PacerMonitor
A Fitch Solutions Service
Features
Plans & Pricing
About
Home
Features
Pricing
Getting Started
About Us
Start Free Trial
Sign In
Admin Login
Diana Sharaki
California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Case #:
8:23-bk-10979
Case Filed:
May 11, 2023
Docket
Parties
Related Cases (4)
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Adversary
8:23-ap-01114 - Sharaki v. Homecomings Financial, LLC, fka Homwcomings Financ
10/03/2023
Adversary
8:24-ap-01088 - Sharaki v. RRA CP Opportunity Trust 2 et al
06/12/2024
Adversary
8:24-ap-01151 - Sharaki v. Homecomings Financial LLC fka Homecomings Financia
11/26/2024
Adversary
8:25-ap-01083 - Sharaki v. Real Time Resolutions Inc. et al
03/06/2025
Create an account to get the full docket for this case.
Continue to Create Account