Original Case: 4:23-cv-00345

Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cv-05022
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Feb 21, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 26, 2025 1:17 AM MST
Defendant - Appellee
TC TRANSCONTINENTAL TULSA
Represented By
Justin P. Grose
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
TANISHA SANDERS
Represented By
Tanisha Sanders
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/26/2025 1:17 AM MST
Friday, February 21, 2025
[11160475] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 02/21/2025 Notice of appearance due on 03/24/2025 for Tanisha Sanders. Notice of appearance and Disclosure statement due on 03/07/2025 for TC Transcontinental Tulsa. 25-5022
Related: [-]
Att: 1 14 pgs Preliminary Record
Att: 2 2 pgs Case Opening Pro Civil/Habeas