 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Involuntary petition (chapter 7)([LINK 22-31641 7] ) [misc,invol7] ( 338.00). Receipt number A29798582, amount $ 338.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Receipt of filing fee for Involuntary petition (chapter 7)() [misc,invol7] ( 338.00). Receipt number A29798582, amount $ 338.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 5 pgs misc Involuntary petition (chapter 7) Tue 09/06 1:51 PM
Chapter 7 involuntary petition against a non-individual. Fee Amount $338 Re: Goodman Networks, Inc. Filed by JLP Credit Opportunity Master Fund Ltd. (attorney Philip Michael Guffy), JLP Credit Opportunity IDF Series Interests of the SALI Multi-Series Fund, L.P. (attorney Philip Michael Guffy), JLP Institutional Credit Master Fund LP (attorney Philip Michael Guffy), Alimco Re Ltd. (attorney Philip Michael Guffy) (Guffy, Philip) (5 pgs)
Related: [-]
2 2 11 pgs misc Support/supplemental document Tue 09/06 2:32 PM
Support/supplemental document / Statement of Petitioning Creditors in Support of Involuntary Chapter 7 Petition filed by Petitioning Creditors Alimco Re Ltd., JLP Credit Opportunity IDF Series Interests of the SALI Multi-Series Fund, L.P., JLP Credit Opportunity Master Fund Ltd., JLP Institutional Credit Master Fund LP Related [+]. (Guffy, Philip) (381 pgs; 2 docs)
Related: [-] 1 Involuntary petition (chapter 7)
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
3 3 2 pgs misc Support/supplemental document Tue 09/06 2:43 PM
Support/supplemental document / Statement on Behalf of Alimco Re Ltd. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 1003(a) filed by Petitioning Creditor Alimco Re Ltd. Related [+]. (Guffy, Philip) (2 pgs)
Related: [-] 1 Involuntary petition (chapter 7)
4 4 2 pgs misc Support/supplemental document Tue 09/06 2:44 PM
Support/supplemental document / Partial Waiver of Claim of Petitioning Creditor Alimco Re Ltd. filed by Petitioning Creditor Alimco Re Ltd. Related [+]. (Guffy, Philip) (2 pgs)
Related: [-] 1 Involuntary petition (chapter 7)
5 5 2 pgs misc Support/supplemental document Tue 09/06 2:54 PM
Support/supplemental document / Statement on Behalf of JLP Credit Opportunity Master Fund Ltd. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 1003(a) filed by Petitioning Creditor JLP Credit Opportunity Master Fund Ltd. Related [+]. (Guffy, Philip) (2 pgs)
Related: [-] 1 Involuntary petition (chapter 7)
6 6 2 pgs misc Support/supplemental document Tue 09/06 2:56 PM
Support/supplemental document / Partial Waiver of Claim of Petitioning Creditor JLP Credit Opportunity Master Fund Ltd. filed by Petitioning Creditor JLP Credit Opportunity Master Fund Ltd. Related [+]. (Guffy, Philip) (2 pgs)
Related: [-] 1 Involuntary petition (chapter 7)
7 7 2 pgs misc Support/supplemental document Tue 09/06 3:03 PM
Support/supplemental document / Statement on Behalf of JLP Credit Opportunity IDF Series Interests of the SALI Multi-Series Fund, L.P. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 1003(a) filed by Petitioning Creditor JLP Credit Opportunity IDF Series Interests of the SALI Multi-Series Fund, L.P. Related [+]. (Guffy, Philip) (2 pgs)
Related: [-] 1 Involuntary petition (chapter 7)
8 8 2 pgs misc Support/supplemental document Tue 09/06 3:05 PM
Support/supplemental document / Partial Waiver of Claim of Petitioning Creditor JLP Credit Opportunity IDF Series Interests of the SALI Multi-Series Fund, L.P. filed by Petitioning Creditor JLP Credit Opportunity IDF Series Interests of the SALI Multi-Series Fund, L.P. Related [+]. (Guffy, Philip) (2 pgs)
Related: [-] 1 Involuntary petition (chapter 7)
9 9 2 pgs misc Support/supplemental document Tue 09/06 3:12 PM
Support/supplemental document / Statement on Behalf of JLP Institutional Credit Master Fund LP Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 1003(a) filed by Petitioning Creditor JLP Institutional Credit Master Fund LP Related [+]. (Guffy, Philip) (2 pgs)
Related: [-] 1 Involuntary petition (chapter 7)
10 10 2 pgs misc Support/supplemental document Tue 09/06 3:13 PM
Support/supplemental document / Partial Waiver of Claim of Petitioning Creditor JLP Institutional Credit Master Fund LP filed by Petitioning Creditor JLP Institutional Credit Master Fund LP Related [+]. (Guffy, Philip) (2 pgs)
Related: [-] 1 Involuntary petition (chapter 7)