Kansas District Court
Judge:Julie A Robinson
Referred: Rachel E Schwartz
Case #: 2:23-cv-02339
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Case Filed:Aug 03, 2023
Terminated:Apr 09, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 30, 2024 2:37 AM CST
Defendant
Crowder Construction Company
Represented By
Tyler Gardner
Shook, Hardy & Bacon Llp - Kc/grand
contact info
Defendant
Jordan LaForge
Represented By
Mitchell E. Wood
Halbrook Wood, PC
contact info
Susan Alig
Halbrook Wood, PC
contact info
Kathryn Ann Wright
Halbrook Wood, PC
contact info
Defendant
Tank Connections, L.L.C.
Represented By
Rebecca McMahon
Lathrop Gpm, Llp - Kansas City
contact info
Mitchell E. Wood
Halbrook Wood, PC
contact info
Susan Alig
Halbrook Wood, PC
contact info
David M. Buffo
Law Office Of Meredith L. Moser
contact info
Mara H. Cohara
Lathrop Gpm, Llp - Kansas City
contact info
Kathryn Ann Wright
Halbrook Wood, PC
contact info
Teresa Evelyn Hurla
Lathrop Gpm, Llp - Kansas City
contact info
Plaintiff
C.S.T. Industries, Inc.
Represented By
David B. Raymond
contact info
Sanford L. Michelman
Michelman & Robinson, Llp - La
contact info
Nicole Haff
Michelman & Robinson, Llp - Ny
contact info
Kevin Kim
Michelman & Robinson, Llp - Irvine
contact info
Michael Kelly
contact info
Benjamin Andrew McMillen
contact info
Mona Z. Hanna
Michelman & Robinson, Llp - Irvine
contact info

GPO Feb 08 2024
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 74 MOTION to Seal or Redact Documents 67 PROVISIONALLY SEALED Exhibits, 76 Unopposed MOTION to Seal or Redact Documents 67 PROVISIONALLY SEALED Exhibits. Provisionally sealed Exhibits 9, 10, 12 and 17 to the Kim Declaration, filed as Docs. 67, 67-1, 67-2, and 67-3; and Exhibits 7-10 to the Mueller 5 Declaration, filed as Docs. 67-8, 67-9, 67-10, and 67-11 shall remain sealed and the Clerk is directed to remove the provisional designation from the entries. The Clerk is directed to unseal Exhibits 3-6, and 11 to the Mueller Declaration, filed as Docs. 67-4, 67-5, 67-6, 67-7, and 67-12. Counsel for CST is directed to file the redacted documents--Exhibit 17 to the Kim Declaration, filed as Doc. 67-3; and Exhibit 7 to the Mueller Declaration, filed as Doc. 67-8 and Doc. 38-4-- in the public record within seven (7) days of this Order using the Redacted Document event. Docs. 67-3 and 67-8 will remain sealed and the Clerk is directed to remove the provisional designation from the entries. The Clerk is directed to seal Doc. 38-4. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 02/08/2024. (kmc)
GPO Apr 09 2024
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 64 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 4/9/24. (msb)
GPO Jul 09 2024
Julie A. Robinson on 7/9/2024. (mam)MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Tank's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 57) is granted in part and denied in part. Counts II and V are dismissed; the motion is otherwise denied. LaForge's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 59) is denied. Signed by District Judge
GPO Jul 09 2024
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 135 CST's Motion to Strike and/or Dismiss Defendant Tank Connection, LLC's Counterclaims. The Court grants CST's motion to strike the unfair competition claim and its motion to dismiss the Sherman Act claim. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 7/9/2024. (mam)
GPO Dec 06 2024
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Tank and LaForge's Motion to Seal Their Memorandum in Support of their Motion for Summary Judgment and Exhibits (Doc. 433) is granted in part and denied in part. CST's Motion to Seal (Doc. 431) is granted. The Clerk is directed to permanently seal the following docket entries associated with Tank and LaForge's summary judgment motion: Docs. 419-10, 419-23, 420-9, 420-25, 421-1, 421-4, 421-5. The Clerk is directed to unseal the following docket entries: Docs. 418, 419 (main document and all attachments except 419-10 and 419-23), 420 (main document and all attachments except 420-9 and 420-25), 421, 421-2, 421-3, 421-6, and 423. CST shall file redacted versions of Exhibits K, Y, and JJ in the public record. Tank and LaForge's Motion to Seal Exhibits (Doc. 427) associated with CST's summary judgment motion is granted in part and denied in part as moot. The motion to seal Exhibit U is denied as moot. The motion to seal unredacted Exhibits T and V is granted. The Clerk is directed to permanently seal Docs. 414-2 and 414- 4. The Clerk is directed to unseal Docs. 411, 414, 414-1, 414-3, 414-5, 414-6, and 414-7. Tank and LaForge shall file redacted versions of Exhibits T and V in the public record. Crowder's Motion to Seal its Memorandum in Support of Summary Judgment and Accompanying Exhibits (Doc. 402) is denied. CST's Motion to Seal or Redact Certain Exhibits Filed in Support of Defendant Crowder's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 430) is granted. The Clerk is directed to permanently seal Docs. 400-11, 400-15, 400-19, 400-21, 400-22, and 400-37. The Clerk is directed to unseal Docs. 400, 400-1 through 400-10, 400-12 through 400-14, 400-16 through 400-18, 400- 20, 400-23 through 400-36, and 400-38 through 400-40. CST shall file a redacted version of Exhibit 15 in the public record. Tank and LaForge's Motion to Seal their Memorandum in Support of Motion to Partially Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Mr. Brent Bersin and all Accompanying Exhibits (Doc. 425) is denied. CST's Motion to Redact (Doc. 432) is granted. The Clerk is directed to permanently seal Docs. 409, 409-1, and 409-2. CST shall file redacted versions of these documents in the public record. The parties shall file redacted documents in accordance with this Order by December 10, 2024. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 12/6/2024. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment 1, # (2) Attachment 2) (jal)
GPO Jan 30 2025
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 490 & 491 Motions to seal or redact. See order for details. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 1/29/2025. (msb)
GPO Feb 28 2025
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: The Court finds that public censure is the appropriate sanction, other circumstances make an award of reasonable expenses unjust, and Plaintiff's proposed discovery is disproportional to the needs of the case at this late stage. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on February 28, 2025. (mls)
GPO Apr 09 2025
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 398 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 411 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 416 Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot 499 Motion to Correct; finding as moot 525 Motion to Strike; finding as moot 525 Motion for Leave to Strike. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 4/9/2025. (kas)

Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
534 534 appeal Appeal Number Information Fri 05/09 3:56 PM
APPEAL DOCKETED in 10CCA on 5/9/2025 and assigned Appeal No. 25-3081 re532 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, filed by C.S.T. Industries, Inc. (jal)
Related: [-]
533 533 appeal Preliminary Record on Appeal Sent Fri 05/09 2:27 PM
PRELIMINARY RECORD ON APPEAL transmitted to 10CCA re532 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. (jal)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Preliminary Packet
532 532 appeal Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment Fri 05/09 1:09 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to528 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Order on Provisionally Sealed Motion,,,, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,, Order on Motion to Strike,, Order on Motion for Leave to File, by Plaintiff C.S.T. Industries, Inc.. Filing fee $ 605, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6652593. (McMillen, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
531 531 motion Alter Judgment Wed 05/07 5:14 PM
MOTION to Alter Judgment or Amend by Plaintiff C.S.T. Industries, Inc. (McMillen, Benjamin)
Related: [-]