Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 9:22-bk-10886

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Erik P Kimball
Case #: 9:23-ap-01144
Nature of Suit41 Bankruptcy - Objection / revocation of discharge - §727(c),(d),(e)
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Jul 14, 2023
Terminated:Dec 04, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Panagiotis Kechagias
10310 Boca Woods Ln
Boca Raton, FL 33428
Represented By
Panagiotis Kechagias
contact info
Plaintiff
Sacramento Energy Resources LLC
201 East Las Olas Boulevard, Suite 1800
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301
Represented By
Eyal Berger, Esq.
Akerman LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, December 04, 2023
20 20 court Close Adversary Case Mon 12/04 3:06 PM
Adversary Case 9:23-ap-1144 Closed. Consent Judgment in Favor of Plaintiff (Leonard, Dawn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 11/16 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 11/15/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Notice of Entry (Re:12 Consent Final Judgment in Favor of Sacramento Energy Resources, LLC Against Panagiotis Kechagias. (Eisenberg, Randy) )
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 11/16 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 11/15/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Consent Final Judgment in Favor of Sacramento Energy Resources, LLC Against Panagiotis Kechagias. (Eisenberg, Randy)
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 11/16 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 11/15/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Agreed Order Granting Amended Agreed Ex Parte Motion for Entry of Consent Judgment. Re: 10 (Eisenberg, Randy)
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 11/16 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 11/15/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Notice of Entry (Re:12 Consent Final Judgment in Favor of Sacramento Energy Resources, LLC Against Panagiotis Kechagias. (Eisenberg, Randy) )
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
15 15 attydoc Certificate of Service [Attorney] Tue 11/14 8:59 AM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Patrick R Dorsey Related [+]. (Dorsey, Patrick)
Related: [-] 11 Order on Miscellaneous Motion
Monday, November 13, 2023
14 14 attydoc Certificate of Service [Attorney] Mon 11/13 4:42 PM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Eyal Berger Esq. Related [+]. (Berger, Eyal)
Related: [-] 12 Judgment
13 13 4 pgs court Notice of Entry of Judgment Mon 11/13 1:59 PM
Notice of Entry Related [+] (Eisenberg, Randy)
Related: [-] 12 Consent Final Judgment in Favor of Sacramento Energy Resources, LLC Against Panagiotis Kechagias. (Eisenberg, Randy)
12 12 4 pgs order Judgment Mon 11/13 1:58 PM
Consent Final Judgment in Favor of Sacramento Energy Resources, LLC Against Panagiotis Kechagias. (Eisenberg, Randy)
Related: [-]
11 11 2 pgs order Miscellaneous Motion Order Mon 11/13 1:54 PM
Agreed Order Granting Amended Agreed Ex Parte Motion for Entry of Consent Judgment. Re: # 10 (Eisenberg, Randy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
10 10 8 pgs motion Miscellaneous Motion Thu 11/09 1:01 PM
Amended Motion for Entry of Consent Judgment - Agreed Ex Parte Filed by Defendant Panagiotis Kechagias (Dorsey, Patrick)
Related: [-]
9 9 4 pgs motion Miscellaneous Motion Thu 11/09 12:54 PM
Agreed Motion for Entry of Consent Judgment Ex Parte Filed by Defendant Panagiotis Kechagias (Dorsey, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 16, 2023
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 09/17 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 09/16/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order Continuing Scheduling Conference (Re: 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Sacramento Energy Resources LLC). Scheduling Conference to be held on 11/15/2023 at 09:30 AM Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom B, West Palm Beach, FL, 33401. (Eisenberg, Randy)
Thursday, September 14, 2023
7 7 attydoc Certificate of Service [Attorney] Thu 09/14 3:18 PM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Patrick R Dorsey Related [+]. (Dorsey, Patrick)
Related: [-] 6 Order Continuing Status/Scheduling Conference
6 6 2 pgs order Order Continuing Status/Scheduling Conference Thu 09/14 10:38 AM
Order Continuing Scheduling Conference Related [+]. Scheduling Conference to be held on 11/15/2023 at 09:30 AM Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom B, West Palm Beach, FL, 33401. (Eisenberg, Randy)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Sacramento Energy Resources LLC
Friday, September 08, 2023
5 5 21 pgs notice Notice of Filing Fri 09/08 2:58 PM
Notice of Filing Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement , Filed by Defendant Panagiotis Kechagias. (Dorsey, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 31, 2023
4 4 attydoc Certificate of Service [Attorney] Mon 07/31 11:17 AM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Eyal Berger Esq. Related [+]. (Berger, Eyal)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Sacramento Energy Resources LLC,2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference,3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines
Friday, July 14, 2023
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Fri 07/14 2:59 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. (Eisenberg, Randy)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference
2 2 3 pgs court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Fri 07/14 2:57 PM
Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Panagiotis Kechagias Answer Due 8/14/2023 Related [+] Scheduling Conference to be held on 09/13/2023 at 09:30 AM Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom B, West Palm Beach, FL, 33401. (Eisenberg, Randy)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 23-01144 Complaint by Sacramento Energy Resources LLC against Panagiotis Kechagias. Nature of Suit:,(62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)),(41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))) filed by Plaintiff Sacramento Energy Resources LLC
1 1 35 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 07/14 2:20 PM
Adversary case 23-01144 Complaint by Sacramento Energy Resources LLC against Panagiotis Kechagias. Nature of Suit:,(62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)),(41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))) (Berger, Eyal)
Related: [-]