Amador Ramirez Jr. v. Ford Motor Company
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-ml-02814
Lead case: 2:18-ml-02814
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Andre Birotte Jr |
Referred: | Pedro V Castillo |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-05764 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jul 17, 2023 |
Case in other court: | California Northern, 5:23-cv-01380 |
Last checked: Saturday Jan 13, 2024 12:54 AM PST |
Petitioner
Amador Ramirez Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Ford Motor Company
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Tuesday, December 12, 2023 | ||
30 | 30
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 12/12 10:42 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: For clarity, the Motion to Stay (Dkt. No. 18) was rendered moot by this case's transfer into the MDL, and once the case was transferred, it was automatically stayed. Accordingly, there are no matters on calendar for December 14, 2023. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb) |
|
Thursday, October 19, 2023 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Thu 10/19 3:45 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christopher Campbell counsel for Petitioner Amador Ramirez Jr.. Adding Christopher Campbell as counsel of record for Amador Ramirez Jr. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Amador Ramirez Jr.. (Attorney Christopher Campbell added to party Amador Ramirez Jr. (pty:pet))(Campbell, Christopher) |
|
Thursday, July 20, 2023 | ||
28 | 28
transfer
MDL - Letter to Counsel (CV 119) - optional html form
Thu 07/20 9:04 AM
Letter to Counsel regarding MDL Transfer-In. (ghap) |
|
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 07/20 9:01 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (ghap) |
|
Wednesday, July 19, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
transfer
Case Transferred In from other District (Electronic Transfer)
Wed 07/19 3:29 PM
ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Northern |
|
Monday, July 17, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
mdlcmp
Copy of Transfer Order/Conditional Transfer Order received
Thu 07/20 8:58 AM
Copy of Conditional Transfer Order - 71 received from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Transfer order filed by MDL panel on 7/13/2023 regarding transfer of Case No. 5:23-cv-1380-BLF from California Northern District (San Jose). Case assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Case consolidated with 2:18-ml-02814-AB-PVC. (ghap) |
|
24 | 24 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO -71) by the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation TRANSFERRING CASE to the United States District Court for the Central District of California, MDL No. 281. (tn, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/19/2023.] | |
case electronically transmitted to the Central District of California. (tn, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/19/2023.] | ||
Monday, July 10, 2023 | ||
23 | 23 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING MOTION HEARING AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AFTER REASSIGNMENT. Motion Hearing as to 18 Ex Parte Application re 17 Notice of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent MOTION to Stay re 17 Notice of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent reset for 12/14/2023 09:00 AM. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/14/2023 11:00 AM. Case Management Statement due by 12/7/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tsh, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/19/2023.] | |
Wednesday, June 28, 2023 | ||
22 | 22 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 6/28/2023.(bw, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/19/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
Tuesday, June 27, 2023 | ||
21 | 21 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND WILL BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/19/2023.] | |
20 | 20 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ford Motor Company..(Sentlinger, Eric) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/19/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
19 | 19 CLERK'S NOTICE RE: Consent or Declination. Defendant is requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 7/3/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/19/2023.] | |
Monday, June 26, 2023 | ||
18 | 18 Ex Parte Application re17 Notice of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent , MOTION to Stay re17 Notice of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent filed by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 7/10/2023. Replies due by 7/17/2023.(Sentlinger, Eric) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/19/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Declaration of Atty iso EPA, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 5 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
17 | 17 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent by Ford Motor Company(Hugret, Spencer) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/19/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
16 | 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Spencer Peter Hugret(Hugret, Spencer) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/19/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
15 | 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Marie Carlson Lambert(Lambert, Sarah) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/19/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
14 | 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Dean Sentlinger(Sentlinger, Eric) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/19/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
13 | 13 Certificate of Interested Entities by Ford Motor Company identifying Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Other Affiliate Black Rock, Inc., Other Affiliate State Street Corporation (parent of State Street Bank and Trust Company, which is the trustee of the FOrd defined contribution plans), Other Affiliate Evercore Trust Company, N.A. (fiduciary of the Ford defined contribution plan) for Ford Motor Company.(Sentlinger, Eric) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/19/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
12 | 12 ANSWER to Complaint byFord Motor Company.(Sentlinger, Eric) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/19/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Friday, June 23, 2023 | ||
11 | 11 STATUS REPORT Unilateral Case Management by Amador Ramirez Jr.. (LaRocque, Elizabeth) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/19/2023.] | |
10 | 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Ann LaRocque (LaRocque, Elizabeth) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/19/2023.] | |
9 | 9 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/28/2023, to 7/26/2023, at 10:00 AM by telephone. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/19/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/19/2023.] | |
Monday, April 24, 2023 | ||
8 | 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Amador Ramirez Jr... (Tracy, Michael) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/19/2023.] | |
Monday, April 10, 2023 | ||
7 | 7 CLERK'S NOTICE RE: Consent or Declination. All parties are requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 4/24/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/19/2023.] | |
Monday, March 27, 2023 | ||
6 | 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amador Ramirez Jr.. Ford Motor Company served on 3/27/2023, answer due 4/17/2023. (Dolin, Tionna) Modified on 3/28/2023 (slh, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/19/2023.] | |
Friday, March 24, 2023 | ||
5 | 5 Summons Issued as to Ford Motor Company. (tn, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/19/2023.] | |
4 | 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/21/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/28/2023 at 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (tn, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/19/2023.] | |
3 | 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/7/2023. (mbc, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/19/2023.] | |
Thursday, March 23, 2023 | ||
2 | 2 Proposed Summons. (Dolin, Tionna) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/19/2023.] | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT for Violation of Statutory Obligations; Jury Trial Demanded against Ford Motor Company, (Filing Fee: $402.00, receipt number ACANDC-18103553). Filed by Amador Ramirez Jr..(Dolin, Tionna) Modified on 3/24/2023 (tn, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/19/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A |