Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:23-bk-15772

New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Vincent F Papalia
Case #: 2:24-ap-01044
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 23, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
ROC Funding Group, LLC
1457 Richmond Road
Staten Island, NY 10304
Represented By
ROC Funding Group, LLC
contact info
Defendant
EBF Holdings, LLC dba Everest Business Funding
102 W. 38th St. 6th Floor
New York, NY 10018
Represented By
EBF Holdings, LLC dba Everest Business Funding
contact info
Defendant
Cloudfund LLC
400 Rella Blvd. Suite 165-201
Suffern, NY 10901
Represented By
Cloudfund LLC
contact info
Defendant
Amsterdam Capital Solutions
222 W. 37th St. 8th Floor
New York, NY 10018
Represented By
Amsterdam Capital Solutions
contact info
Defendant
The Money Store Funding, Inc.
1750 State Hwy 34 #105
Matawan, NJ 07747
Represented By
The Money Store Funding, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Phantom Advance
1274 49th St. Suite 212
Brooklyn, NY 11219
Represented By
Phantom Advance
contact info
Defendant
Amerifi Capital, LLC
330 Main Street
Hartford, CT 06106
Represented By
Amerifi Capital, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Kash Advance, LLC
111 Great Neck Road Suite 300
Great Neck, NY 11021
Represented By
Kash Advance, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Epic Advance
311 Boulevard of the Americas
Lakewood, NJ 08701
Represented By
Epic Advance
contact info
Defendant
Mayfair Business Capital LLC
220 36th Street
Brooklyn, NY 11232
Represented By
Mayfair Business Capital LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Performers Theatre Workshop, Inc.
5 Broadview Avenue
Maplewood, NJ 07040
Represented By
Douglas J. McGill
Webber Mcgill LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Thursday, March 27, 2025
52 52 misc Request to Enter Default Judgment Thu 03/27 8:41 AM
Request to Enter Default Judgment Against Phantom Advance filed by Douglas J. McGill on behalf of Performers Theatre Workshop, Inc.. (McGill, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of Dean Kravitz
Att: 2 Proposed Order
51 51 misc Request to Enter Default Judgment Thu 03/27 8:38 AM
Request to Enter Default Judgment Against Mayfair Business Capital, LLC filed by Douglas J. McGill on behalf of Performers Theatre Workshop, Inc.. (McGill, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of Dean Kravitz
Att: 2 Proposed Order
50 50 misc Request to Enter Default Judgment Thu 03/27 8:37 AM
Request to Enter Default Judgment Against Kash Advance, LLC filed by Douglas J. McGill on behalf of Performers Theatre Workshop, Inc.. (McGill, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of Dean Kravitz
Att: 2 Proposed Order
49 49 misc Request to Enter Default Judgment Thu 03/27 8:35 AM
Request to Enter Default Judgment Against Amerifi Capital, LLC filed by Douglas J. McGill on behalf of Performers Theatre Workshop, Inc.. (McGill, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of Dean Kravitz
Att: 2 Proposed Order
court Hearing Held and Continued Thu 03/27 2:46 PM
Minute of Hearing Held and Continued from 3/27/2025 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 05/22/2025 at 10:00 AM, VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (mcp)
Related: [-] 48 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ADVERSARY PROCEEDING SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION OR OTHER APPROPRIATE RELIEF GRANTED . Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/9/2024.