Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:23-bk-10979

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Mark D Houle
Case #: 8:25-ap-01083
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
41 Bankruptcy - Objection / revocation of discharge - §727(c),(d),(e)
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Mar 06, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Real Time Resolutions Inc.
Represented By
Real Time Resolutions Inc.
contact info
Defendant
RRACP Opportunity Trust 2
Represented By
RRACP Opportunity Trust 2
contact info
Defendant
ZBS Law LLP
Represented By
ZBS Law LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jeffrey I Golden, Chapter 7 Trustee
Represented By
Jeffrey I Golden, Chapter 7 Trustee
contact info
Defendant
Amran Cohen, Chapter 13 Trustee
Represented By
Amran Cohen, Chapter 13 Trustee
contact info
Defendant
Homecomings Financial LLC
Represented By
Homecomings Financial LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Diana Amini Sharaki
6 Tangerine
Irvine, CA 92618
Represented By
Diana Amini Sharaki
contact info
Trustee
Amrane (SA) Cohen (TR)
770 The City Drive South Suite 3700
Orange, CA 92868
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160
Santa Ana, CA 92701


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 05/01 9:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/01/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Order on Motion to Extend Time (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
15 15 30+ pgs misc Memorandum of points and authorities Thu 05/01 9:55 AM
Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.15(a)(2) Filed by Plaintiff Diana Amini Sharaki . (JL)
Related: [-]
14 14 court X - Document (Generic) Thu 05/01 9:51 AM
Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26 Filed by Plaintiff Diana Amini Sharaki (JL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
13 13 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend Time (Generic) (BNC-PDF) Tue 04/29 9:01 AM
Order Denying Request for Extension (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 4/29/2025 (JL)
Related: [-] 12
Monday, April 28, 2025
12 12 motion X - Extend Time (Generic) (motion) Mon 04/28 1:24 PM
Request for Extension Filed by Plaintiff Diana Amini Sharaki (JL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Part 2
Monday, April 07, 2025
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 04/07 4:37 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by RRACP Opportunity Trust 2, Real Time Resolutions Inc.. (Lewin, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
10 10 court X - Document (Generic) Fri 04/04 9:41 AM
Document/Request for Disclosure of Discovery Documents Under LBR 7026-2(d) Filed by Plaintiff Diana Amini Sharaki Related [+] (CJ)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Diana Amini Sharaki
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
9 9 motion X - Extend Time (Generic) (motion) Tue 04/01 12:42 PM
Notice of Motion and Motion: Request for Extension of Time and Stay of Proceedings Filed by Plaintiff Diana Amini Sharaki (JL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 03/20 9:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/20/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Order on Motion to Extend Time (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
7 7 court Hearing Set (Motion) (AP Case) Thu 03/20 2:26 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] The Hearing date is set for 5/22/2025 at 01:30 PM at Crtrm 6C, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Mark D. Houle (JL)
Related: [-] 5 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Amran Cohen, Chapter 13 Trustee
6 6 misc Request for judicial notice Thu 03/20 11:44 AM
Request for judicial notice Filed by Defendant Amran Cohen, Chapter 13 Trustee Related [+]. (Cohen (TR), Amrane (SA))
Related: [-] 5 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding ; Notice of Motion
5 5 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (motion) Thu 03/20 11:42 AM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding ; Notice of Motion Filed by Defendant Amran Cohen, Chapter 13 Trustee (Cohen (TR), Amrane (SA))
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
4 4 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend Time (Generic) (BNC-PDF) Tue 03/18 3:14 PM
Order Denying Request for Emergency Hearing (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 3/18/2025 (JL)
Related: [-] 3
Monday, March 17, 2025
3 3 motion X - Extend Time (Generic) (motion) Mon 03/17 2:39 PM
Emergency Motion For: Adversary Proceeding Extension of Time for Rule v. 7026 Compliance Filed by Plaintiff Diana Amini Sharaki (JL) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/17/2025 (JL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
2 2 court Summons Issued Thu 03/06 3:36 PM
Summons Issued on Amran Cohen, Chapter 13 Trustee Date Issued 3/6/2025, Answer Due 4/7/2025; Homecomings Financial LLC Date Issued 3/6/2025, Answer Due 4/7/2025; Jeffrey I Golden, Chapter 7 Trustee Date Issued 3/6/2025, Answer Due 4/7/2025; RRACP Opportunity Trust 2 Date Issued 3/6/2025, Answer Due 4/7/2025; Real Time Resolutions Inc. Date Issued 3/6/2025, Answer Due 4/7/2025; ZBS Law LLP Date Issued 3/6/2025, Answer Due 4/7/2025 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 5/22/2025 at 01:30 PM at Crtrm 6C, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Mark D. Houle (JL) A COPY OF THE SUMMONS MAILED TO PLAINTIFF VIA U.S. MAIL ON 3/6/2025 Modified on 3/6/2025 (JL)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Diana Amini Sharaki
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/06 2:11 PM
Adversary case 8:25-ap-01083. Complaint by Plaintiff: Diana Amini Sharaki against Defendants: Real Time Resolutions Inc. , RRACP Opportunity Trust 2 , ZBS Law LLP , Jeffrey I Golden, Chapter 7 Trustee , Amran Cohen, Chapter 13 Trustee , Homecomings Financial LLC . ($350.00 Fee Not Required). Nature of Suit: (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))) ,(21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)) ,(62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) ,(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)) ,(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)))(VN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits
Att: 2 Adv Coversheet