Oklahoma Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Terrence L Michael
Case #: 4:23-bk-11071
Case Filed:Sep 26, 2023
Creditor Meeting:Oct 25, 2023
Discharged:Jan 30, 2024
Terminated:Mar 21, 2024
Discharge Objection Deadline:Dec 26, 2023

Debtor
Todd Douglas Briggs
1109 S Kalanchoe Ave
Broken Arrow, OK 74012-0978
Represented By
Greggory T. Colpitts
The Colpitts Law Firm
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Scott P. Kirtley
Riggs, Abney, Neal, Turpen, Orbison 502 West 6th Street
Tulsa, OK 74119
Represented By
Scott P. Kirtley
Riggs, Abney, Neal, Turpen, Orbison
contact info
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
PO Box 3044
Tulsa, OK 74101
Represented By
Mary Kindelt
Doj-Ust
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/14/2024 6:58 PM CDT
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
1 1 Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount Due: $338. Fee Amount Paid: $338 Filed by Greggory T. Colpitts on behalf of Todd Douglas Briggs. (Colpitts, Greggory)
Related: [-]
2 2 Chapter 7 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income Form 122A-1 . Filed by Greggory T. Colpitts on behalf of Todd Douglas Briggs. (Colpitts, Greggory)
Related: [-]
3 3 Payment Advices Certification . Filed by Greggory T. Colpitts on behalf of Todd Douglas Briggs. (Colpitts, Greggory)
Related: [-]
4 4 Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Greggory T. Colpitts on behalf of Todd Douglas Briggs. (Colpitts, Greggory)
Related: [-]
5 5 Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 23-11071 ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A4658741. Fee amount 338.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
6 6 Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice. Filed by Brandon Craig Bickle on behalf of First Pryority Bank. (Bickle, Brandon)
Related: [-]