Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Shad Robinson
Case #: 1:23-bk-10602
Case Filed:Aug 02, 2023
Creditor Meeting:Sep 14, 2023
Discharged:Nov 09, 2023
Discharge Objection Deadline:Nov 06, 2023

Debtor
Roy Quintanilla
PO Box 152555
Austin, TX 78715-2555
Represented By
David K. Sergi
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
John Patrick Lowe
2402 East Main Street
Uvalde, TX 78801


Docket last updated: 11/16/2023 1:20 PM CST
Wednesday, August 02, 2023
ICC-Fee Terminated for Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 (csupld)([LINK 23-10602 ) [caseupld,vol7cu] ( 338.00), Amount $ 338.00, Receipt A23826322 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 Voluntary Petition under Chapter 7 (Individual) Without Schedules, Without Statements, (Filing Fee: $ 338) filed by Roy Quintanilla. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 08/9/2023 (Sergi, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 Certificate of Budget and Credit Counseling-First Debtor filed by Roy Quintanilla. (Sergi, David)
Related: [-]
3 3 Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Lowe, John Patrick added to the case. with 341(a) meeting to be held on 9/7/2023 at 03:00 PM at Via Phone: (888)405-5981; Code: 2733682#. ; Objections to Discharge/Dischargeability due by 11/6/2023 (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]