Original Case: 8:23-cv-02084

Eleventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-prici-11282
Typeprivate civil / federal question
Nature of Suit245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2024
Last checked: Friday Apr 26, 2024 4:34 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
BUDDY DWIGHT FORD
Represented By
Susan Peters
Zimmerman Kiser & Sutcliffe, PA
contact info
Aram Papkin Megerian
Cole Scott & Kissane, PA
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
NEW ORLEANS TRUST
Represented By
Jawdet I. Rubaii
Jawdet I. Rubaii, PA
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
DRY CREEK MORTGAGE, LLC
Represented By
Jawdet I. Rubaii
Jawdet I. Rubaii, PA
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
AEGIS ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC
Represented By
Jawdet I. Rubaii
Jawdet I. Rubaii, PA
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
MONIER RAHALL
Represented By
Jawdet I. Rubaii
Jawdet I. Rubaii, PA
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
UNION STREET LAND TRUST
Represented By
Jawdet I. Rubaii
Jawdet I. Rubaii, PA
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
TST TRUST
Represented By
Jawdet I. Rubaii
Jawdet I. Rubaii, PA
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
THE 409-411 CLEVELAND TRUST
Represented By
Jawdet I. Rubaii
Jawdet I. Rubaii, PA
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
SEVENTH AVENUE TRUST
Represented By
Jawdet I. Rubaii
Jawdet I. Rubaii, PA
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
POINSETTIA TRUST
Represented By
Jawdet I. Rubaii
Jawdet I. Rubaii, PA
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
OLA TRUST
Represented By
Jawdet I. Rubaii
Jawdet I. Rubaii, PA
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
NORTH 17TH TRUST
Represented By
Jawdet I. Rubaii
Jawdet I. Rubaii, PA
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
NORTH 12TH TRUST
Represented By
Jawdet I. Rubaii
Jawdet I. Rubaii, PA
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
1816 E. WOOD LAND TRUST
Represented By
Jawdet I. Rubaii
Jawdet I. Rubaii, PA
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
MULBERRY TRUST
Represented By
Jawdet I. Rubaii
Jawdet I. Rubaii, PA
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
MALLARD TRUST
Represented By
Jawdet I. Rubaii
Jawdet I. Rubaii, PA
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
MAGNOLIA TRUST
Represented By
Jawdet I. Rubaii
Jawdet I. Rubaii, PA
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
DRY CREEK PROPERTIES, LLC
Represented By
Jawdet I. Rubaii
Jawdet I. Rubaii, PA
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
BONITA TRUST
Represented By
Jawdet I. Rubaii
Jawdet I. Rubaii, PA
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
AEGIS FINANCIAL ADVISORS, INC.
Represented By
Jawdet I. Rubaii
Jawdet I. Rubaii, PA
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
AEGIS CAPITAL MARKETS, INC.
Represented By
Jawdet I. Rubaii
Jawdet I. Rubaii, PA
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
AEGIS ASSET TRUST
Represented By
Jawdet I. Rubaii
Jawdet I. Rubaii, PA
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
AEGIS ASSET SECURITIZED, LLC
Represented By
Jawdet I. Rubaii
Jawdet I. Rubaii, PA
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
AEGIS 13TH AVE TRUST
Represented By
Jawdet I. Rubaii
Jawdet I. Rubaii, PA
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
ACM TRUST
Represented By
Jawdet I. Rubaii
Jawdet I. Rubaii, PA
contact info

GPO Aug 28 2024
Opinion issued by court as to Appellants 1816 E. Wood Land Trust, ACM Trust, Aegis 13th Ave Trust, Aegis Asset Management, LLC, Aegis Asset Securitized, LLC, Aegis Asset Trust, Aegis Capital Markets, Inc., Aegis Financial Advisors, Inc., Bonita Trust, Dry Creek Mortgage, LLC, Dry Creek Properties, LLC, Magnolia Trust, Mallard Trust, Mulberry Trust, New Orleans Trust, North 12th Trust, North 17th Trust, Ola Trust, Poinsettia Trust, Monier Rahall, Seventh Avenue Trust, TST Trust, The 409-411 Cleveland Trust and Union Street Land Trust. Decision: Dismissed. Opinion type: Non-Published. Opinion method: Per Curiam. Motion to dismiss appeal for lack of subject matter jurisdiction filed by Appellee Buddy Dwight Ford is GRANTED. [10205039-2]. (See 08/28/2024 opinion)(RSR/ELB/BL) The opinion is also available through the Court's Opinions page at this link http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/opinions.

Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 4:34 AM EDT
Thursday, April 25, 2024
CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants 1816 E. Wood Land Trust, et al., on 04/25/2024. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/13/2024 as to Appellant 1816 E. Wood Land Trust. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/23/2024 as to Appellee Buddy Dwight Ford
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs CIVIL - Notice of Docketing
Att: 2 5 pgs Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal
Att: 3 3 pgs 24-11282 DC Order doc#17