Original Case: 1:99-cv-03329

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:14-cv-03961
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Oct 23, 2014
Terminated:Sep 26, 2016
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 28, 2016 7:32 AM EDT
Defendant
Susan Jalowski, Esq., Individually & As Special Assistant Corporation Counsel
Defendant
John/Jane Doe, As Agents Of ACS
Defendant
Arnold Elman, As Supervisor Of Office Of Advocacy Of ACS
Defendant
Cyril E. Jermin, I & R Worker Unit 2554 Of ACS
Defendant
Daniel Turbow, Individually & As Brooklyn Family Court Judge
Defendant
Michael A. Ambrosio, Individually & As A Former Brooklyn Family Court Judge
Defendant
Joseph Lauria, Individually & As Brooklyn Family Court Administrative Judge
Defendant
Philip C. Segal, Individually & As A Brooklyn Family Court Judge
Defendant
Corporation Counsel of the City of New York
Defendant
Michael Hess, Individually & As Corporation Counsel
Defendant
Gerald Harris, Individually & As Special Assistant Corporation Counsel
Defendant
Jennifer Jones Austin, As Associate General Counsel Of New York City
Defendant
Ronald Bateau, Individually & As ACS Case Manager
Defendant
Estajo Koslow, Esq. Individually & As Law Guardian, Agent For The Legal Aid Society
Defendant
Molly Dieterich, Individually & As Social Worker And Agent For The Legal Aid Society
Defendant
Marc Berk, Esq., Individually & As Assigned 18-B Attorney
Defendant
Richard Colodny, Esq., Individually & As Assigned 18-B Attorney
Defendant
Saint Joseph For Children And Families Services
Defendant
Ms. Benedict Peirce, Individually & As Supervisor Of St. Joseph
Defendant
Ms. Joyce Baldwin, Individually & As A Foster Parent And Agent Of St. Joseph
Defendant
Edwin Gould For Children Services Incorporated
Defendant
Arthur Zanko, Individually & As Executive Director Of Edwin Gould
Defendant
Mr. Ted Marrinaro, Individually & As Supervisor Of Edwin Gould
Defendant
Mr. F. Balon, Individually & As Supervisor ACS
Defendant
Carolyn Lumpkin, Individually
Defendant
Shakima Canty, Individually
Defendant
Regina Davis, Individually
Defendant
Ms. Alana Kay Gore, Individually & As Caseworker Of Edwin Gould And John & Jane Doe As Agents Of Edwin Gould
Defendant
Ms. Corlora Turnquest, Individually & As Caseworker Of Edwin Gould
Defendant
Cadija R. Tibbs, Individually & As Caseworker Of Edwin Gould
Defendant
City of New York
Defendant
Rudolph W. Giuliani, Individually & As Mayor Of The City Of New York
Defendant
Fred Levitan, Individually & As Regional Director Of The New York City Regional Office Of Children &Family Services (NYCOCFS)
Defendant
Administration For Children's Services, (ACS)
Defendant
Nicholas Scoppetta, Individually & As Commissioner of ACS
Defendant
Hattie L. Lucas, Individually & As Director Parents'/Children's Rights Unit, ACS Office Of Advocacy
Defendant
Viviane Demilly, Individually & As Deputy Director Of Parents'/Children's Rights Unit Of ACS Office Of Advocacy
Defendant
Cyprian Belle, Individually & As Brooklyn Borough Director Field Office Of ACS
Defendant
Ms. Giakas, As Supervisor ACS
Defendant
Ms. Duran, As Deputy Director ACS
Defendant
Ms. Akhazeti, As Supervisor ACS
Defendant
Ms. Teressa Hardgrove, Supervisor ACS
Defendant - Appellee
Mr. Timothy Woo, Individually & As ACS Caseworker
Represented By
Pamela Seider Dolgow
New York City Law Department
contact info
Fay Sue Ng
New York City Law Department
contact info
Plaintiff
Sonny B. Southerland, Jr.
Represented By
Sonny B. Southerland Jr.
-
contact info
Plaintiff
Ciara M.
Plaintiff
Sonny B. Southerland, Sr.
Represented By
Sonny B. Southerland Sr.
-
contact info
Plaintiff
Emmanuel Felix
Plaintiff - Appellant
Elizabeth Felix
Represented By
Michael G. O'Neill
Law Office of Michael G. O'Neill
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Kiam Felix
Represented By
Michael G. O'Neill
Law Office of Michael G. O'Neill
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Nathaniel Southerland
Represented By
Michael G. O'Neill
Law Office of Michael G. O'Neill
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Sonny B. Southerland, Jr.
Represented By
Michael G. O'Neill
Law Office of Michael G. O'Neill
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Venus Southerland
Represented By
Michael G. O'Neill
Law Office of Michael G. O'Neill
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/19/2021 6:46 PM EST
Thursday, October 23, 2014
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL CROSS APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellants Elizabeth Felix, Kiam Felix, Nathaniel Southerland, Sonny B. Southerland, Jr. and Venus Southerland, FILED. [1352449] 14-3961 [Entered: 10/23/2014 02:26 PM]
Related: [-]
2 2 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 09/09/2014, RECEIVED.[1352456] 14-3961 [Entered: 10/23/2014 02:28 PM]
Related: [-]
3 3 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1352457] 14-3780 14-3961 [Entered: 10/23/2014 02:30 PM]
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTE: See lead case, 14-3780 containing complete set of docket entries.[1352459] 14-3961 [Entered: 10/23/2014 02:31 PM]
Related: [-]