Maryland District Court
Judge:Timothy J Sullivan
Case #: 8:23-cv-01519
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Jun 05, 2023
Terminated:Mar 14, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Dec 02, 2023 3:54 AM EST
Defendant
Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Plaintiff
Patreece Butchee'
Represented By
Andrea D Smith
The Law Office Of Andrea D Smith LLC
contact info

GPO Mar 14 2025
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 3/14/2025. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)

Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
45 45 appeal USCA Case Number Tue 04/15 3:11 PM
USCA Case Number 25-1392 for43 Notice of Appeal filed by Patreece Butchee'- Case Manager - Ganna M.Aboutabl. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
44 44 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Mon 04/14 2:37 PM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re43 Notice of Appeal. IMPORTANT NOTICE: To access forms which you are required to file with the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit please go to http://www.ca4.uscourts.gov and click on Forms & Notices.(slss, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 12, 2025
43 43 appeal Notice of Appeal Sat 04/12 1:54 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Patreece Butchee'. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number AMDDC-11906535.(Smith, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
42 42 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Vacate Fri 03/14 11:33 AM
ORDER denying35 MOTION to Vacate Arbitration Award; CONFIRMING the Opinion and Award issued on October 25, 2025; CLOSING case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 3/14/2025. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
41 41 9 pgs order Memorandum Opinion Fri 03/14 11:31 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 3/14/2025. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
40 40 respm Response Fri 02/28 8:45 PM
RESPONSE re38 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Patreece Butchee'.(Smith, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
39 39 notice Notice (Other) Fri 02/14 2:45 PM
Exhibits by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association re38 Response in Opposition to Motion,(Dennis, Bernard) Modified on 2/14/2025 (ybs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 2,
Att: 2 Exhibit 3,
Att: 3 Exhibit 4
38 38 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 02/14 1:40 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re35 MOTION to Vacate Arbitration Award Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award filed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association.(Dennis, Bernard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
37 37 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/14 12:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Felicia Marsh on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Marsh, Felicia)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
36 36 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/12 10:43 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen A McGinley on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (McGinley, Kathleen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
35 35 motion Vacate Thu 01/30 5:13 PM
MOTION to Vacate Arbitration Award by Patreece Butchee'(Smith, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
34 34 2 pgs order Order Tue 01/28 3:34 PM
ORDER granting33 Plaintiff's Request to File a Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award; setting briefing schedule for Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate Arbitration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 1/28/2025. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
33 33 corresp Miscellaneous Mon 12/30 11:42 PM
Correspondence re: Request for Permission to File Motion(Smith, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Proposed Motion,
Att: 2 Memorandum in Support Proposed Memorandum,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Thursday, December 19, 2024
32 32 order 25 Pct Mag - ORDER: Consent to Proceed before Mag Judge Thu 12/19 3:41 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 12/19/2024. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
30 30 corresp Miscellaneous Thu 12/19 2:47 PM
Correspondence re: Request to File Preliminary Motion (Dennis, Bernard)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
29 29 respm Response Mon 12/16 7:28 AM
RESPONSE re23 Order Lifting Stay filed by Patreece Butchee'.(Smith, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
28 28 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Order on Motion to Vacate Tue 12/10 3:19 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER denying25 Motion for Leave to File and denying27 Motion to Vacate ; The5 Case Management Order provides that "the parties are precluded from filing any motions without permission of the assigned judge until consent is obtained from all parties or the case is reassigned to a district judge, if consent from all parties is not obtained." Because Plaintiff's motions were filed in violation of the Case Management Order, they are denied without prejudice to renewal. Once all parties have consented to proceed before a magistrate judge, or once the case is reassigned to a district judge if all parties do not consent, Plaintiff may refile her motion, consistent with the Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 12/10/2024. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
27 27 motion Vacate Mon 12/09 3:16 PM
MOTION to Vacate25 MOTION for Leave to File , 26 QC Notice - Miscellaneous, by Patreece Butchee'(Smith, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Proposed Motion,
Att: 2 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, December 06, 2024
26 26 notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Fri 12/06 9:54 AM
QC NOTICE:25 Motion for Leave to File filed by Patreece Butchee' was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Proposed Order and Proposed Renewed Pleading. To correct this problem, file Proposed Order and Proposed Renewed Pleading using the event Notice (Other) and link to 25 Motion for Leave to File. (bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
25 25 motion Leave to File Document Wed 12/04 10:55 PM
MOTION for Leave to File by Patreece Butchee'(Smith, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
24 24 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 12/02 10:57 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patreece Butchee'. Wells Fargo Bank, National Association served on 6/22/2023, answer due 7/13/2023.(Smith, Andrea)
Related: [-]
23 23 2 pgs order Order Lifting Stay Mon 12/02 10:45 AM
ORDER setting deadline for Plaintiff to Show Cause why claims against Defendant should not be dismissed; Lifting Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 12/2/2024. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
22 22 order Order on Motion to Vacate Mon 12/02 9:39 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER denying21 MOTION to Vacate Arbitration Award without prejudice. The5 Case Management Order provides that "the parties are precluded from filing any motion without permission of the assigned judge until consent is obtained from all parties or the case is reassigned to a district judge, if consent from all parties is not obtained." Because Plaintiff's motion was filed in violation of the Case Management Order, it is denied without prejudice to renewal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 12/2/2024. (bcs, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
21 21 motion Vacate Wed 11/27 5:01 PM
MOTION to Vacate Arbitration Award by Patreece Butchee'(Smith, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
19 19 misc Status Report Tue 07/23 12:53 AM
STATUS REPORT by Patreece Butchee'(Smith, Andrea)
Related: [-]
order Order Tue 07/23 11:48 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER approving19 Status Report. The parties are directed to file another joint status report by 1/10/2025 unless a notice of dismissal has been filed before that time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 7/23/2024. (bcs, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
order Order Fri 07/19 3:25 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER directing Plaintiff to file a status report by 8/2/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 7/19/2024. (bcs, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
order Order Wed 03/27 10:43 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER approving16 Status Report. Another status report is due by 7/1/2024 unless a notice of dismissal has been filed before that time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 3/27/2024. (bcs, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
16 16 misc Status Report Tue 03/26 11:54 PM
STATUS REPORT by Patreece Butchee'(Smith, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
order Order Thu 03/21 10:26 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER directing Plaintiff to show cause, by 4/4/2024, why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). Status reports were due by 1/19/2024 and 3/6/2024 but were not filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 3/21/2024. (bcs, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
order Order Wed 02/21 1:13 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER directing Plaintiff to file a status report by 3/6/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 2/21/2024. (bcs, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 14, 2023
order Order on Motion to Stay Fri 07/14 11:59 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting12 MOTION to Stay; directing parties to file a Jont Status Report by 1/19/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 7/14/2023. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 11, 2023
12 12 motion Stay Tue 07/11 3:19 PM
MOTION to Stay by Patreece Butchee'(Smith, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, June 21, 2023
9 9 order 25 Pct Mag - Order to Show Cause Wed 06/21 8:17 AM
ORDER directing Patreece Butchee' to show cause for failure to comply with[LINK:Standing Order 2019-07] . Show Cause Hearing set for 7/28/2023 02:00 PM in (proceed to the Clerk's Office to determine the location of the hearing) before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. This Order shall be vacated if Patreece Butchee' files a consent or declination prior to the show cause hearing date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 6/21/2023. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
order 25 Pct Mag - Order Cancelling Show Cause Hearing Wed 06/21 2:14 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER CANCELLING Show Cause Hearing re:9 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 6/21/2023. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 07, 2023
8 8 service Summons Issued Wed 06/07 7:52 AM
Summons Issued 21 days as to Wells Fargo Bank, National Association.(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 06, 2023
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Tue 06/06 9:04 PM
NOTICE by Patreece Butchee' re1 Complaint Proposed Summons (Smith, Andrea)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Tue 06/06 9:03 PM
NOTICE by Patreece Butchee' re1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet (Smith, Andrea)
Related: [-]
5 5 order 25 Pct Mag - Case Management Order Tue 06/06 8:13 AM
Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 6/6/2023. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Tue 06/06 8:12 AM
QC NOTICE:1 Complaint filed by Patreece Butchee' was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Completed Civil Cover sheet and proposed summons. To correct this problem, file Completed Civil Cover sheet and proposed summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Completed Civil Cover sheet and proposed summons to 1 . (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
notice 25 Pct Mag - Notice of Case Assignment to a Magistrate Judge Tue 06/06 8:12 AM
NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. Patreece Butchee' or counsel for Patreece Butchee' are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] , counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 6/20/2023. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 05, 2023
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 06/05 7:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea D Smith on behalf of Patreece Butchee (Smith, Andrea)
Related: [-]
1 1 17 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 06/05 7:32 PM
COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo Bank ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10638710.), filed by Patreece Butchee.(Smith, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet