Original Case: 3:23-cv-03483

Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cv.pr-01375
Typecivil private / private
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 11, 2025 5:58 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
ENERCO GROUP, INC., d/b/a Mr. Heater
Represented By
Scott Schillings
HINKLE LAW FIRM LLC
contact info
Edward Raymond Moore III
MURPHY & GRANTLAND, PA
contact info
Cordes Baxter Kennedy
ROBINSON GRAY STEPP & LAFFITTE, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
JESSE NEAR, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Douglas Larry Belger Estate of Douglas Larry Belger
Represented By
Christopher Moore
RICHARDSON THOMAS LLC
contact info
William Camden Lewis
RICHARDSON THOMAS LLC
contact info
Brendan Joseph Green
RICHARDSON THOMAS LLC
contact info
Sherod Hampton Eadon III
EADON LAW LLC
contact info
Brady Ryan Thomas
RICHARDSON THOMAS LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/11/2025 4:40 AM EDT
Thursday, April 10, 2025
1 1 1 pgs Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:23-cv-03483-SAL. Case manager: GAboutabl. [1001751481] 25-1375 GMA [Entered: 04/10/2025 03:02 PM]
Related: [-]
2 2 7 pgs DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case Originating case number: 3:23-cv-03483-SAL. Mailed to: Sherod Hampton Eadon III, Brendan Joseph Green, Cordes Baxter Kennedy, Scott Schillings, Brady Ryan Thomas. [1001751483] 25-1375 GMA [Entered: 04/10/2025 03:05 PM]
Related: [-]