MUNGIN v. CRUZ et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Karen M Williams |
Case #: | 1:23-cv-04078 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa |
Case Filed: | Jul 31, 2023 |
Re-opened: | Dec 18, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jul 03, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Third Circuit, 24-02285 |
Notice Only
nefpsKMW
|
|
Petitioner
MICHAEL MUNGIN
|
|
Respondent
ANDY CRUZ
|
|
Respondent
STEVIE M. KNIGHT
|
Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 21, 2025 | ||
20 | 20
![]() Mail Returned as Undeliverable. RTS. Unable to Forward. Mail sent to MICHAEL MUNGIN, Re: 04/08/2025 Pursuant to Local Rule 79.4, notice. (js) |
|
Tuesday, April 08, 2025 | ||
19 | 19
![]() MANDATE of USCA issued.(ca3tmm, ) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
appeal
Mandate Notice
Tue 04/08 9:28 AM
Pursuant to Local Rule 79.4, notice is hereby given of the Appellate ruling filed on 4/8/2025. In the event that the mandate or judgment provides for costs or directs a disposition other than an affirmance, the prevailing party shall prepare and submit an order implementing the mandate or judgment. (js) |
||
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
![]() USCA Case Number 24-2285 for17 Notice of Appeal (USCA), filed by MICHAEL MUNGIN. USCA Case Manager Timothy McIntyre (Document Restricted - Court Only) (ca3tmm, ) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
![]() NOTICE OF APPEAL as to15 Opinion,16 Order, by MICHAEL MUNGIN. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (No Filing Fee or Application to Proceed IFP Submitted) (js) |
|
Wednesday, July 03, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
![]() ORDER DISMISSING Petitioner's1 Habeas Petition WITHOUT PREJUDICE; the Clerk of Court is directed to serve a copy of this Order and the accompanying Opinion upon the government electronically and upon Petitioner by regular mail and to CLOSE the file. Signed by Judge Karen M. Williams on 7/3/2024. (sms2, n.m.) |
|
15 | 15
![]() OPINION. Signed by Judge Karen M. Williams on 7/3/2024. (sms2) |
|
Wednesday, June 12, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Letter from MICHAEL MUNGIN regarding reply. (dmr) |
|
Tuesday, May 28, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
![]() REPLY to Respondent's Response to Writ of Habeas Corpus by MICHAEL MUNGIN.(dmr) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
![]() LETTER ORDER Granting11 Petitioner's request for an extension of time to reply to10 Response to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Signed by Judge Karen M. Williams on 4/5/2024. (jab,N.M.) |
|
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Letter from MICHAEL MUNGIN addressed to Judge Williams requesting an extension of time to reply to10 Response to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (jab,N.M.) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
![]() RESPONSE re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus.(D'AVERSA, SAMANTHA) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Monday, March 04, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
![]() ORDER GRANTING8 Letter Application to extend time to answer the Petition. Respondent's answer due on 3/18/2024. Signed by Judge Karen M. Williams on 3/4/2024. (dmw, N.M.) |
|
Friday, March 01, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Letter from Respondent Requesting a 14-Day Extension of Time to Answer the Petition. (D'AVERSA, SAMANTHA) |
|
Sunday, February 04, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() LETTER ORDER Granting6 Respondent's Request for an Extension of Time to Answer the Petition. Respondent's Answer is now due on 3/4/2024. Signed by Judge Karen M. Williams on 2/4/2024. (jab,N.M.) |
|
Thursday, February 01, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Letter from Respondents Requesting an Extension of Time to Answer the Petition. (D'AVERSA, SAMANTHA) |
|
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by SAMANTHA R. D'AVERSA on behalf of ANDY CRUZ, STEVIE M. KNIGHT (D'AVERSA, SAMANTHA) |
|
Tuesday, December 19, 2023 | ||
misc
Docket Annotation (public)
Tue 12/19 3:14 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER4 and Petition1 have been emailed to USANJ-HabeasCases@usdoj.gov and sent by regular U.S. mail to Respondent. MEMORANDUM ORDER4 has also been sent by regular U.S. mail to Petitioner. (jab,N.M.) |
||
Monday, December 18, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
![]() MEMORANDUM ORDER TO ANSWER: The Clerk shall re-open this matter for the purposes of this Order. Petitioner's challenge to his safety factors and classification level is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Within 45 days after the date of entry of this Order, Respondent shall file a full and complete answer to Petitioner's FSA credit related claim. Signed by Judge Karen M. Williams on 12/18/2023. (jab,N.M.) |
|
Tuesday, December 12, 2023 | ||
misc
Filing Fee Received
Wed 12/13 10:13 AM
Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number CAM14827 (jab,N.M.) |
||
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Wed 12/13 10:14 AM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed. Please see docket entry1 for Petition. (jab,N.M.) |
||
Thursday, November 30, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
![]() ORDER. Signed by Judge Karen M. Williams on 11/30/23. (nar) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Fri 12/01 9:38 AM
***Civil Case Administratively Terminated. (tf, ) |
||
Monday, November 20, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Letter from MICHAEL MUNGIN regarding First Step Act credits. (jab,N.M.) |
|
Tuesday, August 01, 2023 | ||
misc
Docket Annotation (public)
Tue 08/01 4:05 PM
Petitioner sent in stamps as payment for his habeas petition. The Clerk's office does not accept stamps as a form of payment. The stamps were returned to Petitioner by regular U.S. mail. (jab,N.M.) |
||
Monday, July 31, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
![]() PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Received NO FF/IFP, filed by MICHAEL MUNGIN.(jab,N.M.) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |