Michael Mungin v. Warden Fort Dix FCI, et al
Original Case: 1:23-cv-04078
Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-02285 |
Type | civil / united states as party / usc 2241-prisoner |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Case Filed: | Jul 16, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jan 22, 2025 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 09, 2024 3:53 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
WARDEN FORT DIX FCI
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
STEVIE M. KNIGHT
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
MICHAEL MUNGIN
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/09/2024 3:53 AM EDT |
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (TMM) | ||
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Michael Mungin in District Court No. 1-23-cv-04078. (TMM) | ||
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
![]() |