Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-10165

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Martin Glenn
Case #: 1:23-ap-01142
Nature of Suit65 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - other
Case Filed:Jul 19, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Joseph Klaynberg
8 East 48th Street Apt. 4C
New York, NY 10017
Represented By
Joseph Klaynberg
contact info
Plaintiff
Series 2020A of Nahla Capital LLC
Represented By
Robert A. Rich
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, May 21, 2025
28 28 misc Affidavit of Service Wed 05/21 10:12 AM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by Robert A. Rich on behalf of Series 2020A of Nahla Capital LLC. (Rich, Robert)
Related: [-] 27
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
27 27 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Tue 05/20 11:49 AM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing /Notice of Adjournment of Case Management Conference filed by Robert A. Rich on behalf of Series 2020A of Nahla Capital LLC. with hearing to be held on 6/12/2025 at 02:00 PM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (MG) (Rich, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
26 26 misc Affidavit of Service Wed 04/16 10:17 AM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by Robert A. Rich on behalf of Series 2020A of Nahla Capital LLC. (Rich, Robert)
Related: [-] 25
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
25 25 notice Notice, Hearing Tue 04/15 12:29 PM
Notice of Hearing /Notice of Case Management Conference filed by Robert A. Rich on behalf of Series 2020A of Nahla Capital LLC. with hearing to be held on 6/4/2025 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (MG) (Rich, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
24 24 order Scheduling Order Thu 12/12 9:22 AM
Scheduling Order signed on 12/12/2024. Related [+] Case Management Conference to be held on 4/10/2025 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (MG). (Anderson, Deanna)
Related: [-] 22 ,7
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
23 23 misc Affidavit of Service Wed 12/11 4:09 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by Robert A. Rich on behalf of Series 2020A of Nahla Capital LLC. (Rich, Robert)
Related: [-] 22
22 22 misc Letter Wed 12/11 3:31 PM
Letter /Request for Entry of Scheduling Order Filed by Robert A. Rich on behalf of Series 2020A of Nahla Capital LLC.(Rich, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
21 21 order Motion, Withdraw as Attorney Tue 10/29 8:57 AM
Order, Signed on 10/29/2024, Granting Motion of Gambourg Law Group d/b/a Gambourg & Read, P.C., to Withdraw as Attorney Related [+]. (Anderson, Deanna)
Related: [-] 20
Monday, October 28, 2024
20 20 motion Motion, Withdraw as Attorney Mon 10/28 2:45 PM
Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Roman V Gambourg on behalf of Joseph Klaynberg. (Gambourg, Roman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration - J. Klaynberg
Att: 2 Affidavit of Service
Thursday, July 25, 2024
19 19 order Scheduling Order Thu 07/25 1:18 PM
Scheduling Order Signed on 7/25/2024. Related [+] Case Management Conference to be held on 9/24/2024 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (MG). (Anderson, Deanna)
Related: [-] 18
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
18 18 misc Letter Wed 07/24 2:17 PM
Letter to The Honorable Martin Glenn re Joint Request for Entry of Scheduling Order Related [+] Filed by Robert A. Rich on behalf of Series 2020A of Nahla Capital LLC.(Rich, Robert)
Related: [-] 17
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
17 17 order ~Generic~ Order Wed 07/10 10:41 AM
Minute Order Signed on 7/10/2024. Fact Discovery is Extended Pending Further Order of the Court. It is So Ordered. (Anderson, Deanna)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
16 16 order Scheduling Order Mon 05/13 10:46 AM
Order, signed on 5/13/2024, Extending Fact Discovery Deadline and Rescheduling Case Management Conference. Related [+] Conference to be held on 7/10/2024 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (MG). (Anderson, Deanna)
Related: [-] 15
Friday, May 10, 2024
15 15 misc Letter Fri 05/10 4:34 PM
Letter /Joint Request for Extension of Fact Discovery and Adjournment of Case Management Conference Filed by Robert A. Rich on behalf of Series 2020A of Nahla Capital LLC.(Rich, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, March 07, 2024
14 14 order So Ordered Stipulation Thu 03/07 9:40 AM
Order signed on 3/7/2024 Extending Fact Discovery Deadline and Rescheduling Case Management Conference. Related [+] Conference to be held on 5/13/2024 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (MG). (Anderson, Deanna)
Related: [-] 13 ,12
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
13 13 misc Letter Wed 03/06 8:48 AM
Letter /Joint Request for Extension of Fact Discovery and Adjournment of Case Management Conference Filed by Robert A. Rich on behalf of Series 2020A of Nahla Capital LLC.(Rich, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, February 01, 2024
12 12 order Scheduling Order Thu 02/01 10:50 AM
Revised Order signed on 2/1/2024 Extending Fact Discovery Deadline and Rescheduling Case Management Conference. Related [+] Conference to be held on 3/11/2024 at 02:00 PM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (MG). (Anderson, Deanna)
Related: [-] 11
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
11 11 order Scheduling Order Tue 01/09 10:48 AM
Order signed on 1/9/2024 Extending Fact Discovery Deadline and Rescheduling Case Management Conference. Related [+] Hearing to be held on 3/13/2024 at 02:00 PM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (MG). (Anderson, Deanna)
Related: [-] 10
Monday, January 08, 2024
10 10 misc Letter Mon 01/08 10:50 AM
Letter /Joint Request for Extension of Fact Discovery and Adjournment of Case Management Conference Filed by Robert A. Rich on behalf of Series 2020A of Nahla Capital LLC.(Rich, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, December 15, 2023
9 9 misc Affidavit of Service Fri 12/15 12:09 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by Robert A. Rich on behalf of Series 2020A of Nahla Capital LLC. (Rich, Robert)
Related: [-] 8
Thursday, December 14, 2023
8 8 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Thu 12/14 3:53 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing /Notice of Adjournment of Case Management Conference filed by Robert A. Rich on behalf of Series 2020A of Nahla Capital LLC. with hearing to be held on 2/1/2024 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (MG) (Rich, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
7 7 order Scheduling Order Mon 10/02 3:07 PM
Joint Case Management & Scheduling Order Signed on 10/2/2023. Related [+] Hearing to be held on 1/18/2024 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (MG). (Anderson, Deanna)
Related: [-] 6
Friday, September 29, 2023
6 6 misc Letter Fri 09/29 4:35 PM
Letter /Submission of Joint Case Management & Scheduling Order Filed by Robert A. Rich on behalf of Series 2020A of Nahla Capital LLC.(Rich, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Monday, August 21, 2023
5 5 answer None Tue 08/22 4:12 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] filed by Joseph Klaynberg. (Cantrell, Deirdra)
Related: [-] 1 1
Friday, July 21, 2023
4 4 misc Affidavit of Service Fri 07/21 3:45 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by Robert A. Rich on behalf of Series 2020A of Nahla Capital LLC. (Rich, Robert)
Related: [-] 1 ,3
Thursday, July 20, 2023
3 3 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Thu 07/20 8:46 AM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/31/2023 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (MG), Answer due by 8/21/2023, (Ramos, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 19, 2023
2 2 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Wed 07/19 9:28 AM
Corporate Ownership Statement of Series 2020A of Nahla Capital LLC . Corporate parents added to case: Nahla Vitre Inc.. Filed by Robert A. Rich on behalf of Series 2020A of Nahla Capital LLC. (Rich, Robert)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Wed 07/19 9:19 AM
Adversary case 23-01142 Complaint against Joseph Klaynberg Objecting to Discharge (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (65 (Dischargeability - other)) Filed by Robert A. Rich on behalf of Series 2020A of Nahla Capital LLC. (Rich, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Timeline