Monitronics Funding, LP Jointly Administered under 23-90332.
Member Case
Lead case is: 4:23-bk-90332
Lead case is: 4:23-bk-90332
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Christopher M Lopez |
Case #: | 4:23-bk-90339 |
Case Filed: | May 15, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jul 21, 2023 |
Type | Partnership |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1,000-5,000 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Monitronics Funding, LP
1990 Wittington Place
Farmers Branch, TX 75234 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002 |
Docket last updated: 47 seconds ago |
Thursday, October 19, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
![]() PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 10/19/2023 9:29:01 AM ]. File Size [ 4232 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:08:49 ]. (admin) |
|
Friday, July 21, 2023 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Fri 07/21 4:15 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (RosarioSaldana) |
||
Thursday, May 18, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 05/18/2023. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, May 16, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Order for Joint Administration under 23-90332 Signed on 5/16/2023 (RosarioSaldana) |
|
utility
Remark (PUBLIC ENTRY)
Tue 05/16 10:11 AM
An order directing joint administration of this case has been entered by the Court in accordance with FED. R. BANKR. P. 1015(b). The docket in Case No. 23-90332 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. All future pleadings shall be filed in and all subsequent docket entries shall be made in the Lead Case. Interested parties are directed to the order directing joint administration for further information. (RosarioSaldana) |
||
Monday, May 15, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Monitronics Funding, LP. (Davidson, Timothy) |
|
crditcrd
none
Mon 05/15 1:01 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 23-90339 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A24413429. Fee amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |