District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Rudolph Contreras
Case #: 1:23-cv-02036
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jul 14, 2023
Terminated:Mar 25, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 10, 2024 4:07 AM EST
Defendant
DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA GOVERNMENT
Represented By
Liran Koropitzer
Dc Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
David B. Jastrab
Dc Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Steven Nathan Rubenstein
Office Of Attorney General/dc
contact info
Plaintiff
BARON JAMAL BELL
12212 Asbury Drive
Fort Washington, MD 20744
Represented By
David A. Branch
Law Offices Of David A. Branch & Associates, PLLC
contact info

GPO Jun 05 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION granting 5 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and granting Plaintiff leave to file amended complaint. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 6/5/2024. (lcrc3)
GPO Mar 25 2025
MEMORANDUM OPINION granting 22 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; granting 27 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Surreply. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/25/2025. (lcrc3)

Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
appeal USCA Case Number Fri 04/25 11:35 AM
USCA Case Number 25-7057 for30 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by BARON JAMAL BELL. (mg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
31 31 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Thu 04/24 3:13 PM
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid re30 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court,. (mg)
Related: [-]
30 30 appeal Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Thu 04/24 3:11 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to28 Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Motion to Dismiss,29 Memorandum & Opinion by BARON JAMAL BELL. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number 209418. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (mg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
29 29 14 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Tue 03/25 1:25 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION granting22 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; granting27 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Surreply. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/25/2025. (lcrc3)
Related: [-]
28 28 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 03/25 1:22 PM
ORDER granting22 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; granting27 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Surreply. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/25/2025. (lcrc3)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
order .Order Thu 03/20 2:25 PM
ENTERED IN ERROR - PARTIES SHALL DISREGARD THE FOLLOWING ORDER ENTERED BY THE COURT..............MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of25 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that deadlines in this matter shall remain stayed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before April 11, 2025, if the matter has not been dismissed by that date, updating the Court regarding the status of mediation. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/20/2025. (lcrc3)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
27 27 motion Leave to File Document Fri 09/20 3:14 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by BARON JAMAL BELL.(mg) (mg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Att: 2 (9/20/2024) Surreply,
Att: 3 (9/20/2024) Certification,
Att: 4 (9/20/2024) Exhibit 1,
Att: 5 (9/20/2024) Exhibit 2,
Att: 6 (9/20/2024) Exhibit 3,
Att: 7 (9/20/2024) Exhibit 4,
Att: 8 (9/20/2024) Exhibit 5,
Att: 9 (9/20/2024) Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, September 05, 2024
26 26 respm Reply to opposition to motion Thu 09/05 3:17 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re22 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA GOVERNMENT. (Jastrab, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
25 25 misc Errata Thu 08/29 2:05 PM
ERRATA OF Memorandum by BARON JAMAL BELL re24 Memorandum in Opposition. (mg) (Main Document 25 replaced on 8/29/2024) (mg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
24 24 1 pgs respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Thu 08/29 1:54 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re22 Motion to Dismiss filed by BARON JAMAL BELL.(mg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, August 12, 2024
23 23 order .Order Mon 08/12 7:31 AM
FOX/NEAL ORDER advising Plaintiff to respond by September 9, 2024, to22 Defendant's motion to dismiss amended complaint or the Court may deem the matter conceded. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/12/2024. (lcrc3)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 08/12 9:41 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 9/9/2024. (tj)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
22 22 motion Dismiss Fri 08/09 4:27 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA GOVERNMENT.(Jastrab, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Def.'s Ex. 3--Grant Email,
Att: 2 Exhibit Def.'s Ex. 4--Summary Removal
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
20 20 8 pgs respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Wed 07/17 7:27 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by BARON JAMAL BELL. (mg)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 07/15 1:46 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer: It is hereby ordered that Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint on or before August 9, 2024. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/15/2024. (lcrc3)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 07/15 5:51 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 8/9/2024, (tj)
Related: [-]
Sunday, July 14, 2024
19 19 notice Notice (Other) Sun 07/14 3:00 PM
NOTICE certifying service by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA GOVERNMENT re18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer (Jastrab, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
18 18 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 07/12 7:31 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA GOVERNMENT. (Jastrab, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
21 21 misc Errata Wed 07/17 8:41 PM
ERRATA by BARON JAMAL BELL re17 Amended Complaint.(mg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Certification
Friday, July 05, 2024
17 17 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 07/08 11:22 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA GOVERNMENT with Jury Demand filed by BARON JAMAL BELL.(mg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
16 16 14 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Wed 06/05 3:15 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION granting5 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and granting Plaintiff leave to file amended complaint. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 6/5/2024. (lcrc3)
Related: [-]
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 06/05 3:09 PM
ORDER granting5 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and granting Plaintiff leave to file amended complaint. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 6/5/2024. (lcrc3)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 06/05 4:08 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/5/2024. (lsj)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2023
order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Thu 12/14 4:36 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney: Upon consideration of David A. Branch's Motion to Withdraw, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is granted. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12 14-2023 (lcrc3)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Thu 12/14 6:01 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's11 Motion for Extension of Time and13 Motion for Extension of Time: Upon consideration of the motions, it is hereby ORDERED that the motions are granted *nunc pro tunc*. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the response/opposition attached to ECF No.13 shall be deemed timely filed. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12 14-2023 (lcrc3)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
14 14 respm Reply to opposition to motion Wed 12/06 3:20 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA GOVERNMENT.(Jastrab, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Def.'s Ex. 2
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 11/30 1:55 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to5 MOTION to Dismiss by BARON JAMAL BELL.(ztth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit
Monday, November 27, 2023
12 12 respm Response to motion Tue 11/28 3:37 PM
RESPONSE re5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by BARON JAMAL BELL. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit)(zjm)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Extension of Time to Tue 11/28 3:33 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time by BARON JAMAL BELL. (zjm)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
10 10 motion Withdraw as Attorney Mon 11/20 8:52 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by BARON JAMAL BELL. (Branch, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 11/16 11:22 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting9 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file his opposition to the motion to dismiss on or before November 20, 2023; Defendant shall file a reply on or before December 6, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11 16-2023 (lcrc3)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 11/15 11:03 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to5 MOTION to Dismiss by BARON JAMAL BELL. (Branch, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 11/08 4:17 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 11/15/2023 Replies due by 11/29/2023. (tj)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2023
8 8 respm Response to motion Thu 10/26 5:43 PM
RESPONSE re6 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA GOVERNMENT. (Jastrab, David)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Substitution of Counsel Thu 10/26 3:32 PM
NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by David B. Jastrab on behalf of DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA GOVERNMENT Substituting for attorney Steven N. Rubenstein (Jastrab, David)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 10/26 10:18 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting6 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall file an opposition on or before November 15, 2023; Defendant shall file a reply on or before November 29, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10 26-2023 (lcrc3)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
6 6 motion Leave to File Document Wed 10/25 11:57 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by BARON JAMAL BELL. (Branch, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 10/12 6:43 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting3 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, nunc pro tunc . Defendant requested an extension until October 10, 2023, and filed5 a motion to dismiss on that date. Although plaintiff opposed the extension, he never articulated such objection in a written opposition. The motion to dismiss is deemed timely filed. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10 12-2023 (lcrc3)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
5 5 motion Dismiss Tue 10/10 9:36 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA GOVERNMENT.(Rubenstein, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Thursday, September 21, 2023
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/21 5:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Liran Koropitzer on behalf of DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA GOVERNMENT (Koropitzer, Liran)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
3 3 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 09/18 4:46 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA GOVERNMENT. (Rubenstein, Steven)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 17, 2023
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued as to DCAG,DCDFT, Mayor Mon 07/17 10:11 AM
SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA GOVERNMENT, District of Columbia Attorney General, and the District of Columbia Mayor.(zljn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 07/17 10:05 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zljn)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 14, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 07/14 9:49 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10208227) filed by BARON JAMAL BELL.(Branch, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons