Original Case: 2:23-cv-03811

Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cv.pr-01330
Typecivil private / private
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Case Filed:Apr 02, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 03, 2025 5:11 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
TYRONE LAWRENCE
Represented By
Bob J. Conley
CLEVELAND & CONLEY, LLC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
WESLEY MORGAN
Represented By
Bob J. Conley
CLEVELAND & CONLEY, LLC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
STACIA TOWNSEND
Represented By
Bob J. Conley
CLEVELAND & CONLEY, LLC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
CITY OF CHARLESTON
Represented By
Bob J. Conley
CLEVELAND & CONLEY, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
ADRIENNE SMALLS
Represented By
Adrienne Smalls
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/03/2025 4:19 AM EDT
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
1 1 1 pgs Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:23-cv-03811-DCN. Case manager: RachelPhillips. [1001746638] 25-1330 RP [Entered: 04/02/2025 09:05 AM]
Related: [-]
2 2 12 pgs INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Adrienne Smalls. [1001746642] Informal Opening Brief due 04/28/2025. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. 25-1330 RP [Entered: 04/02/2025 09:07 AM]
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs RECORD requested from Clerk of Court [1001746644]. Due: 04/16/2025. 25-1330 RP [Entered: 04/02/2025 09:09 AM]
Related: [-]