Oklahoma Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Sarah A Hall
Case #: 5:23-bk-11197
Case Filed:May 08, 2023
Creditor Meeting:Jun 06, 2023
Discharged:Aug 16, 2023
Discharge Objection Deadline:Aug 07, 2023

Debtor
Ryan B Curry
12008 Brookhollow Rd
Oklahoma City, OK 73120-5503
Represented By
O. Clifton Gooding
The Gooding Law Firm
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Kevin M. Coffey
435 N. Walker Ste 202
Oklahoma City, OK 73102
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
United States Trustee 215 Dean A. McGee Ave., 4th Floor
Oklahoma City, OK 73102


Docket last updated: 10/29/2023 5:22 PM CDT
Monday, May 08, 2023
1 1 67 pgs Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individual. Fee Amount $ 338 . Filed by Ryan B Curry B121 and or Statement of Social Security Number due 05/8/2023. (Gooding, O.)
Related: [-]
3 3 Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor. Course was taken 4/10/2023 at 10:59 AM, CDT. Case was filed 05/08/2023. Filed by O. Clifton Gooding of The Gooding Law Firm on behalf of Ryan B Curry. (Gooding, O.)
Related: [-]
4 4 Employee Income Records Filed by O. Clifton Gooding of The Gooding Law Firm on behalf of Ryan B Curry. (Gooding, O.)
Related: [-]