Original Case: 1:23-cv-00706

Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv.pr-01740
Typecivil private / private
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Case Filed:Jul 14, 2023
Terminated:Oct 23, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 24, 2023 4:43 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
CH MF BTH II, Alexandria Old Town LLC
Represented By
Emily A. Levy
GALLAGHER EVELIUS & JONES, LLP
contact info
Joseph Christian Dugan
GALLAGHER EVELIUS & JONES, LLP
contact info
James Douglas Bragdon
GALLAGHER EVELIUS & JONES, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ALEXAN FLORENCE, Manager
Represented By
Emily A. Levy
GALLAGHER EVELIUS & JONES, LLP
contact info
Joseph Christian Dugan
GALLAGHER EVELIUS & JONES, LLP
contact info
James Douglas Bragdon
GALLAGHER EVELIUS & JONES, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
BOZZUTO MANAGEMENT COMPANY, C/O CT Coporation System (Reg. Agent)
Represented By
Emily A. Levy
GALLAGHER EVELIUS & JONES, LLP
contact info
Joseph Christian Dugan
GALLAGHER EVELIUS & JONES, LLP
contact info
James Douglas Bragdon
GALLAGHER EVELIUS & JONES, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
NYAH SEKEL
Represented By
Nyah Sekel
contact info

GPO Oct 23 2023
UNPUBLISHED PER CURIAM OPINION filed. Motion disposition in opinion--granting Motion to dismiss appeal [1001409364-2]. Originating case number: 1:23-cv-00706-RDA-WEF. Copies to all parties and the district court/agency. Mailed to: Nyah Sekel. [1001460019] [23-1740]

Docket last updated: 10/24/2023 4:41 AM EDT
Friday, July 14, 2023
1 1 1 pgs Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:23-cv-00706-RDA-WEF. Case manager: RachelPhillips. [1001402039] 23-1740 RP [Entered: 07/14/2023 10:33 AM]
Related: [-]
2 2 FEE NOTICE issued to Nyah Sekel - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 08/14/2023. Originating case number: 1:23-cv-00706-RDA-WEF. Mailed to: Nyah Sekel. [1001402043] 23-1740 RP [Entered: 07/14/2023 10:36 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Fee Notice
Att: 2 6 pgs IFP Application
3 3 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Nyah Sekel. [1001402045] Informal Opening Brief due 08/07/2023. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. 23-1740 RP [Entered: 07/14/2023 10:38 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 12 pgs Inf Brief Order
Att: 2 2 pgs Disclosure Statement
4 4 1 pgs RECORD requested from Clerk of Court [1001402048]. Due: 07/28/2023. 23-1740 RP [Entered: 07/14/2023 10:39 AM]
Related: [-]