Ross v. Bluefield Area Transit et al
West Virginia Southern District Court | |
Judge: | David A Faber |
Referred: | Omar J Aboulhosn |
Case #: | 1:23-cv-00425 |
Nature of Suit | 443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations |
Cause | 28:1343 Violation of Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jun 08, 2023 |
Terminated: | Mar 29, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Dec 07, 2023 5:16 AM EST |
Defendant
Bluefield Area Transit
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Reeves
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Ross
338 Brook Hollow Road
Boone, NC 28607 |
Docket last updated: 05/20/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
114 | 114
appeal
Assembled Electronic Record On Appeal Transmitted To 4CCA
Tue 04/09 1:22 PM
ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL TRANSMITTED TO 4CCA re:109 Notice of Appeal to 4CCA in 4CCA Case Number 24-1295 (klc) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
113 | 113
appeal
Record Request From 4CCA
Mon 04/08 1:57 PM
RECORD REQUEST in 4CCA Case Number 24-1295 (mk) |
|
112 | 112
appeal
Notice Of Appellate Case Opening From 4CCA
Mon 04/08 1:54 PM
NOTICE OF APPELLATE CASE OPENING BY 4CCA re:109 Notice of Appeal to 4CCA in 4CCA Case No. 24-1295 Case Manager: T. Fischer. (mk) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
111 | 111
notice
Notice Of Change Of Address
Fri 04/05 5:50 PM
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Michael Ross to 4320 East Trent Avenue, Spokane, WA 99212; system previously updated on 4/1/2024 with current address information. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (arb) |
|
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
110 | 110
appeal
Transmittal Of Notice Of Appeal To 4CCA
Wed 04/03 2:23 PM
TRANSMITTAL OF NOTICE OF APPEAL TO 4CCA via APPEAL TRANSMITTAL SHEET re:109 Notice of Appeal to 4CCA. (arb) |
|
109 | 109
appeal
Notice Of Appeal to 4CCA
Wed 04/03 2:17 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Michael Ross as to the105 Memorandum Opinion and Order and107 Judgment Order. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (arb) |