Genesis Global Capital, LLC v. Digital Currency Group, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-10063
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-10063
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Sean H Lane |
Case #: | 1:23-ap-01168 |
Nature of Suit | 11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property |
Case Filed: | Sep 06, 2023 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Digital Currency Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Genesis Global Capital, LLC
250 Park Avenue South
New York, NY 10003 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Monday, March 04, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Mon 03/04 3:54 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing and Rescheduling of the Pretrial Conference on the Complaint Against Digital Currency Group, Inc. filed by Luke A Barefoot on behalf of Genesis Global Capital, LLC. with hearing to be held on 4/16/2024 at 11:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (SHL) (Barefoot, Luke) |
|
Monday, February 05, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Mon 02/05 7:34 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on the Complaint Against Digital Currency Group, Inc. filed by Luke A Barefoot on behalf of Genesis Global Capital, LLC. with hearing to be held on 3/6/2024 at 11:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (SHL) (Barefoot, Luke) |
|
Monday, January 29, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Affidavit of Service
Mon 01/29 5:49 PM
Affidavit of Service of Liz Santodomingo Regarding Statement of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors with Respect to the Partial Repayment Agreement between the Debtors and the DCG Parties filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC.(Malo, David) |
|
Wednesday, January 17, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Affidavit of Service
Wed 01/17 5:01 PM
Affidavit of Service Regarding DCG Entities' Statement Regarding Notices and Statements Filed by the Debtors, the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, and the Ad Hoc Group with Respect to the Partial Repayment Agreement Between the Debtors and DCG Entities Filed by Jeffrey D. Saferstein on behalf of Digital Currency Group, Inc.. (Saferstein, Jeffrey) |
|
Monday, January 15, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
ans
Statement
Mon 01/15 6:16 PM
Statement / DCG Entities' Statement Regarding Notices and Statements Filed by the Debtors, the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, and the Ad Hoc Group with Respect to the Partial Repayment Agreement Between the Debtors and DCG Entities filed by Jeffrey D. Saferstein on behalf of Digital Currency Group, Inc.. (Saferstein, Jeffrey) |
|
Monday, January 08, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
ans
Statement
Mon 01/08 8:32 PM
Statement of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors with Respect to the Partial Repayment Agreement Between the Debtors and the DCG Parties filed by Philip Abelson on behalf of Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors. (Abelson, Philip) |
|
24 | 24
answer
Statement
Mon 01/08 7:42 PM
Statement /Notice of Transfer of PRA Collateral and Receipt of Payments from Digital Currency Group, Inc. and DCG International Investments, Ltd. in Connection with Obligations Subject to Turnover Actions filed by Sean A. O'Neal on behalf of Genesis Global Capital, LLC. (O'Neal, Sean) |
|
23 | 23
answer
Statement
Mon 01/08 10:14 AM
Statement / Notice of Disputed Payments in Connection with Amended Partial Repayment Agreement Between Debtors and Digital Currency Group filed by Brian Rosen on behalf of Ad Hoc Group of Genesis Lenders. (Rosen, Brian) |
|
Friday, December 29, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Affidavit of Service
Fri 12/29 8:15 PM
Affidavit of Service of Nathan Chien Regarding Amended Agenda for Hearing to be Held on December 13, 2023, at 2:00 p.m. (Prevailing Eastern Time) [Case No. 23-10063 Docket No. 1041] filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC.(Steele, Benjamin) |
|
Thursday, December 28, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Transcript
Thu 12/28 9:48 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 12/21/2023 At 2:12 PM RE: Debtor's Motion For Entry Of (I) Consent Judgment Against The DCG Parties And (II) Order Authorizing, To The Extent Necessary, GGC To Take Actions In Furtherance Of The Partial Repayment Agreement Pursuant To Sections 105(A) And 363(B) Of The Bankruptcy Code, Or, In The Alternative, Bankruptcy Rule 9019(A). Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 3/27/2024. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Legal Solutions.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.) . Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 1/4/2024. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 1/18/2024. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 1/29/2024. Transcript access will be restricted through 3/27/2024. (Ramos, Jonathan) |
|
Friday, December 22, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Affidavit of Service
Fri 12/22 6:11 PM
Affidavit of Service of Nathan Chien Regarding Amended Agenda for Hearing to be Held November 30, 2023, at 11:00 a.m. (Prevailing Eastern Time) [Case No. 23-10063 Docket No. 1001] filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC.(Malo, David) |
|
19 | 19
order
~Generic~ Order
Fri 12/22 10:51 AM
Order Signed On 12/22/2023, Authorizing GGC To Take Actions In Furtherance Of The Partial Repayment Agreement With The DCG Parties (Ebanks, Liza) |
|
18 | 18
order
Judgment
Fri 12/22 10:06 AM
Stipulation Order And Judgment signed on 12/22/2023 Regarding Liability Of DCG Under Master Lending Agreement. (Cappiello, Karen) |
|
Tuesday, December 19, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Affidavit of Service
Tue 12/19 12:49 PM
Affidavit of Service of Nicholas Vass Regarding Adversary Complaint [Case No: 23-01203 Docket No. 1], Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Case No: 23-01203 Docket No. 2], Notice of Hearing on Debtors Motion for Entry of (I) Consent Judgment Against the DCG Parties and (II) Order Authorizing, to the Extent Necessary, GGC to Take Actions in Furtherance of the Partial Repayment Agreement Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 363(b) of the Bankruptcy Code, or, in the Alternative, Bankruptcy Rule 9019(a) [Case No: 23-01168 Docket No. 9], Notice of Debtors Motion to Shorten Notice Period and Schedule a Hearing With Respect to Debtors Motion for Entry of (I) Consent Judgment Against the DCG Parties and (II) Order Authorizing, to the Extent Necessary, GGC to Take Actions in Furtherance of the Partial Repayment Agreement Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 363(b) of the Bankruptcy Code, or, in the Alternative, Bankruptcy Rule 9019(a) [Case No: 23-01168 Docket No. 10], Notice of Hearing on Debtors Motion for Entry of (I) Consent Judgment Against the DCG Parties and (II) Order Authorizing, to the Extent Necessary, GGC to Take Actions in Furtherance of the Partial Repayment Agreement Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 363(b) of the Bankruptcy Code, or, in the Alternative, Bankruptcy Rule 9019(a) [Case No: 23-01169 Docket No. 11], Notice of Debtors Motion to Shorten Notice Period and Schedule a Hearing With Respect to Debtors Motion for Entry of (I) Consent Judgment Against the DCG Parties and (II) Order Authorizing, to the Extent Necessary, GGC to Take Actions in Furtherance of the Partial Repayment Agreement Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 363(b) of the Bankruptcy Code, or, in the Alternative, Bankruptcy Rule 9019(a) [Case No: 23-01169 Docket No. 12], and Adversary Complaint [Case No: 23-10063 Docket No. 968] filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC.(Malo, David) |
|
Tuesday, December 12, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
ans
Statement
Tue 12/12 7:13 PM
Statement /Notice of Perfection of Security Interest in Collateral to Secure Obligations Subject to Turnover Actions filed by Sean A. O'Neal on behalf of Genesis Global Capital, LLC. (O'Neal, Sean) |
|
Friday, December 08, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Fri 12/08 5:52 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Debtors' Motion for Entry of (I) Consent Judgment Against the DCG Parties and (II) Order Authorizing, to the Extent Necessary, GGC to Take Actions in Furtherance of the Partial Repayment Agreement Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 363(b) of the Bankruptcy Code, or, in the Alternative, Bankruptcy Rule 9019(a) filed by Sean A. O'Neal on behalf of Genesis Global Capital, LLC. with hearing to be held on 12/21/2023 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom (SHL) (O'Neal, Sean) |
|
Thursday, December 07, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
ans
Statement
Thu 12/07 6:04 PM
Statement / Notice of Receipt of Payment from Digital Currency Group, Inc. and DCG International Investments Ltd. in Connection with Obligations Subject to Turnover Actions filed by Sean A. O'Neal on behalf of Genesis Global Capital, LLC. (O'Neal, Sean) |
|
13 | 13
answer
Statement
Thu 12/07 3:56 PM
Statement and Reservation of Rights of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors with respect to the Debtors' Motion for Entry of (I) Consent Judgment Against the DCG Parties and (II) Order Authorizing, to the Extent Necessary, GGC to Take Actions in Furtherance of the Partial Repayment Agreement Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 363(b) of the Bankruptcy Code, or, in the Alternative, Bankruptcy Rule 9019(a) filed by Philip Abelson on behalf of Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors. (Abelson, Philip) |
|
Wednesday, December 06, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Affidavit of Service
Wed 12/06 7:50 AM
Affidavit of Service of Victor Wong Regarding Debtors Motion for Entry of (I) Consent Judgment Against the DCG Parties and (II) Order Authorizing, to the Extent Necessary, GGC to Take Actions in Furtherance of the Partial Repayment Agreement Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 363(b) of the Bankruptcy Code, Or, in the Alternative, Bankruptcy Rule 9019(a) and Debtors Motion to Shorten Notice Period and Schedule a Hearing with Respect to Debtors Motion for Entry of (I) Consent Judgment Against the DCG Parties and (II) Order Authorizing, to the Extent Necessary, GGC to Take Actions in Furtherance of the Partial Repayment Agreement Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 363(b) of the Bankruptcy Code, or, in the Alternative, Bankruptcy Rule 9019(a) filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC.(Steele, Benjamin) |
|
Thursday, November 30, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
ans
Statement
Thu 11/30 7:03 PM
Statement /Notice of Receipt of Payment From Digital Currency Group, Inc. and DCG International Investments Ltd. in Connection With Obligations Subject to Turnover Actions filed by Sean A. O'Neal on behalf of Genesis Global Capital, LLC. (O'Neal, Sean) |
|
Tuesday, November 28, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Motion, Shorten Time
Tue 11/28 2:04 PM
Motion to Shorten Time / Debtors' Motion to Shorten Notice Period and Schedule a Hearing with Respect to Debtors' Motion for Entry of of (I) Consent Judgment Against the DCG Parties and (II) Order Authorizing, to the Extent Necessary, GGC to Take Actions in Furtherance of the Partial Repayment Agreement Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 363(b) of the Bankruptcy Code, or, in the Alternative, Bankruptcy Rule 9019(a) filed by Sean A. O'Neal on behalf of Genesis Global Capital, LLC. (O'Neal, Sean) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Motion, Authorize
Tue 11/28 1:58 PM
Motion to Authorize / Debtors' Motion for Entry of (I) Consent Judgment Against the DCG Parties and (II) Order Authorizing, to the Extent Necessary, GGC to Take Actions in Furtherance of the Partial Repayment Agreement Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 363(b) of the Bankruptcy Code, or, in the Alternative, Bankruptcy Rule 9019(a) filed by Sean A. O'Neal on behalf of Genesis Global Capital, LLC with hearing to be held on 12/13/2023 at 02:00 PM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (SHL) Responses due by 12/6/2023,. (O'Neal, Sean) |
|
Friday, October 20, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Fri 10/20 7:13 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on the Complaint Against Digital Currency Group, Inc. filed by Luke A Barefoot on behalf of Genesis Global Capital, LLC. with hearing to be held on 11/7/2023 at 02:00 PM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (SHL) (Barefoot, Luke) |
|
7 | 7
ans
Statement
Fri 10/20 4:58 PM
Statement / Notice of Receipt of Payment from Digital Currency Group, Inc. and DCG International Investments Ltd. in Connection With Obligations Subject to Turnover Actions filed by Sean A. O'Neal on behalf of Genesis Global Capital, LLC. (O'Neal, Sean) |
|
Tuesday, October 03, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
ans
Statement
Tue 10/03 5:43 PM
Statement /Notice of Receipt of Payment from Digital Currency Group, Inc. and DCG International Investments Ltd. in Connection With Obligations Subject to Turnover Actions filed by Sean A. O'Neal on behalf of Genesis Global Capital, LLC. (O'Neal, Sean) |
|
Wednesday, September 13, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
ans
Statement
Wed 09/13 2:35 PM
Statement / Notice of Receipt of Payment by Digital Currency Group, Inc. and DCG International Investments Ltd. in Connection with Obligations Subject to Turnover Action filed by Sean A. O'Neal on behalf of Genesis Global Capital, LLC. (O'Neal, Sean) |
|
Tuesday, September 12, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
ans
Statement
Tue 09/12 4:46 PM
Statement /Notice of Voluntary Stay of Prosecution of Complaints Against Digital Currency Group, Inc. and DCG International Investments Ltd. filed by Sean A. O'Neal on behalf of Genesis Global Capital, LLC. (O'Neal, Sean) |
|
Friday, September 08, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Affidavit of Service
Fri 09/08 6:00 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by Sean A. O'Neal on behalf of Genesis Global Capital, LLC. (O'Neal, Sean) |
|
Thursday, September 07, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Thu 09/07 6:41 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/24/2023 at 11:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (SHL), Answer due by 10/10/2023, (Porter, Minnie) |
|
Wednesday, September 06, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
11
pgs
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Wed 09/06 1:16 PM
Adversary case 23-01168 Complaint against Digital Currency Group, Inc. (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)) Filed by Sean A. O'Neal on behalf of Genesis Global Capital, LLC. (O'Neal, Sean) |
|
Att: 1 26 pgs Exhibit 1 | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Exhibit 2 | ||
Att: 3 2 pgs Exhibit 3 | ||
Att: 4 2 pgs Exhibit 4 | ||
Att: 5 2 pgs Exhibit 5 | ||
Att: 6 2 pgs Exhibit 6 | ||
Att: 7 2 pgs Exhibit 7 | ||
Att: 8 4 pgs Exhibit 8 | ||
Att: 9 5 pgs Exhibit 9 | ||
Att: 10 4 pgs Exhibit 10 | ||
Att: 11 3 pgs Exhibit 11 | ||
Att: 12 3 pgs Exhibit 12 | ||
Att: 13 3 pgs Exhibit 13 | ||
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Wed 09/06 1:25 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 23-01168 shl] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16339736. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |