Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:23-bk-11197

Oklahoma Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Sarah A Hall
Case #: 5:23-ap-01029
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Jul 12, 2023
Terminated:Mar 20, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Ryan B Curry
12008 Brookhollow Rd
Oklahoma City, OK 73120
Represented By
Ryan B Curry
contact info
Plaintiff
Darin Dalbom
Represented By
Barrett T Bowers
The Bowers Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Tammy Dalbom
Represented By
Barrett T Bowers
The Bowers Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 1:09 PM CDT
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
court Close Adversary Case Wed 03/20 8:17 AM
Adversary Case 5:23-ap-1029 Closed (snet, ca)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
court Incorrect event used - Not redocketed Mon 03/04 12:35 PM
Court Correction Advisory: The wrong event was used to file docket entry 14 Notice of Dismissal. The integrity of the docket is not effected by this error. The attorney is advised that the correct event for this pleading is Stipulation of Dismissal. (snet, ca)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
15 15 court Minute Entry - CHAP Fri 03/01 3:07 PM
Minutes of Hearing Held on : 04/22/2024 Subject : Doc #1 - Telephonic Scheduling Conference Appearances : None Proceedings Electronically Recorded by : N/A Proceedings : Telephonic Scheduling Conference stricken. Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice filed on 3/1/241 . (dmcge)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Dismissal Fri 03/01 11:42 AM
Joint Notice of Dismissal With Prejudice Adversary 5:23-ap-1029 Filed by Barrett T Bowers of The Bowers Law Firm on behalf of Darin Dalbom, Tammy Dalbom. (Bowers, Barrett)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
13 13 court Minute Entry - Hearing Continued CHAP Thu 02/15 10:01 AM
Minutes of Hearing Held on : 02/26/2024 Subject : Doc #1 - Telephonic Scheduling Conference Appearances : None Proceedings Electronically Recorded by : N/A Proceedings : Telephonic Scheduling Conference is continued to 4/22/24 at 10:00 a.m. to allow parties time to file a joint stipulation of dismissal or upload an agreed judgment. If the stipulation of dismissal is not filed or the agreed judgment uploaded by 4/21/24 the scheduling conference will remain on the docket and a scheduling order will be entered. (dmcge)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2024
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 01/18 11:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 01/18/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Hearing Docket - ap
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
11 11 court Hearing Docket - ap Tue 01/16 4:05 PM
Hearing Docket Scheduled With Judge Sarah A. Hall cc: Barrett T. Bowers, O. Clifton Gooding and U.S. Trustee Service By: dmcge Date of Service: 01/16/2024 Related [+] Scheduling Conference to be held on 2/26/2024 at 10:15 AM at Telephonically. (dmcge)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Darin Dalbom, Plaintiff Tammy Dalbom
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 01/16 2:06 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by Ryan B Curry. with Certificate of Service (Gooding, O.)
Related: [-] 1
Friday, December 29, 2023
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 12/29 11:16 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 12/29/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order on Motion for Leave to File Out of Time
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
8 8 order Leave to File Out of Time Wed 12/27 9:08 AM
Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Answer Out of Time. The answer is allowed to be filed out of time and within twenty (20) days from the date of the entry of this Order. Related [+] Signed by Judge Hall. Time signed: 8:43 cc: all parties Service by sn Date: 12/27/2023 (snet, ca)
Related: [-] 6
Saturday, December 23, 2023
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 12/23 11:16 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 12/23/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Notice of Case Dormancy
Thursday, December 21, 2023
6 6 motion Leave to File Out of Time Thu 12/21 5:14 PM
Application for Leave to File Answer out of time Out of Time with Certificate of Service,. Filed by O. Clifton Gooding of The Gooding Law Firm on behalf of Ryan B Curry. (Gooding, O.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits 1 & 2
5 5 notice Notice of Case Dormancy Thu 12/21 2:10 PM
Notice of Case Dormancy. Notice Sent to Darin Dalbom, Tammy Dalbom Order due 1/10/2024. (dmcge)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 06, 2023
court Corrective Entry Satisfied/Terminated Wed 09/06 8:13 AM
Corrective Entry Satisfied for docket entry # 3 by docket entry # 4. (snet, ca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 09/05 5:43 PM
Amended Summons Service Executed Party Served: Ryan B. Curry Date Served: August 20, 2023 Type of Service: Personal Service (Bowers, Barrett)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, Proof of Service
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 08/30 10:00 AM
Summons Service Executed Party Served: Ryan B. Curry Date Served: 8/20/2023 Type of Service: Personal Service (Bowers, Barrett)
Related: [-]
court Missing Signature (ap) Wed 08/30 2:10 PM
Corrective Entry - Correction needed on docket entry 3 Summons Service Executed. The PDF attached to this entry does not have a caption that conforms to FRBP 1005 and 9004 or Local Rule 1005-1. Furthermore, the pleading was not signed personally or electronically by the Attorney. Please file an amended pleading that includes the personal or electronic signature of the Attorney. Signature of Attorney must contain the complete signature block. Use the original event and select Amended from the Dropdown Box. If the correction is not made by the close of business on 9/5/2023 the entry will be stricken. (sboa, ca)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 13, 2023
2 2 court Summons Issued - Adversary Thu 07/13 2:02 PM
Summons Issued on Ryan B Curry. (dwebs, ca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 12, 2023
1 1 cmp (auto) Complaint Wed 07/12 2:49 PM
Adversary case 23-01029 (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)}, (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)), (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) Complaint by Darin Dalbom, Tammy Dalbom against Ryan B Curry. Fee Amount $350 (Bowers, Barrett)
Related: [-]