Kowalewitch et al v. City Of Virginia Beach et al
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Raymond A Jackson |
Referred: | Robert J Krask |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-00369 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Civil Rights Violation |
Case Filed: | Jul 28, 2023 |
Terminated: | Mar 21, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 24, 2024 4:22 AM EST |
Defendant
N.D. Holcomb, III
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Virginia Beach City Council
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Regina Toneatto
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chris Taylor
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mark Stiles
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Joashua Schulman
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jennifer Rouse
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Amelia Ross-Hammond
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Robert Remick
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jeffrey Marks
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Christine Lewis
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rosemary Wilson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Barbara Henley
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sabrina Wooten
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Robert Dyer
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Patrick Duhaney
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
City Of Virginia Beach
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Michael Berlucchi
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
David Belote
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Amanda Barnes
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dean Albowich
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Kowalewitch
824 24th Street
Virginia Beach, VA 23451 |
|
Plaintiff
Donald Edwards
2441 Windward Shore Dr.
Virginia Beach, VA 23451 |
Docket last updated: 05/20/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
85 | 85
1
pgs
appeal
Appeal Remark
Thu 04/11 1:31 PM
Appeal Remark re82 Notice of Appeal : RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 04/25/2024. 24-1309 (epri, ) |
|
84 | 84
2
pgs
appeal
USCA Case Number
Thu 04/11 1:29 PM
USCA Case Number 24-1309 4CCA Case manager Emily Borneisen for82 Notice of Appeal, filed by Richard Kowalewitch, Donald Edwards. 24-1309 (epri, ) |
|
appeal
Assembled INITIAL Electronic Record Transmitted to 4CCA
Thu 04/11 1:36 PM
Assembled INITIAL Electronic Record Transmitted to 4CCA re82 Notice of Appeal. 24-1309 (epri, ) |
||
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
83 | 83
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal to 4CCA
Mon 04/08 4:29 PM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re82 Notice of Appeal, (All case opening forms, plus the transcript guidelines, may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit's website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov)(epri, ) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Appeal, | ||
Att: 2 1 pgs Receipt | ||
82 | 82
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Mon 04/08 4:24 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to80 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by Donald Edwards, Richard Kowalewitch. Filing fee $ 605.(epri, ) |
|
Att: 1 1 pgs Receipt |