Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Mary S Scriven
Referred: Natalie Hirt Adams
Case #: 8:23-cv-02084
Nature of Suit245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability
Cause28:1452 Removal of Claim in Civil Action Related to BK. Case
Case Filed:Sep 14, 2023
Terminated:Apr 05, 2024
Case in other court:Thirteenth Judicial Circuit, 23ca014697
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 12, 2024 4:25 AM EDT
Defendant
Buddy D. Ford
Represented By
Aram Papkin Megerian
Cole, Scott & Kissane, P.A.
contact info
Susan Peters
Zimmerman Kiser Sutcliffe
contact info
Plaintiff
Mallard Trust
Represented By
Jawdet I. Rubaii
Law Office Of Jawdet I. Rubaii
contact info
Plaintiff
Aegis Financial Advisors, Inc.
Represented By
Jawdet I. Rubaii
Law Office Of Jawdet I. Rubaii
contact info
Plaintiff
Aegis Capital Markets, Inc.
Represented By
Jawdet I. Rubaii
Law Office Of Jawdet I. Rubaii
contact info
Plaintiff
Union Street Land Trust
Represented By
Jawdet I. Rubaii
Law Office Of Jawdet I. Rubaii
contact info
Plaintiff
The 409-411 Cleveland Trust
Represented By
Jawdet I. Rubaii
Law Office Of Jawdet I. Rubaii
contact info
Plaintiff
TST Trust
Represented By
Jawdet I. Rubaii
Law Office Of Jawdet I. Rubaii
contact info
Plaintiff
Seventh Avenue Trust
Represented By
Jawdet I. Rubaii
Law Office Of Jawdet I. Rubaii
contact info
Plaintiff
Poinsettia Trust
Represented By
Jawdet I. Rubaii
Law Office Of Jawdet I. Rubaii
contact info
Plaintiff
Ola Trust
Represented By
Jawdet I. Rubaii
Law Office Of Jawdet I. Rubaii
contact info
Plaintiff
North 17th Trust
Represented By
Jawdet I. Rubaii
Law Office Of Jawdet I. Rubaii
contact info
Plaintiff
North 12th Trust
Represented By
Jawdet I. Rubaii
Law Office Of Jawdet I. Rubaii
contact info
Plaintiff
New Orleans Trust
Represented By
Jawdet I. Rubaii
Law Office Of Jawdet I. Rubaii
contact info
Plaintiff
Mulberry Trust
Represented By
Jawdet I. Rubaii
Law Office Of Jawdet I. Rubaii
contact info
Plaintiff
Magnolia Trust
Represented By
Jawdet I. Rubaii
Law Office Of Jawdet I. Rubaii
contact info
Plaintiff
Dry Creek Mortgage, LLC
Represented By
Jawdet I. Rubaii
Law Office Of Jawdet I. Rubaii
contact info
Plaintiff
Bonita Trust
Represented By
Jawdet I. Rubaii
Law Office Of Jawdet I. Rubaii
contact info
Plaintiff
Aegis Asset Trust
Represented By
Jawdet I. Rubaii
Law Office Of Jawdet I. Rubaii
contact info
Plaintiff
Aegis Asset Securitized, LLC
Represented By
Jawdet I. Rubaii
Law Office Of Jawdet I. Rubaii
contact info
Plaintiff
Aegis 13th Ave Trust
Represented By
Jawdet I. Rubaii
Law Office Of Jawdet I. Rubaii
contact info
Plaintiff
ACM Trust
Represented By
Jawdet I. Rubaii
Law Office Of Jawdet I. Rubaii
contact info
Plaintiff
1816 E. Wood Land Trust
Represented By
Jawdet I. Rubaii
Law Office Of Jawdet I. Rubaii
contact info
Plaintiff
Monier Rahall
Represented By
Jawdet I. Rubaii
Law Office Of Jawdet I. Rubaii
contact info
Plaintiff
Dry Creek Properties, LLC
Represented By
Jawdet I. Rubaii
Law Office Of Jawdet I. Rubaii
contact info
Plaintiff
Aegis Asset Management, LLC
251 Little Falls Drive
Wilmington, DE 19808
Represented By
Jawdet I. Rubaii
Law Office Of Jawdet I. Rubaii
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Thursday, September 26, 2024
24 24 appeal USCA Mandate Mon 09/30 10:46 AM
MANDATE of USCA as to20 Notice of Appeal filed by 1816 E. Wood Land Trust, Poinsettia Trust, North 12th Trust, ACM Trust, New Orleans Trust, Dry Creek Mortgage, Bonita Trust, Aegis 13th Ave Trust, Magnolia Trust, TST Trust, The 409-411 Cleveland Trust, Seventh Avenue Trust, Dry Creek Properties, LLC, North 17th Trust, Aegis Capital Markets, Inc., Mallard Trust, Union Street Land Trust, Aegis Asset Securitized, LLC, Ola Trust, Aegis Asset Management, LLC, Monier Rahall, Mulberry Trust, Aegis Financial Advisors, Inc., Aegis Asset Trust Issued as Mandate: 9/26/2024. USCA number: 24-11282 CC. (SET)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
23 23 appeal USCA opinion/order Wed 08/28 12:28 PM
OPINION of USCA: DISMISSED as to20 Notice of Appeal filed by 1816 E. Wood Land Trust, Poinsettia Trust, North 12th Trust, ACM Trust, New Orleans Trust, Dry Creek Mortgage, Bonita Trust, Aegis 13th Ave Trust, Magnolia Trust, TST Trust, The 409-411 Cleveland Trust, Seventh Avenue Trust, Dry Creek Properties, LLC, North 17th Trust, Aegis Capital Markets, Inc., Mallard Trust, Union Street Land Trust, Aegis Asset Securitized, LLC, Ola Trust, Aegis Asset Management, LLC, Monier Rahall, Mulberry Trust, Aegis Financial Advisors, Inc., Aegis Asset Trust. EOD: 8/28/2024; Mandate to issue at a later date. USCA number: 24-11282 CC. (SET)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
22 22 appeal Transcript Information Form Wed 05/08 2:39 PM
TRANSCRIPT information form filed by 1816 E. Wood Land Trust, ACM Trust, Aegis 13th Ave Trust, Aegis Asset Management, LLC, Aegis Asset Securitized, LLC, Aegis Asset Trust, Aegis Capital Markets, Inc., Aegis Financial Advisors, Inc., Bonita Trust, Dry Creek Mortgage, LLC, Dry Creek Properties, LLC, Magnolia Trust, Mallard Trust, Mulberry Trust, New Orleans Trust, North 12th Trust, North 17th Trust, Ola Trust, Poinsettia Trust, Monier Rahall, Seventh Avenue Trust, TST Trust, The 409-411 Cleveland Trust, Union Street Land Trust re20 Notice of Appeal. USCA number: 24-11282 No transcript(s) requested. (Rubaii, Jawdet)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
21 21 appeal Transmittal of initial appeal package Thu 04/25 2:09 PM
TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of copies of notice of appeal, docket sheet, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, if applicable to USCA re20 Notice of Appeal.(ELM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Copy of Docket Sheet,
Att: 2 Copy of Notice of Appeal with Attachment,
Att: 3 Copy of Order
20 20 appeal Notice of Appeal Thu 04/25 10:45 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to17 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court, Order on Motion to Remand to Bankruptcy Court by 1816 E. Wood Land Trust, ACM Trust, Aegis 13th Ave Trust, Aegis Asset Management, LLC, Aegis Asset Securitized, LLC, Aegis Asset Trust, Aegis Capital Markets, Inc., Aegis Financial Advisors, Inc., Bonita Trust, Dry Creek Mortgage, LLC, Dry Creek Properties, LLC, Magnolia Trust, Mallard Trust, Mulberry Trust, New Orleans Trust, North 12th Trust, North 17th Trust, Ola Trust, Poinsettia Trust, Monier Rahall, Seventh Avenue Trust, TST Trust, The 409-411 Cleveland Trust, Union Street Land Trust. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number AFLMDC-22022548.(Rubaii, Jawdet)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Order
Friday, April 05, 2024
19 19 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Fri 04/05 4:54 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JTM)
Related: [-]
18 18 appeal Transmittal to bankruptcy court Fri 04/05 4:41 PM
TRANSMITTAL to bankruptcy court re17 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court, Order on Motion to Remand to Bankruptcy Court Copies sent to Trustee, Bankruptcy Judge and Bankruptcy Clerk. (JTM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
17 17 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Remand to State Court Order on Motion to Remand to Bankruptcy Court Wed 04/03 12:52 PM
ORDER DENYING 7 Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand to State Court and GRANTING 10 Defendant's Motion to Remand to Bankruptcy Court. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/3/2024. (AC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
16 16 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/02 2:36 PM
NOTICE by Buddy D. Ford of Inquiry (Megerian, Aram)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
15 15 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 01/03 3:28 PM
Case Reassigned to US Magistrate Judge Natalie Hirt Adams. New case number: 8:23-cv-02084-MSS-NHA. Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate no longer assigned to the case. (SAO)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
14 14 respm Response to motion Mon 11/20 5:29 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re10 First MOTION to Remand to Bankruptcy Court and Objection filed by 1816 E. Wood Land Trust, ACM Trust, Aegis 13th Ave Trust, Aegis Asset Management, LLC, Aegis Asset Securitized, LLC, Aegis Asset Trust, Aegis Capital Markets, Inc., Aegis Financial Advisors, Inc,, Bonita Trust, Dry Creek Mortgage, LLC, Dry Creek Properties, LLC, Magnolia Trust, Mallard Trust, Mulberry Trust, New Orleans Trust, North 12th Trust, North 17th Trust, Ola Trust, Poinsettia Trust, Monier Rahall, Seventh Avenue Trust, TST Trust, The 409-411 Cleveland Trust, Union Street Land Trust.(Rubaii, Jawdet)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Order Authorizing Employment of Special Counsel,
Att: 2 Exhibit Order on Application to Employ Attorney for Trustee,
Att: 3 Exhibit Order Granting US Trustee's expedited Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 4 Exhibit Voluntary Petition for Non Individuals Filing for BK,
Att: 5 Exhibit Notice of Appearance Buddy Ford,
Att: 6 Exhibit Notice of Appearance Saliba,
Att: 7 Exhibit Rahall affidavit,
Att: 8 Exhibit Ivan affidavit
Monday, November 13, 2023
13 13 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Mon 11/13 8:21 PM
ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING 12 Plaintiffs' Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Refer Case to Bankruptcy Court. Plaintiffs shall have up to and including November 20, 2023, to file a response. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 11/13/2023. (KDS)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Mon 11/13 1:03 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to10 First MOTION to Remand to Bankruptcy Court by All Plaintiffs. (Rubaii, Jawdet)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
11 11 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Tue 10/31 4:55 PM
ENDORSED ORDER DENYING 9 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Case Management Report; and STAYING Case Management Report deadline pending resolution of Plaintiffs' motion to remand. The Parties shall file a Case Management Report, if warranted, thirty (30) days after the Court enters an Order on Plaintiffs' motion to remand. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 10/31/2023. (KDS)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
10 10 motion Remand to Bankruptcy Court Mon 10/30 12:23 PM
First MOTION to Remand to Bankruptcy Court by Buddy D. Ford. (Megerian, Aram)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Tue 10/24 5:16 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Case Management Report by All Plaintiffs. (Rubaii, Jawdet)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
8 8 respm Response to motion Fri 10/06 1:55 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Buddy D. Ford.(Megerian, Aram)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit
Friday, September 22, 2023
7 7 motion Remand to State Court Fri 09/22 3:29 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court by All Plaintiffs.(Rubaii, Jawdet)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit List of case law
Thursday, September 21, 2023
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 09/21 6:14 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Buddy D. Ford.(Megerian, Aram)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
5 5 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Fri 09/15 3:13 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Aram Papkin Megerian on behalf of Buddy D. Ford. Lead Counsel: Aram P. Megerian. (Megerian, Aram)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Fri 09/15 12:45 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Jawdet I. Rubaii & Aram Papkin Megerian of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (HAI)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Fri 09/15 8:36 AM
NOTICE to Counsel of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BCH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 09/14 4:48 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate. New case number: 8:23-cv-2084-MSS-UAM. (ARC)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 09/14 4:11 PM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Thirteenth Judicial Circuit, case number 23-CA-014697 filed in State Court on 8/22/2023. Filing fee $402, receipt number AFLMDC-21252779 filed by Buddy D. Ford.(Megerian, Aram)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 State Court COMPLAINT,
Att: 4 State Court Docket Sheet,
Att: 5 State Court Other Documents,
Att: 6 State Court Other Documents,
Att: 7 State Court Other Documents,
Att: 8 State Court Other Documents