Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-12744

Colorado Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kimberley H Tyson
Case #: 1:23-ap-01215
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:Sep 26, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Brett Morton
21451 Euclid Ave.
Centennial, CO 80016
Represented By
Brett Morton
contact info
Plaintiff
MountainSky Landscaping, LLC
Represented By
David Wadsworth
Wadsworth Garber Warner Conrardy, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 80 minutes ago
Thursday, November 07, 2024
20 20 misc Status Report Thu 11/07 1:32 PM
Status Report Filed by David Wadsworth on behalf of MountainSky Landscaping, LLC Related [+]. (Wadsworth, David)
Related: [-] 18 Order to File
Sunday, October 27, 2024
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 10/27 10:16 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/27/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Order to File
Friday, October 25, 2024
18 18 order File Fri 10/25 9:36 AM
Order For Status Report Related [+]. Document due by 11/7/2024 (td)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Saturday, April 20, 2024
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 04/20 10:14 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/20/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Thursday, April 18, 2024
16 16 order Withdraw As Attorney Thu 04/18 1:31 PM
Order Granting Motion To Withdraw As Attorney Samuel McMechan Terminated. Related [+]. (rxc)
Related: [-] 14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Monday, April 01, 2024
15 15 motion Withdraw As Attorney Mon 04/01 2:55 PM
This entry was docketed in error with the incorrect event. PDF is the Proposed Order for motion at docket 14. Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record Filed by Samuel McMechan on behalf of Brett Morton. (McMechan, Samuel) Modified on 4/2/2024 (rxc)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Withdraw As Attorney Mon 04/01 2:52 PM
Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record Filed by Samuel McMechan on behalf of Brett Morton. (McMechan, Samuel) Additional attachment(s) Proposed Order added on 4/2/2024 (rxc). Modified on 4/2/2024 (rxc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
13 13 misc 26 (a) Disclosure Wed 12/20 12:10 PM
F.R.C.P. 26 (a) Disclosure Filed by Samuel McMechan on behalf of Brett Morton Related [+]. (McMechan, Samuel)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,3 Summons Issued (auto),5 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim
Monday, December 18, 2023
12 12 utility Notification of Electronic Filing Error (Public Entry) Mon 12/18 8:40 AM
Notice of Electronic Filing Error. Samuel H. McMechan is hereby notified of the following error in docket number 11: Incorrect event . E-Filer shall refile the pleading using the 26 (a) Disclosure event found under the miscellaneous category in the adversary event section. Failure to timely correct the error may result in the party not receiving the requested relief. (Text Only Entry) Related [+]. (rxc)
Related: [-] 11 Notice
Friday, December 15, 2023
11 11 notice Notice Fri 12/15 2:56 PM
Notice Re: Initial Disclosures Brett Morton. Filed by Samuel McMechan on behalf of Brett Morton. (McMechan, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
10 10 order 7016 Scheduling Order (Adversary) Wed 12/13 12:42 PM
7016 Scheduling Order RE: Related [+]. Discovery due by 5/24/2024 for1 , Dispositive Motion due 6/14/2024 for1 , (rxc)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
9 9 misc 7026 (f) Report Tue 12/05 10:20 AM
Joint F.R.B.P. 7026 (f) Report Filed by David Wadsworth on behalf of MountainSky Landscaping, LLC Related [+]. (Wadsworth, David)
Related: [-] 6 Order Regarding Compliance With Rules
Friday, November 17, 2023
8 8 answer Answer to Counterclaim Fri 11/17 4:11 PM
Answer to Counterclaim Filed by David Wadsworth on behalf of MountainSky Landscaping, LLC Related [+]. (Wadsworth, David)
Related: [-] 5 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 11/01 10:17 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 11/01/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order Regarding Compliance With Rules
Monday, October 30, 2023
6 6 order Compliance With Rules Mon 10/30 3:10 PM
Order For Compliance With Rule 7026, Fed.R.Bankr.P. (Rule 26(f), Fed.R.Civ.P.) Related [+]. Rules Compliance due by 11/28/2023 for5 , (td)
Related: [-] 5 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim
Friday, October 27, 2023
5 5 answer|cmp Answer to Complaint|Counterclaim Fri 10/27 5:01 PM
Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Brett Morton against MountainSky Landscaping, LLC Filed by Samuel McMechan on behalf of Brett Morton Related [+]. (McMechan, Samuel)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Exhibit E
Att: 2 Exhibit F
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
4 4 misc Summons Service Executed (Adversary) Tue 09/26 9:22 AM
Summons Service Executed On: Brett Morton on September 26, 2023 Filed by David Wadsworth on behalf of MountainSky Landscaping, LLC. (Wadsworth, David)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Summons Issued (auto) Tue 09/26 9:07 AM
Summons Issued on Brett Morton Answer Due 10/26/2023. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Wadsworth, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Tue 09/26 9:02 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 23-01215 KHT] ) [cmp,cmpt] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A32285914. Fee amount 350.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/26 9:01 AM
Adversary case 23-01215 Complaint by MountainSky Landscaping, LLC against Brett Morton. Fee Paid. Adversary Status Deadline 12/27/2023 (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)) (Wadsworth, David)
Related: [-]