Oklahoma Northern District Court
Judge:Gustavo A Gelpi, Jr
Referred: Jodi F Jayne
Case #: 4:23-cv-00345
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Aug 11, 2023
Terminated:Jan 23, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 07, 2024 4:30 AM CST
Defendant
TC Transcontinental Tulsa
Represented By
Justin Patrick Grose
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart Pc (okc)
contact info
Plaintiff
Tanisha Sanders
5835 S 78TH E AVE
TULSA, OK 74145


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, February 21, 2025
47 47 appeal Appeal Number Information from Circuit Court Fri 02/21 4:53 PM
APPEAL NUMBER INFORMATION from Circuit Court assigning Case Number 25-5022 (#44) Related [+] (atn, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-] 44 Notice of Appeal to Circuit Court
46 46 misc Notice of Docket Entry Modification Fri 02/21 2:59 PM
NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: Incorrect PDF attached; Correction: Replaced with correct PDF Related [+] (With attachments) (atn, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-] 45 Preliminary Record Sent
45 45 appeal Preliminary Record Sent Fri 02/21 2:32 PM
PRELIMINARY RECORD Sent to Circuit Court Related [+] (With attachments) (atn, Dpty Clk) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/21/2025 with corrected PDF) (atn, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-] 44 Notice of Appeal to Circuit Court
44 44 appeal Notice of Appeal to Circuit Court Fri 02/21 2:14 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to Circuit Court Related [+] by Tanisha Sanders (atn, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-] 41 Judgment, Entering Judgment,40 Order, Ruling on Motion for Summary Judgment
utility Remark Fri 02/21 2:15 PM
***Remark: Mailed appeal forms to Tanisha Sanders 5835 S 78TH E AVE TULSA, OK 74145 Related [+] (atn, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-] 44 Notice of Appeal to Circuit Court
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
43 43 misc Brief Wed 02/05 3:54 PM
BRIEF Related [+] by TC Transcontinental Tulsa (With attachments) (Grose, Justin)
Related: [-] 42 Bill of Costs
42 42 misc Bill of Costs Wed 02/05 3:40 PM
BILL OF COSTS by TC Transcontinental Tulsa (With attachments) (Grose, Justin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
41 41 order 03 - Judgment Judgment Entered Thu 01/23 12:59 PM
JUDGMENT by Judge Gustavo A Gelpi, Jr , entering judgment in favor of Defendant against Plaintiff (terminates case) (crp, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
40 40 order 01 - Order Ruling on Motion for Summary Judgment Thu 01/23 12:58 PM
ORDER by Judge Gustavo A Gelpi, Jr ; granting32 Motion for Summary Judgment (crp, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
utility Case - Terminate Civil/Miscellaneous Case Fri 01/24 9:51 AM
***Civil Case Terminated (see document number41 ) (atn, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
order 02 - Minute Order Deadlines - Strike/Terminate Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) Documents - Link to Document(s) Tue 11/19 3:28 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gustavo A Gelpi, Jr the remaining unexpired deadlines in the Amended Scheduling Order (Dkt. # 28), including the 12/18/24 pretrial conference and the 1/6/25 jury trial are STRICKEN, to be reset, if necessary, pending ruling on the pending motion for summary judgment (Dkt. # 32) , striking/terminating deadline(s)/Hearing(s) Related [+] (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (crp, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-] 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment ,28 Scheduling Order,,,, Setting/Resetting Scheduling Order Date(s),,,,,,,
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
misc Proposed Pretrial Order Wed 11/13 8:44 AM
PROPOSED PRETRIAL ORDER by TC Transcontinental Tulsa (atn, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
order 02 - Minute Order Case - Reassigned Case - Number Changed Tue 11/05 3:50 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , reassigning case to Judge Gustavo A Gelpi, Jr, Judge Claire V Eagan no longer assigned to case, changing case number to 23-cv-345-GAG-JFJ (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (crp, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
37 37 misc Disclosures - Pretrial per FRCP 26(a)(3) Mon 11/04 5:15 PM
PRETRIAL DISCLOSURES by TC Transcontinental Tulsa (Grose, Justin)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
36 36 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 09/27 4:32 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion Related [+] by TC Transcontinental Tulsa ; (Grose, Justin)
Related: [-] 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment
Friday, September 20, 2024
34 34 motion Extension of Time to Reply to Motion Response Fri 09/20 3:26 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to Motion Response Related [+] by TC Transcontinental Tulsa (Grose, Justin)
Related: [-] 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment
order 02 - Minute Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) Documents - Link to Document(s) Ruling on Motion for Extension of Time to Reply to Motion Response Fri 09/20 5:44 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - Defendant's motion 34 is granted as requested, and its reply is due 9/27/2024. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Replies due by 9/27/2024); granting34 Motion for Extension of Time to Reply to Motion Response Related [+] (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
Related: [-] 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment ,34 MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to Motion Response
Monday, September 09, 2024
33 33 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 09/09 9:10 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion Related [+] by Tanisha Sanders ; (dla, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-] 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
32 32 motion Summary Judgment Tue 08/20 6:16 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by TC Transcontinental Tulsa (With attachments) (Grose, Justin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
order 02 - Minute Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Scheduling Order Date(s) Documents - Link to Document(s) Ruling on Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) Tue 08/13 9:55 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - Defendant's motion 30 is granted. The scheduling order 28 is modified ONLY in that the Dispositive Motion deadline is extended to 8/20/2024 as requested. All other scheduling order 28 deadlines remain unchanged. ; setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Dispositive Motions due by 8/20/2024); granting30 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) Related [+] (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
Related: [-] 28 Scheduling Order,,,, Setting/Resetting Scheduling Order Date(s),,,,,,,30 MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) re Dispositive Motions
Monday, August 12, 2024
30 30 motion Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) Mon 08/12 3:16 PM
MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) re Dispositive Motions by TC Transcontinental Tulsa (Grose, Justin)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
29 29 order 14 - Settlement Conference Report Fri 05/17 4:32 PM
SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE REPORT by Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman (litigation was not settled) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
28 28 order 05 - Scheduling Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Scheduling Order Date(s) Documents - Link to Document(s) Mon 05/13 9:09 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan (AMENDED) Extending unexpired deadlines. , setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): Motions in Limine due 9/30/2024; ( Discovery due by 7/9/2024, Dispositive Motions due by 8/13/2024, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/12/2024, Pretrial Conference set for 12/18/2024 at 09:30 AM before Judge Claire V Eagan, Jury Trial set for 1/6/2025 at 09:15 AM before Judge Claire V Eagan) Related [+] (RGG, Chambers)
Related: [-] 27 Minute Order,,,,, Striking/Terminating Deadline(s)/Hearing(s),,,,,,,,,, Ruling on Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s),,,, 25 Minute Order,,, Setting/Resetting Deadline(s)/Hearing(s),,, Ruling on Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Settlement Deadline(s)/Conference,,
order 02 - Minute Order Deadlines - Strike/Terminate Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) Documents - Link to Document(s) Ruling on Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) Mon 05/13 8:47 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of discovery cutoff (Dkt. # 26) is granted, but will necessitate entry of an amended scheduling order extending all unexpired deadlines by 60 days. The previously set scheduling order dates, including the October 24, 2024 pretrial conference and the November 4, 2024 jury trial, are stricken. An amended scheduling order resetting unexpired deadlines will be entered forthwith. The parties shall note that the May 17, 2024 settlement conference REMAINS AS PREVIOUSLY SET (see Dkt. # 25). ; striking/terminating deadline(s)/Hearing(s); granting26 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) Related [+] (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
Related: [-] 22 Scheduling Order,,,, Setting/Resetting Scheduling Order Date(s),,,,,,, 25 Minute Order,,, Setting/Resetting Deadline(s)/Hearing(s),,, Ruling on Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Settlement Deadline(s)/Conference,,26 Unopposed MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time of the Discovery Deadline
Friday, May 10, 2024
26 26 motion Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) Fri 05/10 3:26 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time of the Discovery Deadline Related [+] by TC Transcontinental Tulsa (Grose, Justin)
Related: [-] 22 Scheduling Order,,,, Setting/Resetting Scheduling Order Date(s),,,,,,,
Monday, April 22, 2024
order 02 - Minute Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) Ruling on Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Settlement Deadline(s)/Conference Mon 04/22 5:06 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman The Settlement Conference set for 4/26/2024 at 1:30 p.m. is continued to 5/17/2024 at 1:30 p.m. The Defendant's Settlement Conference Statements are due by 5/10/2024. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Settlement Conference set for 5/17/2024 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman); granting23 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Settlement Deadline(s)/Conference Related [+] (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-] 23 Second MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Settlement Deadline(s)/Conference
Friday, February 23, 2024
22 22 order 05 - Scheduling Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Scheduling Order Date(s) Documents - Link to Document(s) Fri 02/23 11:31 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan (AMENDED) Extending unexpired deadlines. , setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): (Motions in Limine due 7/29/2024) ( Discovery due by 5/10/2024, Dispositive Motions due by 6/14/2024, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/16/2024, Pretrial Conference set for 10/22/2024 at 09:30 AM before Judge Claire V Eagan, Jury Trial set for 11/4/2024 at 09:15 AM before Judge Claire V Eagan) Related [+] (RGG, Chambers)
Related: [-] 19 Order,, Setting/Resetting Deadline(s)/Hearing(s),, Ruling on Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Settlement Deadline(s)/Conference, 21 Minute Order,,,,, Striking/Terminating Deadline(s)/Hearing(s),,,,,,,,,, Ruling on Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s),,,,
20 20 motion Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) Fri 02/23 9:49 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) Related [+] by TC Transcontinental Tulsa (Grose, Justin)
Related: [-] 15 Scheduling Order,, Setting/Resetting Scheduling Order Date(s),
order 02 - Minute Order Deadlines - Strike/Terminate Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) Documents - Link to Document(s) Ruling on Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) Fri 02/23 11:07 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - The unopposed motion for extension of scheduling order deadlines (Dkt. # 20) is granted. However, the requested deadlines will be accommodated generally, and may not be specific to the dates as requested. The previously set scheduling order dates, including the July 22, 2024 pretrial conference and the September 3, 2023 jury trial, are stricken. An amended scheduling order resetting unexpired deadlines will be entered forthwith. The parties shall note that the April 26, 2024 settlement conference REMAINS AS PREVIOUSLY SET (see Dkt. # 19). ; striking/terminating deadline(s)/Hearing(s); granting20 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) Related [+] (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
Related: [-] 19 Order,, Setting/Resetting Deadline(s)/Hearing(s),, Ruling on Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Settlement Deadline(s)/Conference, 17 Minute Order,,, Setting/Resetting Scheduling Order Date(s),,,,,15 Scheduling Order,, Setting/Resetting Scheduling Order Date(s),20 Unopposed MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s)
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
19 19 order 01 - Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) Ruling on Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Settlement Deadline(s)/Conference Wed 02/14 10:08 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman Rescheduling Settlement Conference ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Settlement Conference set for 4/26/2024 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman); granting18 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Settlement Deadline(s)/Conference Related [+] (dlg, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-] 18 Unopposed MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Settlement Deadline(s)/Conference
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
18 18 motion Accelerate/Extend/Reset Settlement Deadline(s)/Conference Tue 02/13 3:54 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Settlement Deadline(s)/Conference by TC Transcontinental Tulsa (Grose, Justin)
Related: [-]
utility Documents - Refer Motion(s) Tue 02/13 4:37 PM
***Motion(s) Referred to Magistrate Judge Huntsman Related [+] (dla, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-] 18 Unopposed MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Settlement Deadline(s)/Conference
Thursday, February 08, 2024
order 02 - Minute Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Scheduling Order Date(s) Documents - Link to Document(s) Thu 02/08 4:06 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - Due to a modification of this district's jury trial schedule, the jury trial currently set for August 19, 2024 is STRICKEN and RESET to September 3, 2024 at 9:15 a.m. The pretrial conference set for July 22, 2024, and all other scheduling order deadlines, remain as previously scheduled. , setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Jury Trial set for 9/3/2024 at 09:15 AM before Judge Claire V Eagan) Related [+] (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
Related: [-] 15 Scheduling Order,, Setting/Resetting Scheduling Order Date(s),
Friday, January 12, 2024
16 16 order 13 - Settlement Conference Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) Fri 01/12 3:32 PM
SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman , setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Settlement Conference set for 2/20/2024 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
15 15 order 05 - Scheduling Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Scheduling Order Date(s) Tue 11/07 12:43 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan (INITIAL) , setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): (Motions in Limine due 5/28/2024) ( Discovery due by 3/6/2024, Dispositive Motions due by 4/10/2024, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/28/2024, Pretrial Conference set for 7/22/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Claire V Eagan, Jury Trial set for 8/19/2024 at 09:15 AM before Judge Claire V Eagan) (RGG, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
14 14 misc Joint Status Report per LCvR16-1(b)(1) Mon 11/06 3:00 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by TC Transcontinental Tulsa (Grose, Justin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
order 02 - Minute Order Directing - Party(ies) to File Disclosure Statement Tue 10/10 9:23 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing TC Transcontinental Tulsa to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (blc, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
12 12 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) Fri 10/06 2:48 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Transcontinental Holding Corp., Other Affiliate CPG Finance, Inc. for TC Transcontinental Tulsa) by TC Transcontinental Tulsa (Grose, Justin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2023
11 11 order 01 - Order Directing - Parties to File Joint Status Report Thu 10/05 4:48 PM
ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 11/6/2023) (RGG, Chambers)
Related: [-]
10 10 respoth Answer Thu 10/05 3:18 PM
ANSWER Related [+] by TC Transcontinental Tulsa (Grose, Justin)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
9 9 notice Appearance - Attorney Thu 10/05 3:17 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Justin Patrick Grose on behalf of TC Transcontinental Tulsa [Note: Attorney Justin Patrick Grose added to party TC Transcontinental Tulsa(pty:dft).] (Grose, Justin)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 09/15 1:59 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed re: TC Transcontinental Tulsa Related [+] (dla, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, September 08, 2023
7 7 service Summons Issued Fri 09/08 1:12 PM
SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to TC Transcontinental Tulsa (lmt, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 31, 2023
6 6 order 01 - Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) Directing - Court Clerk to Take Action Directing - Service of Process Documents - Link to Document(s) Ruling on Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis Thu 08/31 12:03 PM
ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Dkt. # 2) is granted. Within thirty (30) days of the entry of this Order, or by October 2, 2023, plaintiff shall submit one completed summons, one completed U.S. Marshal Service form (form USM-285), and one copy of the complaint for service on the defendant named in the complaint. The Clerk of Court shall send plaintiff one blank summons and one blank USM-285 form for plaintiff's use in complying with this Order. Plaintiff's address is set forth in the complaint (Dkt. # 1). Upon receipt of the summons and USM-285 form, the U.S. Marshal is directed to perfect service upon the defendant as follows: a copy of the summons and complaint shall be sent by registered or certified mail to the defendant and the return of service forms are to reflect that service was proper. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 10/2/2023); directing court clerk to take action; Directing Service of Process; granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis Related [+] (RGG, Chambers)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
utility Remark Thu 08/31 1:24 PM
***Remark: One blank summons and one blank USM-285 form mailed to TANISHA SANDERS 5835 S 78TH EAST AVE TULSA OK 74145 Related [+] (dla, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-] 6 Order,,,,,, Setting/Resetting Deadline(s)/Hearing(s),,,,,, Directing Court Clerk to Take Action,,,,,, Directing Service of Process,,,,,,,,,,,, Ruling on Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis,,,,,
Tuesday, August 15, 2023
5 5 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) Tue 08/15 8:34 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tanisha Sanders (blc, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 14, 2023
utility Remark Mon 08/14 8:03 AM
***Remark: Tanisha Sanders email address tanishasanders317@gmail.com added per Consent filed at dkt # 3 . (srt, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
order 02 - Minute Order Directing - Party(ies) to File Disclosure Statement Mon 08/14 9:32 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Tanisha Sanders to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 11, 2023
3 3 misc Consent to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing Fri 08/11 2:34 PM
CONSENT to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing by Tanisha Sanders (lmt, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed in Forma Pauperis Fri 08/11 2:24 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Tanisha Sanders (lmt, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/11 1:59 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Tanisha Sanders (lmt, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]