South Carolina District Court
Judge:David C Norton
Referred: Kaymani D West
Case #: 2:23-cv-03811
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:Aug 03, 2023
Terminated:Jan 27, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 30, 2024 3:43 AM EST
Defendant
Charleston, City of
Represented By
Bob J Conley
Cleveland And Conley
contact info
Defendant
Tyrone Lawrence
Represented By
Bob J Conley
Cleveland And Conley
contact info
Defendant
Wesley Morgan
Represented By
Bob J Conley
Cleveland And Conley
contact info
Defendant
Stacia Townsend
Represented By
Bob J Conley
Cleveland And Conley
contact info
Plaintiff
Adrienne Smalls
1020 Little John Drive Apt. 108
Charleston, SC 29407


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
65 65 appeal Record to 4CCA - Initial Electronic Record Wed 04/02 11:22 AM
ASSEMBLED INITIAL ELECTRONIC RECORD TRANSMITTED TO FOURTH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS re61 Notice of Appeal, Electronic record successfully transmitted. (hcor, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
63 63 misc Document Mailed Tue 04/01 8:48 AM
***DOCUMENT MAILED62 Transmittal Sheet for Notice of Appeal to USCA, placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Adrienne Smalls 1020 Little John Drive Apt. 108 Charleston, SC 29407 (hcor, )
Related: [-]
62 62 appeal Transmittal Sheet for Notice of Appeal to USCA Tue 04/01 8:47 AM
Transmittal Sheet for Notice of Appeal to USCA re61 Notice of Appeal, The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (hcor, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
61 61 appeal Notice of Appeal Tue 04/01 8:44 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to58 Order on Report and Recommendation, Order on Motion to Dismiss,59 Judgment by Adrienne Smalls. - The Docketing Statement form, Transcript Order form and CJA 24 form may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov (hcor, )
Related: [-]