Richard Kowalewitch v. City of Virginia Beach
Original Case: 2:23-cv-00369
Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cv.pr-01309 |
Type | civil private / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Apr 14, 2024 5:40 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
AMELIA ROSS-HAMMOND, In their official capacity as members of Virginia Beach City Council
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
REGINA TONEATTO, In her official capacity as Secretary and Clerk to the School Board
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
MARK DOUGLAS STILES, In his official capacity as City Attorney
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
PATRICK DUHANEY, In his official capacity as City Manager
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
AMANDA BARNES, In her official capacity as City Clerk
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
DAVID BELOTE, In their official capacity as members of the Board of Elections
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
DEAN ALBOWICH, In their official capacity as members of the Board of Elections
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
JEFFREY MARKS, In their official capacity as members of the Board of Elections
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
CHRISTINE LEWIS, In her official capacity as Voter Registrar
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
CHRIS TAYLOR, In their official capacity as members of Virginia Beach City Council
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
JOASHUA SCHULMAN, In their official capacity as members of Virginia Beach City Council
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
JENNIFER ROUSE, In their official capacity as members of Virginia Beach City Council
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
ROBERT REMICK, In their official capacity as members of Virginia Beach City Council
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
BARBARA HENLEY, In their official capacity as members of Virginia Beach City Council
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
SABRINA WOOTEN, In their official capacity as members of Virginia Beach City Council
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
MICHAEL BERLUCCHI, In their official capacity as members of Virginia Beach City Council
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
N. D. HOLCOMB, III, In their official capacity as members of Virginia Beach City Council
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
ROSEMARY WILSON, In their official capacity as members of Virginia Beach City Council
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
ROBERT DYER, In their official capacity as members of Virginia Beach City Council
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
VIRGINIA BEACH CITY COUNCIL
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
CITY OF VIRGINIA BEACH
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
RICHARD KOWALEWITCH
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
DONALD EDWARDS
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 1:46 AM EDT |
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
1 | 1 2 pgs Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:23-cv-00369-RAJ-RJK. Case manager: EBorneisen. [1001551106] 24-1309 EB [Entered: 04/11/2024 11:09 AM] | |
2 | 2 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Donald Edwards; Richard Kowalewitch. [1001551161] Informal Opening Brief due 05/06/2024. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. 24-1309 EB [Entered: 04/11/2024 11:59 AM] | |
Att: 1 13 pgs Informal brief and directions | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Disclosure form | ||
3 | 3 1 pgs RECORD requested from Clerk of Court [1001551169]. Due: 04/25/2024. 24-1309 EB [Entered: 04/11/2024 12:04 PM] |