Original Case: 2:23-cv-02339

Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cv-03081
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Case Filed:May 09, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday May 13, 2025 2:17 AM MDT
Defendant - Appellee
TANK CONNECTIONS, L.L.C.
Represented By
Mitchell E. Wood
Halbrook Wood
contact info
Lauren Ann Mangiameli
Halbrook Wood
contact info
Kathryn Ann Wright
Halbrook Wood
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JORDAN LAFORGE
Represented By
Mitchell E. Wood
Halbrook Wood
contact info
Lauren Ann Mangiameli
Halbrook Wood
contact info
Kathryn Ann Wright
Halbrook Wood
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
CROWDER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY
Represented By
Emily M. Pedersen
Shook, Hardy & Bacon
contact info
Tyler Gardner
Shook, Hardy & Bacon
contact info
Jaycob Simsheuser
Shook, Hardy & Bacon
contact info
William C. Martucci
Shook, Hardy & Bacon
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
CST INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By
Mona Hanna
Michelman & Robinson
contact info
David B. Raymond
Blackwell, Sanders, Peper & Martin
contact info
Jennifer A. Mauri
Michelman & Robinson
contact info
Michael Kelly
Husch Blackwell
contact info
Kevin Kim
Michelman & Robinson
contact info
Sanford L. Michelman
Michelman & Robinson
contact info
Benjamin Andrew McMillen
Husch Blackwell
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 2:17 AM MDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
[11180606] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 05/09/2025 Docketing statement, transcript order form, notice of appearance and disclosure statement due 05/23/2025 for CST Industries, Inc. Disclosure statement due on 05/23/2025 for Crowder Construction Company and Tank Connections, L.L.C.. Notice of appearance due on 05/23/2025 for Crowder Construction Company, Jordan LaForge and Tank Connections, L.L.C. 25-3081
Related: [-]
Att: 1 105 pgs Main Document
Att: 2 2 pgs General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil