CBIZ Accounting v. Truist Bank et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-11259
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-11259
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas M Horan |
Case #: | 1:23-ap-50390 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | May 25, 2023 |
Terminated: | May 02, 2024 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Truist Bank, as successor by merger to SunTrust Bank
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
U.S. Small Business Administration
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CBIZ Accounting, Tax and Advisory of New York, LLC, Trustee of the Advantage Rent A Car Unsecured Creditor Trust Liquidating Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT |
Thursday, May 02, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
![]() Notice of Dismissal -- Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by CBIZ Accounting (Monzo, Eric) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 05/02 2:38 PM
Adversary Case 1:23-ap-50390 Closed (KAR) |
||
Monday, November 13, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
![]() Order Approving Joint Stipulation and Motion to Stay Adversary Proceeding Order Signed on 11/13/2023. (AMH) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, November 09, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
![]() Certification of Counsel Regarding Joint Stipulation and Motion to Stay Adversary Proceeding Filed by U.S. Small Business Administration. (Hsu, I-Heng) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Wednesday, November 01, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
![]() Order Approving Joint Stipulation Further Extending Defendants' Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint Order Signed on 11/1/2023. (AMH) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, October 27, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
![]() Certification of Counsel Regarding Joint Stipulation Further Extending Defendants' Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint Filed by Truist Bank. (Robinson, Richard) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Thursday, October 12, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
![]() Order Approving Joint Stipulation Further Extending Defendants' Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint Order Signed on 10/12/2023. (AMH) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, October 11, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
![]() Certification of Counsel Regarding Joint Stipulation Further Extending Defendants' Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint Filed by Truist Bank. (Robinson, Richard) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Friday, September 29, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Notice of Appearance. Filed by U.S. Small Business Administration (Gesmundo, Alastair) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
misc
Add Attorney
Fri 09/29 4:58 PM
Attorney Alastair Gesmundo and Alastair Gesmundo for U.S. Small Business Administration added to case Filed by U.S. Small Business Administration. (Gesmundo, Alastair) |
||
Thursday, August 31, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Order Approving Joint Stipulation Further Extending Defendants' Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint Order Signed on 8/31/2023. (AMH) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
15 | 15
![]() Certification of Counsel Regarding Joint Stipulation Further Extending Defendants' Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint Filed by Truist Bank. (Robinson, Richard) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Monday, August 14, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Order Approving Stipulation Consenting to Voluntary Mediation and Appointing Mediator Order Signed on 8/14/2023. (AMH) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, August 11, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Certification of Counsel Regarding Stipulation Consenting to Voluntary Mediation and Appointing Mediator Filed by CBIZ Accounting. (Monzo, Eric) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, July 27, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Order Approving Joint Stipulation Further Extending Defendants' Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint Order Signed on 7/27/2023. (DRG) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, July 26, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Certification of Counsel Regarding Joint Stipulation Further Extending Defendants' Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint Filed by U.S. Small Business Administration. (Hsu, I-Heng) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Monday, July 17, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Stipulation Second Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint Between Truist Bank and Plaintiff . Filed by Truist Bank. (Robinson, Richard) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Order Approving Stipulation Extending United States' Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complain Order Signed on 7/5/2023. (AMH) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, June 28, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Certification of Counsel regarding Stipulation Extending United States' Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint Filed by U.S. Small Business Administration. (Hsu, I-Heng) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
7 | 7
![]() Notice of Appearance. Filed by U.S. Small Business Administration (Hsu, I-Heng) |
|
Tuesday, June 27, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant Truist Bank to Respond to the Complaint Between Truist Bank and Plaintiff . Filed by Truist Bank. (Robinson, Richard) |
|
Thursday, May 25, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Adam L. Fletcher Order Signed on 5/25/2023. (DRG) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Motion to Appear pro hac vice for Adam L. Fletcher, Esquire of Baker & Hostetler LLP . Receipt Number 4144856, Filed by CBIZ Accounting, Tax and Advisory of New York, LLC, Trustee of the Advantage Rent A Car Unsecured Creditor Trust Liquidating Trust. (Ennis, Sarah) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendants Truist Bank, as successor by merger to SunTrust Bank, U.S. Small Business Administration. (Ennis, Sarah) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Thu 05/25 3:37 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 23-50390 TMH] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A11105473, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 23-50390 Complaint -- Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550, and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by CBIZ Accounting, Tax and Advisory of New York, LLC, Trustee of the Advantage Rent A Car Unsecured Creditor Trust Liquidating Trust against Truist Bank, as successor by merger to SunTrust Bank, U.S. Small Business Administration. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 8/23/2023. (Ennis, Sarah) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |