Original Case: 8:23-cv-01519

Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cv.pr-01392
Typecivil private / private
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 17, 2025 6:17 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
WELLS FARGO BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Bernard George Dennis III
JACKSON LEWIS PC
contact info
Felicia Marsh
JACKSON LEWIS PC
contact info
Kathleen A. McGinley
JACKSON LEWIS PC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
PATREECE BUTCHEE'
Represented By
Andrea D. Smith
LAW OFFICE OF ANDREA D. SMITH LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/17/2025 4:26 AM EDT
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
1 1 1 pgs Case docketed. Originating case number: 8:23-cv-01519-TJS. Case manager: GAboutabl. [1001753773] 25-1392 GMA [Entered: 04/15/2025 12:52 PM]
Related: [-]
2 2 7 pgs DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case. Originating case number: 8:23-cv-01519-TJS. Mailed to: Felicia Marsh and Andrea D. Smith. [1001753779] 25-1392 GMA [Entered: 04/15/2025 01:05 PM]
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Felicia Marsh and Andrea D. Smith. No paper copies required unless case has been tentatively calendared or copies otherwise ordered. All filings must comply with Appendix Pagination & Brief Citation Guide. [1001753788] Opening Brief and Appendix due 05/27/2025. Response Brief due 06/24/2025. 25-1392 GMA [Entered: 04/15/2025 01:09 PM]
Related: [-]