Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Rossie D Alston, Jr
Referred: William E Fitzpatrick
Case #: 1:23-cv-00706
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Federal Question
Case Filed:May 31, 2023
Last checked: Monday Nov 27, 2023 3:59 AM EST
Defendant
Bozzuto Management Company
Represented By
James D. Bragdon
Gallagher Evelius & Jones Llo
contact info
Defendant
CH MF BTH II
Represented By
James D. Bragdon
Gallagher Evelius & Jones Llo
contact info
Defendant
Alexan Florence
Represented By
James D. Bragdon
Gallagher Evelius & Jones Llo
contact info
Plaintiff
Nyah Sekel
2731 Monacan St #302
Alexandria, VA 22314


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, May 05, 2025
70 70 respoth Opposition Mon 05/05 3:10 PM
Opposition to65 MOTION to Compel Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Combined Motion to Compel More Complete Responses to Requests for Admission and Interrogatories filed by Bozzuto Management Company, CH MF BTH II, Alexan Florence.(Bragdon, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Counterclaim
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
69 69 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Sanctions Wed 04/30 10:09 AM
ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motions (Dkts. 60, 61) are DENIED (see Order for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick on 4/29/2025. (swil)
Related: [-]
68 68 1 pgs order Order Wed 04/30 10:04 AM
ORDERED that the Court DECLINES to adopt the plan. In addition to being untimely, Plaintiff's proposed plan fails to adequately address discovery matters consistent with governing law. Discovery in this matter will continue to be controlled by the District Judge's Scheduling Order (Dkt. 42), the undersigned's Rule 16(b) Order (Dkt. 49), the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and the Local Civil Rules in re57 Discovery Plan filed by Nyah Sekel. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick on 4/29/2025. (swil)
Related: [-]