Michael Ross v. Bluefield Area Transit
Original Case: 1:23-cv-00425
Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cv.pr-01295 |
Type | civil private / private |
Nature of Suit | 443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 09, 2024 5:01 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
BLUEFIELD AREA TRANSIT
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
JOHN REEVES, General Manager
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
MICHAEL ROSS
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/09/2024 4:15 AM EDT |
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
1 | 1 1 pgs Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:23-cv-00425. Case manager: TFischer. [1001549182] 24-1295 TF [Entered: 04/08/2024 12:53 PM] | |
2 | 2 11 pgs INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Ross, Heltzel. [1001549192] Informal Opening Brief due 05/02/2024 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. 24-1295 TF [Entered: 04/08/2024 01:01 PM] | |
3 | 3 1 pgs RECORD requested from Clerk of Court [1001549194]. Due: 04/22/2024. 24-1295 TF [Entered: 04/08/2024 01:03 PM] |