South Carolina District Court
Judge:Sherri A Lydon
Case #: 3:23-cv-03483
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Jul 20, 2023
Terminated:Mar 25, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 16, 2024 3:56 AM EST
Defendant
Enerco Group, Inc.
Represented By
E Raymond Moore, III
Murphy And Grantland
contact info
Scott Schillings
Hinkle Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jesse Near
Represented By
Brady Ryan Thomas
Richardson Thomas Haltiwanger Moore And Lewis (col)
contact info
Sherod Hampton Eadon, III
Harris And Graves
contact info
Brendan Joseph Green
Richardson Thomas LLC
contact info
Christopher James Moore
Richardson Thomas Haltiwanger Moore And Lewis (col)
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 02, 2025
66 66 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/02 3:17 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Santino Umberto Ambrosini on behalf of Enerco Group, Inc. (Ambrosini, Santino)
Related: [-]
65 65 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 05/02 3:09 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re63 MOTION to Stay re60 Bill of Costs and OBJECTIONS to bill of costs Response filed by Enerco Group, Inc..Reply to Response to Motion due by 5/12/2025 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Ambrosini, Santino)
Related: [-]
64 64 misc Bill of Costs Fri 05/02 3:03 PM
BILL OF COSTS Amended by Enerco Group, Inc..Objections to Bill of Costs deadline 5/16/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6.(Ambrosini, Santino)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Bill of Cost Itemization with Support Docs