Member Case
Lead case is: 4:23-bk-90332

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher M Lopez
Case #: 4:23-bk-90337
Case Filed:May 15, 2023
Terminated:Jul 21, 2023

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1,000-5,000
Est. Assets$1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Est. Liabilities $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Platinum Security Solutions, Inc.
1990 Whittington Place
Farmers Branch, TX 75234
Represented By
Timothy Alvin Davidson, II
Andrews Kurth LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002


Docket last updated: 2 minutes ago
Friday, July 21, 2023
court Close Bankruptcy Case Fri 07/21 4:14 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (RosarioSaldana)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 18, 2023
3 3 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 05/18 11:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/18/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Order for Joint Administration
Tuesday, May 16, 2023
2 2 order Joint Administration Tue 05/16 10:05 AM
Order for Joint Administration under 23-90332 Signed on 5/16/2023 (RosarioSaldana)
Related: [-]
utility Remark (PUBLIC ENTRY) Tue 05/16 10:05 AM
An order directing joint administration of this case has been entered by the Court in accordance with FED. R. BANKR. P. 1015(b). The docket in Case No. 23-90332 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. All future pleadings shall be filed in and all subsequent docket entries shall be made in the Lead Case. Interested parties are directed to the order directing joint administration for further information. (RosarioSaldana)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 15, 2023
1 1 19 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) [system event] Mon 05/15 12:43 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Platinum Security Solutions, Inc.. (Davidson, Timothy)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Mon 05/15 1:01 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 23-90337 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A24413429. Fee amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]