Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-10165

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Martin Glenn
Case #: 1:23-ap-01143
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Jul 20, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Chabad of Gramercy Park
Represented By
Chabad of Gramercy Park
contact info
Plaintiff
Jonathan L. Flaxer, not individually but solely in his capacity as chapter 11 trustee for Joseph Klaynberg
Represented By
Michael S. Devorkin
Golenbock Eiseman Assor Bell & Peskoe LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Friday, May 31, 2024
5 5 notice Notice, Appearance Fri 05/31 4:17 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Courtney Iverson Howard on behalf of Jonathan L. Flaxer, not individually but solely in his capacity as chapter 11 trustee for Joseph Klaynberg. (Howard, Courtney)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2023
4 4 order Scheduling Order Thu 10/05 1:08 PM
Scheduling Order signed on 10/5/2023. (Anderson, Deanna)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
3 3 answer None Tue 08/29 2:42 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] filed by Mitchell Schrage on behalf of Chabad of Gramercy Park. (Schrage, Mitchell)
Related: [-] 1
Friday, July 21, 2023
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Fri 07/21 10:25 AM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/31/2023 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (MG), Answer due by 8/21/2023, (Ramos, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 20, 2023
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint (fee) Thu 07/20 3:15 PM
Adversary case 23-01143 Complaint against Chabad of Gramercy Park (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by Michael S. Devorkin on behalf of Jonathan L. Flaxer, not individually but solely in his capacity as chapter 11 trustee for Joseph Klaynberg. (Devorkin, Michael)
Related: [-]