New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Brian M Cogan
Referred: Lois Bloom
Case #: 1:99-cv-03329
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jun 09, 1999
Re-opened:Oct 25, 2012
Terminated:Sep 09, 2014
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 17, 2015 9:14 PM EDT
Defendant
Mr. Timothy Woo
Represented By
Theresa Crotty
Nyc Law Department
contact info
Mark Galen Toews
New York City Law Department
contact info
Janice Casey Silverberg
New York City Law Department
contact info
Carolyn Elizabeth Kruk
Nyc Law Department, General Litigation Division
contact info
Martin John Bowe
The City Of New York
contact info
Andrew James Rauchberg
New York City Law Department
contact info
Plaintiff
Nathaniel S.
Represented By
Michael G. O'Neill
contact info
Corey Scott Stark
Law Offices Of Michael G. O'Neill
contact info
Aaron N Solomon
The Law Office Of Michael G. O'Neill
contact info
Plaintiff
Kiam F.
Represented By
Michael G. O'Neill
contact info
Corey Scott Stark
Law Offices Of Michael G. O'Neill
contact info
Aaron N Solomon
The Law Office Of Michael G. O'Neill
contact info
Plaintiff
Sonny B. S. Jr.
Represented By
Michael G. O'Neill
contact info
Corey Scott Stark
Law Offices Of Michael G. O'Neill
contact info
Aaron N Solomon
The Law Office Of Michael G. O'Neill
contact info
Plaintiff
Sonny B. Southerland, Sr.
52 South Street
Staten Island, NY 10310
Represented By
Brian King
Kfirm LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Elizabeth F.
Represented By
Michael G. O'Neill
contact info
Corey Scott Stark
Law Offices Of Michael G. O'Neill
contact info
Aaron N Solomon
The Law Office Of Michael G. O'Neill
contact info
Plaintiff
Venus S.
Represented By
Michael G. O'Neill
contact info
Corey Scott Stark
Law Offices Of Michael G. O'Neill
contact info
Aaron N Solomon
The Law Office Of Michael G. O'Neill
contact info
Plaintiff
Emmanuel F.
Represented By
Michael G. O'Neill
contact info
Corey Scott Stark
Law Offices Of Michael G. O'Neill
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Hattie L. Lucas
Terminated: 05/25/2012
Defendant
Ms. Giakas
Terminated: 05/25/2012
Defendant
Rudolph W. Giuliani
Terminated: 05/25/2012
Represented By
Antoinette W. Blanchette
New York State Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Ms. Teressa Hardgrove
Terminated: 05/25/2012
Defendant
Gerald Harris
Terminated: 05/25/2012
Represented By
Antoinette W. Blanchette
New York State Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Michael Hess
Terminated: 05/25/2012
Represented By
Antoinette W. Blanchette
New York State Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Esq. Susan Jalowski
Terminated: 05/25/2012
Defendant
Cyril E. Jermin
Terminated: 05/25/2012
Defendant
John and Jane Doe
Terminated: 05/25/2012
Defendant
Esq. Estajo Koslow
Terminated: 05/25/2012
Defendant
Joseph Lauria
Terminated: 05/25/2012
Defendant
Fred Levitan
Terminated: 05/25/2012
Defendant
Ms. Alana Kay Gore
Terminated: 05/25/2012
Defendant
Carolyn Lumpkin
Terminated: 05/25/2012
Defendant
Mr. Ted Marrinaro
Terminated: 05/25/2012
Defendant
Ms. Benedict Peirce
Terminated: 05/25/2012
Represented By
Kristin G. Shea
Conway Farrell Curtin & Kelly
contact info
Joseph H. Farrell
contact info
Defendant
Saint Joseph For Children And Families Services
Terminated: 11/08/2004
Represented By
Kristin G. Shea
Conway Farrell Curtin & Kelly
contact info
Joseph H. Farrell
contact info
Defendant
Nicholas Scoppetta
Terminated: 05/25/2012
Represented By
Antoinette W. Blanchette
New York State Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Philip C. Segal
Terminated: 05/25/2012
Defendant
Cadija R. Tibbs
Terminated: 05/25/2012
Defendant
Daniel Turbow
Terminated: 05/25/2012
Defendant
Ms. Corlora Turnquest
Terminated: 05/25/2012
Defendant
Arthur Zanko
Terminated: 05/25/2012
Defendant
Arnold Elman
Terminated: 05/25/2012
Defendant
Administration for Children Services
Terminated: 05/25/2012
Represented By
Janice Casey Silverberg
New York City Law Department
contact info
Defendant
Ms. Akhazeti
Terminated: 05/25/2012
Defendant
Michael A. Ambrosio
Terminated: 05/25/2012
Defendant
Jennifer Jones Austin
Terminated: 05/25/2012
Defendant
Ms. Joyce Baldwin
Terminated: 05/25/2012
Defendant
Mr. F. Balon
Terminated: 05/25/2012
Defendant
Ronald Bateau
Terminated: 05/25/2012
Defendant
Cyprian Belle
Terminated: 05/25/2012
Defendant
Esq. Marc Berk
Terminated: 05/25/2012
Represented By
Erin Anne O'Leary
Morgan, Melhuish Monaghan Arvidson Abrutyn & Lisowski
contact info
Defendant
Shakima Canty
Terminated: 05/25/2012
Defendant
City of New York
Terminated: 05/25/2012
Represented By
Madonna Marie Kasbohn
Nyc Law Dept
contact info
Theresa Crotty
Nyc Law Department
contact info
Janice Casey Silverberg
New York City Law Department
contact info
Martin John Bowe
The City Of New York
contact info
Defendant
Corporation Counsel For The City Of New York
Terminated: 05/25/2012
Represented By
Theresa Crotty
Nyc Law Department
contact info
Janice Casey Silverberg
New York City Law Department
contact info
Defendant
Edwin Gould For Children Services Inc.
Terminated: 05/25/2012
Defendant
Ms. Duran
Terminated: 05/25/2012
Defendant
John Doe
Terminated: 05/25/2012
Defendant
Molly Dieterich
Terminated: 05/25/2012
Defendant
Viviane Demilly
Terminated: 05/25/2012
Defendant
Regina Davis
Terminated: 05/25/2012
Individually 811 Flushing Avenue Apt. 19-G
Brooklyn, NY 11206
Defendant
Esq. Richard Colodny
Terminated: 05/25/2012
Represented By
Ira L. Eras
contact info
Plaintiff
Ciara M.
Terminated: 05/25/2012
Represented By
Michael G. O'Neill
contact info
Corey Scott Stark
Law Offices Of Michael G. O'Neill
contact info

GPO Aug 02 2006
MEMORANDUM AND OPINIONFor the reasons set forth in the attached memorandum opinion and order the infant compromise order approving settlement of the claims is denied. Ordered by Judge Charles P. Sifton on 08/02/2006. (Sifton, Charles)
GPO Oct 02 2007
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION For the reasons set forth in the attached memorandum opinion and order, defendants' motion for summary judgment is granted. The clerk is directed to furnish a copy of the within to the parties and to the magistrate judge. Ordered by Judge Charles P. Sifton on September 27, 2007. (Sifton, Charles)
GPO Oct 03 2013
ORDER denying 322 Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction. See attached Decision and Order. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 10/3/2013. (Cogan, Brian)
GPO Feb 24 2014
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 358 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Mr. King is not qualified to practice in this Court. The motion for pro hac vice admission is therefore denied. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 2/24/2014. (Cogan, Brian)
GPO Sep 09 2014
MEMORANDUM DECISION. Upon the verdict of the jury and this decision, the Clerk is directed to enter judgment against defendant in the amount of $10,000 in favor of plaintiff Sonny Southerland, Sr., and $75,000 each in favor of plaintiffs Sonny Southerland Jr., Venus Southerland, Nathaniel Southerland, Kiam Felix, and Elizabeth Felix. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/9/2014. C/M by Chambers. (Barrett, C)
GPO Sep 10 2014
AMENDED MEMORANDUM DECISION re 379 Memorandum Decision. Upon the verdict of the jury and this decision, the Clerk is directed to enter judgment against defendant in the amount of $10,000 in favor of plaintiff Sonny Southerland, Sr., and $75,000 each in favor of plaintiffs Sonny Southerland Jr., Venus Southerland, Nathaniel Southerland, Kiam Felix, and Elizabeth Felix. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/10/2014. C/M by Chambers. (Barrett, C)

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, March 07, 2017
407 407 order Order(Other) Tue 03/07 2:18 PM
ORDER re406 STIPULATION and proposed Order of settlement and discontinuance of Plaintiffs' application for attorneys' fees, costs, and expenses by Timothy Woo. Plaintiffs' motion for attorneys' fees is hereby resolved and withdrawn with prejudice. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 3/6/2017 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 06, 2017
406 406 misc Stipulation Mon 03/06 5:30 PM
STIPULATION and proposed Order of settlement and discontinuance of Plaintiffs' application for attorneys' fees, costs, and expenses by Timothy Woo (Rauchberg, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 02, 2017
405 405 misc Letter Thu 03/02 7:17 PM
Letter reporting agreement re attys fees by Elizabeth F., Kiam F., Nathaniel S., Sonny B. S. Jr., Venus S. (O'Neill, Michael)
Related: [-]