New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Case #: 2:23-bk-15772
Case Filed:Jul 05, 2023

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 12 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
116 116 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Thu 05/01 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 04/30/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
115 115 order Compensation Sat 04/26 10:59 AM
Order Granting Application For Compensation for Stetz Belgiovine Manwarren & Wallis, P.C., fees awarded: $4593.75, expenses awarded: $0.00 Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 4/25/2025. (jf)
Related: [-] 113