Original Case: 1:23-cv-02036

D.C. Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cvpri-07057
Typecivil private / private
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 28, 2025 5:14 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
District of Columbia Government
Represented By
Caroline S. Van Zile
Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Baron Jamal Bell
Represented By
Baron Jamal Bell
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 5:14 AM EDT
Friday, April 25, 2025
PRIVATE CIVIL CASE docketed. 25-7057
Related: [-]
CERTIFIED AND FIRST CLASS MAIL SENT [2112862] with return receipt requested [Receipt No.9589 0710 5270 2357 8584 85] of order [2112851-5]. Certified Mail Receipt due 05/27/2025 from Baron Jamal Bell. 25-7057
Related: [-]
21 pgs NOTICE OF APPEAL [2112844] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:23-cv-02036-RC filed by Baron Jamal Bell. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 25-7057 25-7057
Related: [-]
2 pgs CLERK'S ORDER [2112851] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 05/27/2025. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 05/27/2025. APPELLANT statement of issues due 05/27/2025. APPELLANT underlying decision due 05/27/2025. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 05/27/2025. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 05/27/2025. APPELLANT transcript status report due 05/27/2025. APPELLANT procedural motions due 05/27/2025. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 06/09/2025; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 05/27/2025. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 05/27/2025. APPELLEE procedural motions due 05/27/2025. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 06/09/2025. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. 25-7057
Related: [-]