Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Shad Robinson
Case #: 1:23-bk-10371
Case Filed:May 30, 2023
Creditor Meeting:Jul 06, 2023
Claims Deadline:Aug 28, 2023

Debtor
Vidatronic, Inc., Debtor
P.O. Box 203395
Austin, TX 78720
Represented By
Kell C. Mercer
Kell C. Mercer, P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
John Patrick Lowe
2402 East Main Street
Uvalde, TX 78801
Represented By
Brian Talbot Cumings
Graves Dougherty Hearon & Moody, PC
contact info
John Patrick Lowe
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 5:04 AM CDT
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
crditcrd ICC-Fee Paid Tue 05/30 3:18 PM
ICC-Fee Terminated for Voluntary Petition Chapter 7([LINK 23-10371 ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00), Amount $ 338.00, Receipt A23691687 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 61 pgs misc Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 Tue 05/30 3:17 PM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 7 (Non-Individual) With Schedules, With Statements, (Filing Fee: $ 338) Filed By Vidatronic, Inc.. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 06/6/2023 (Mercer, Kell)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs court 341 Meeting 7 (Business No Asset) Tue 05/30 3:20 PM
Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Lowe, John Patrick added to the case. with 341(a) meeting to be held on 7/6/2023 at 11:00 AM at Via Phone: (888)405-5981; Code: 2733682#. (Mercer, Kell)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Declaration for Electronic Filing (Restricted Document) Tue 05/30 3:21 PM
Declaration for Electronic Filing Related [+] filed by Kell C. Mercer for Debtor Vidatronic, Inc.. (Mercer, Kell)
Related: [-] stricted Document1 Voluntary Petition under Chapter 7 (Non-Individual) With Schedules, With Statements, (Filing Fee: $ 338) Filed By Vidatronic, Inc.. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 06/6/2023
4 4 1 pgs misc ~Document Tue 05/30 3:23 PM
Consent Resolution Regarding Chapter 7 filed by Kell C. Mercer for Debtor Vidatronic, Inc.. (Mercer, Kell) Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition under Chapter 7 (Non-Individual) With Schedules, With Statements, (Filing Fee: $ 338) Filed By Vidatronic, Inc.. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 06/6/2023
5 5 trustee 7 Trustee's Request Notice of Assets (F) Tue 05/30 6:42 PM
Trustee's Request For Notice of Assets - Proofs of Claim Due 8/28/2023 (Lowe, John)
Related: [-]