Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:23-bk-11071

Oklahoma Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Terrence L Michael
Case #: 4:23-ap-01029
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Dec 20, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Todd Douglas Briggs
1109 S. Kalanchoe Ave
Broken Arrow, OK 74012
Represented By
Todd Douglas Briggs
contact info
Plaintiff
Ken & Rachel Morton
11336 S Adams St
Jenks, OK 74037
Represented By
Brian L. Mitchell
Mitchell Bonds PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Nic & Jamie Mehas
12702 S 4th St
Jenks, OK 74037
Represented By
Brian L. Mitchell
Mitchell Bonds PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Melissa & Shea Boman
4880 W 77th St S
Tulsa, OK 74132
Represented By
Brian L. Mitchell
Mitchell Bonds PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Frank & Heidi Puglia
42022 E 133rd St S
Bixby, OK 74008
Represented By
Brian L. Mitchell
Mitchell Bonds PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Mike & Siera Strawser
13600 S Mingo Dr
Bixby, OK 74008
Represented By
Brian L. Mitchell
Mitchell Bonds PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Dylan & MacKayla Baggett
9191 9th St
Beggs, OK 74421
Represented By
Brian L. Mitchell
Mitchell Bonds PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Rex & Patricia Mann
2605 Falls Bend Dr
Sapulpa, OK 74066
Represented By
Brian L. Mitchell
Mitchell Bonds PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Gabriel Beltran
12444 S 66th E Ave
BIXBY, OK 74008
Represented By
Brian L. Mitchell
Mitchell Bonds PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Monday, March 31, 2025
48 48 appeal Transmittal of Notice of Appeal and Related Documents Mon 03/31 2:25 PM
Transmittal of Notice of Appeal and Related Documents Related [+]. (NC)
Related: [-] 25 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election
47 47 appeal Record on Appeal Mon 03/31 2:24 PM
Record on Appeal to District Court Related [+]. (NC)
Related: [-] 25 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election
Friday, March 14, 2025
46 46 appeal Appellant Designation Fri 03/14 11:42 AM
Appellant Designation of Contents for Inclusion in Record On Appeal Amended Filed by Plaintiffs Dylan & MacKayla Baggett, Gabriel Beltran, Melissa & Shea Boman, Rex & Patricia Mann, Nic & Jamie Mehas, Ken & Rachel Morton, Frank & Heidi Puglia, Mike & Siera Strawser Related [+]. (Mitchell, Brian)
Related: [-] 25 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election,28 Transmittal of Notice of Appeal and Related Documents, 31 Initial Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election, 32 District Court Case Appeal Number., 40 Transcript Request Received,43 Appellant Designation
Thursday, March 13, 2025
45 45 court Transcript Order Form Completed Thu 03/13 10:55 PM
Transcript order form completed for transcript ordered by Brian L. Mitchell, Esquire. Transcript consists of 19 pages at $5.85 per page. Fees in the amount of $111.15 were received on 3/7/2025 by Dipti Patel Related [+]. (Patel, Dipti)
Related: [-] 38 Transcript Order Form of proceedings held before on 02/18/2025. (RE: related document(s) 22 Minute Order) Filed by Plaintiffs Dylan & MacKayla Baggett, Gabriel Beltran, Melissa & Shea Boman, Rex & Patricia Mann, Nic & Jamie Mehas, Ken & Rachel Morton, Frank & Heidi Puglia, Mike & Siera Strawser (RE: related document(s) 22 Minute Order).,42 Transcript Order Form of proceedings held before on 02/18/2025. (RE: related document(s) 22 Minute Order) Reason for filing amendment or correction: Wrong form . Request for EXPEDITED Hearing. Filed by Brian L. Mitchell on behalf of Dylan & MacKayla Baggett, Gabriel Beltran, Melissa & Shea Boman, Rex & Patricia Mann, Nic & Jamie Mehas, Ken & Rachel Morton, Frank & Heidi Puglia, Mike & Siera Strawser.
44 44 court Transcript Thu 03/13 10:53 PM
Certified Transcript filed of proceedings held before The Honorable Chief Judge Paul R. Thomas on 2/18/2025. Pursuant to the Court's Transcript Policy and Procedure dated 08/22/2008, posted on our website at www.oknb.uscourts.gov, parties have (7) days to file a Statement of Intent to Redact (Bankruptcy/Miscellaneous) to have personal identifiers redacted from the public copy of the transcript. Related [+]. Statement of Intent to Redact due by 03/20/2025 . List of Items for Redaction from Transcript due by 04/3/2025 . Transcript access will be restricted through 06/13/2025. The transcript may be viewed at the Office of the Clerk. For information on how to contact the transcriber contact the Office of the Clerk. (Patel, Dipti)
Related: [-] 38 Transcript Order Form of proceedings held before on 02/18/2025. (RE: related document(s) 22 Minute Order) Filed by Plaintiffs Dylan & MacKayla Baggett, Gabriel Beltran, Melissa & Shea Boman, Rex & Patricia Mann, Nic & Jamie Mehas, Ken & Rachel Morton, Frank & Heidi Puglia, Mike & Siera Strawser (RE: related document(s) 22 Minute Order)., 40 Transcript request received by Clerk's Office, estimate provided to Brian L. Mitchell on 3/6/2025, and audio uploaded to Dipti Patel at Liberty Transcripts on 3/6/2025. (RE: related document(s)38 Transcript Order Form). (NC),42 Transcript Order Form of proceedings held before on 02/18/2025. (RE: related document(s) 22 Minute Order) Reason for filing amendment or correction: Wrong form . Request for EXPEDITED Hearing. Filed by Brian L. Mitchell on behalf of Dylan & MacKayla Baggett, Gabriel Beltran, Melissa & Shea Boman, Rex & Patricia Mann, Nic & Jamie Mehas, Ken & Rachel Morton, Frank & Heidi Puglia, Mike & Siera Strawser.
43 43 appeal Appellant Designation Thu 03/13 1:24 PM
Appellant Designation of Contents for Inclusion in Record On Appeal Filed by Plaintiffs Dylan & MacKayla Baggett, Gabriel Beltran, Melissa & Shea Boman, Rex & Patricia Mann, Nic & Jamie Mehas, Ken & Rachel Morton, Frank & Heidi Puglia, Mike & Siera Strawser Related [+]. (Mitchell, Brian)
Related: [-] 25 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election,28 Transmittal of Notice of Appeal and Related Documents, 31 Initial Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election, 32 District Court Case Appeal Number., 40 Transcript Request Received
Friday, March 07, 2025
42 42 misc Transcript Order Form Fri 03/07 10:41 AM
Transcript Order Form of proceedings held before on 02/18/2025. Related [+] Reason for filing amendment or correction: Wrong form . Request for EXPEDITED Hearing. Filed by Brian L. Mitchell on behalf of Dylan & MacKayla Baggett, Gabriel Beltran, Melissa & Shea Boman, Rex & Patricia Mann, Nic & Jamie Mehas, Ken & Rachel Morton, Frank & Heidi Puglia, Mike & Siera Strawser. (Mitchell, Brian)
Related: [-] 22 Minute Order
Thursday, March 06, 2025
41 41 misc Received Request for Transcript Thu 03/06 2:42 PM
Received Request for Transcript from Clerk's office on 3/6/2025. Estimated Date of Delivery of Transcript 3/13/2025 Related [+]. (Patel, Dipti)
Related: [-] 40 Transcript request received by Clerk's Office, estimate provided to Brian L. Mitchell on 3/6/2025, and audio uploaded to Dipti Patel at Liberty Transcripts on 3/6/2025. (RE: related document(s)38 Transcript Order Form). (NC)
40 40 appeal Transcript Request Received Thu 03/06 12:45 PM
Transcript request received by Clerk's Office, estimate provided to Brian L. Mitchell on 3/6/2025, and audio uploaded to Dipti Patel at Liberty Transcripts on 3/6/2025 . Related [+]. (NC)
Related: [-] 38 Transcript Order Form
39 39 court Memorandum of Document Deficiency Thu 03/06 12:05 PM
Memorandum of Document Deficiency to Brian Mitchell, regarding document number38 . PDF is in editable format. Local Transcript Order Form not used. Resubmit the local Transcript Order Form document in non-editable format. Correction due by 3/7/2025. Related [+]. (NC)
Related: [-] 38 Transcript Order Form
38 38 misc Transcript Order Form Thu 03/06 9:55 AM
Transcript Order Form of proceedings held before on 02/18/2025. Related [+] Filed by Plaintiffs Dylan & MacKayla Baggett, Gabriel Beltran, Melissa & Shea Boman, Rex & Patricia Mann, Nic & Jamie Mehas, Ken & Rachel Morton, Frank & Heidi Puglia, Mike & Siera Strawser. (Mitchell, Brian)
Related: [-] 22 Minute Order 22 Minute Order
Monday, March 03, 2025
37 37 utility Corrective Entry Mon 03/03 9:57 AM
Corrective Entry: duplicate entries Related [+]. (NC)
Related: [-] 34 Initial Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election, 35 Initial Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election, 36 Initial Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election
36 36 appeal Initial Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election Mon 03/03 5:30 AM
(ENTERED IN ERROR) Initial Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election to the District Court. Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8003(d)(1), this certifies that the Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election filed in this case on 02/27/2025, was transmitted via the notice transmission facilities of the case management and electronic case filing system of the Bankruptcy Court to the District Court. Related [+]. (ADI)(Modified by NC)
Related: [-] 25 Main Document
Sunday, March 02, 2025
35 35 appeal Initial Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election Sun 03/02 5:30 AM
(ENTERED IN ERROR) Initial Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election to the District Court. Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8003(d)(1), this certifies that the Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election filed in this case on 02/27/2025, was transmitted via the notice transmission facilities of the case management and electronic case filing system of the Bankruptcy Court to the District Court. Related [+]. (ADI)(Modified by NC)
Related: [-] 25 Main Document
Saturday, March 01, 2025
34 34 appeal Initial Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election Sat 03/01 5:30 AM
(ENTERED IN ERROR) Initial Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election to the District Court. Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8003(d)(1), this certifies that the Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election filed in this case on 02/27/2025, was transmitted via the notice transmission facilities of the case management and electronic case filing system of the Bankruptcy Court to the District Court. Related [+]. (ADI)(Modified by NC)
Related: [-] 25 Main Document
Friday, February 28, 2025
33 33 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 02/28 12:05 PM
Civil Cover Sheet Certificate of Service attached. Filed by Brian L. Mitchell on behalf of Dylan & MacKayla Baggett, Gabriel Beltran, Melissa & Shea Boman, Rex & Patricia Mann, Nic & Jamie Mehas, Ken & Rachel Morton, Frank & Heidi Puglia, Mike & Siera Strawser. (Mitchell, Brian)
Related: [-]
32 32 appeal District Court Appeal Number Fri 02/28 10:06 AM
Notice from District Court : District Court Appeal Number:25-cv-00095-SEH-CDL Related [+]. (NC)
Related: [-] 25 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election
31 31 appeal Initial Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election Fri 02/28 5:30 AM
Initial Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election to the District Court. Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8003(d)(1), this certifies that the Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election filed in this case on 02/27/2025, was transmitted via the notice transmission facilities of the case management and electronic case filing system of the Bankruptcy Court to the District Court. Related [+]. (ADI)
Related: [-] 25 Main Document
Thursday, February 27, 2025
30 30 misc Certificate of Service Thu 02/27 4:16 PM
Certificate of Service via email to Office of the US Trustee at USTPRegion20.TU.ECF@usdoj.gov Related [+]. (NC)
Related: [-] 24 Order on Motion To Reconsider,25 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election, 29 Notice is Given to the Appellant
29 29 tclerk Notice is Given to the Appellant Thu 02/27 4:11 PM
NOTICE IS GIVEN TO THE APPELLANT that pursuant to Rule 8009 the Appellant shall, within 14 days of 2/27/2025, the date the appeal was filed, file with the Clerk of the United States Bankruptcy Court the following: (1) a Designation of the Items to be Included in the Record on Appeal and serve a copy upon the appellee; (2) A Statement of Issues to be Presented and serve a copy upon the appellee; and (3) A written request for the Transcript. Within 14 days after the service of the Appellants Statement, the Appellee may file and serve on the Appellant, a Designation of Additional Items to be Included in the Record on Appeal. Please review the Bankruptcy Code and Rules for further instructions. Related [+]. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official Form for this entry. No document is attached. (NC)
Related: [-] 25
28 28 appeal Transmittal of Notice of Appeal and Related Documents Thu 02/27 3:50 PM
Transmittal of Notice of Appeal and Related Documents Related [+]. (NC)
Related: [-] 24 Order on Motion To Reconsider,25 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election
27 27 court 1 Day Incomplete Filing Thu 02/27 3:16 PM
NOTICE OF INCOMPLETE FILING to Brian L. Mitchell: District Court Civil Cover Sheet - Form JS-44 not submitted. Correction due by 2/28/2025 Related [+]. (NC)
Related: [-] 25 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election
26 26 crditcrd none Thu 02/27 11:31 AM
Receipt of Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election([LINK 23-01029 M] ) [appeal,ntcaplel] ( 298.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A4806839. Fee amount 298.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#25
25 25 appeal Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election Thu 02/27 11:23 AM
Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election to District Court. Fee Amount $298 Filed by Plaintiffs Dylan & MacKayla Baggett, Gabriel Beltran, Melissa & Shea Boman, Rex & Patricia Mann, Nic & Jamie Mehas, Ken & Rachel Morton, Frank & Heidi Puglia, Mike & Siera Strawser Related [+]. (Mitchell, Brian)
Related: [-] 24 Order on Motion To Reconsider
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
24 24 order Reconsider Tue 02/18 12:19 PM
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO RECONSIDER THE COURTS JANUARY 2, 2025, ORDER OF DISMISSAL. THIS MATTER comes before the Court pursuant to the Plaintiffs Motion to Reconsider the Courts January 2, 2025, Order of Dismissal filed at Docket No.18 . A hearing was held to consider the motion on February 18, 2025. For the reasons stated on the record in open court, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Plaintiffs Motion to Reconsider the Courts January 2, 2025, Order of Dismissal filed at Docket No.18 be, and the same hereby is, denied. BY THE COURT: Chief Judge Terrence L. Michael. (text-only order) This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached. Related [+] (SAB)
Related: [-] 18 Motion to Reconsider
23 23 jmmin11 Hearing held; motion denied Tue 02/18 10:43 AM
MINUTE: Hearing held and concluded on 2/18/2025. Motion to Reconsider is denied. Separate order to be entered. Related [+]. (SAB)
Related: [-] 18 Motion to Reconsider,19 Objection, 22 Minute Order
22 22 TextOrderM Minute Order Tue 02/18 8:14 AM
Minute Order: Upon consideration of the Court's docket, the hearing scheduled for February 18, 2025 at 10:00 AM, will be heard via Telephonic DIAL-IN. Parties desiring to participate in this hearing shall DIAL-IN to the hearing using the toll-free dial-in number of 650-479-3207 and the Access Code of 23074889611 . BY THE COURT: Chief Judge Terrence L. Michael Related [+]. This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached. (text-only order). (SAB)
Related: [-] 18 Motion to Reconsider,19 Objection, 21 Minute Order
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
21 21 TextOrderM Minute Order Wed 02/12 8:47 AM
Minute Order: Upon consideration of the Court's docket, the hearing scheduled for February 12, 2025 is hereby continued to February 18, 2025 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom # 1, 1st Floor, 224 South Boulder Avenue, Tulsa OK 74103. BY THE COURT: Chief Judge Terrence L. Michael Related [+]. This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached. (text-only order). (SAB)
Related: [-] 18 Motion to Reconsider,19 Objection,20 Order Setting Hearing
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
20 20 order Setting Hearing Tue 01/28 3:55 PM
Order Setting Hearing on Motion to Reconsider Related [+]. (SAB)
Related: [-] 18 Motion to Reconsider,19 Objection
Sunday, January 19, 2025
19 19 answer Objection Sun 01/19 6:59 PM
Objection to18 Motion to Reconsider . Filed by Greggory T. Colpitts on behalf of Todd Douglas Briggs (Colpitts, Greggory)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
18 18 motion Reconsider Tue 01/07 1:21 PM
Motion to Reconsider Related [+] . Certificate of Service attached. Filed by Brian L. Mitchell on behalf of Dylan & MacKayla Baggett, Gabriel Beltran, Melissa & Shea Boman, Rex & Patricia Mann, Nic & Jamie Mehas, Ken & Rachel Morton, Frank & Heidi Puglia, Mike & Siera Strawser.. (Mitchell, Brian)
Related: [-] 17 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding 17 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
Thursday, January 02, 2025
17 17 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Thu 01/02 12:01 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. THIS MATTER comes before the Court pursuant to the Scheduling Order entered July 12, 2024, at Docket No.15 . The Scheduling Order contained the following: The parties will submit a Pre-Trial Order, initiated by the Plaintiff on or before December 20, 2024. If a Pre-Trial Order or a motion for extension of time to submit the same is not timely submitted, this adversary proceeding may be dismissed. No proposed pre-trial order or motion to extend the time to submit a pre-trial order has been submitted. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that this adversary proceeding be, and the same hereby is, dismissed. BY THE COURT: Chief Judge Terrence L. Michael. Related [+]. This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached. (SAB)
Related: [-] 15 Scheduling Order
Friday, July 12, 2024
16 16 TextOrderM Minute Order Fri 07/12 2:22 PM
Minute Order: Upon consideration of the Scheduling Order entered at Docket No. 15, the Telephonic Scheduling Conference scheduled for July 17, 2024, is stricken as moot. BY THE COURT: Chief Judge Terrence L. Michael Related [+]. This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached. (text-only order). (AB)
Related: [-] 14 Telephonic Scheduling Conference Order,15 Scheduling Order
15 15 order Scheduling Order Fri 07/12 2:21 PM
Scheduling Order. Pretrial Order due by 12/20/2024. (AB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
14 14 atom Telephonic Scheduling Order Tue 06/11 9:41 AM
Telephonic Scheduling Conference: A Telephonic DIAL-IN Scheduling Conference shall be held on 7/17/2024 at 10:00 AM. Parties desiring to participate in this hearing shall DIAL-IN to the hearing using the toll-free dial-in number of 888-684-8852 and the Access Code of 9298395 . Further instructions governing this hearing are contained in the document attached hereto and are incorporated herein by this reference. BY THE COURT: Chief Judge Terrence L. Michael. (AB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Pretrial Order Form
Monday, May 20, 2024
13 13 2 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Mon 05/20 5:01 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by Greggory T. Colpitts on behalf of Todd Douglas Briggs. (Colpitts, Greggory)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, May 03, 2024
12 12 tclerk Clerk's Extension of Time to Respond to Adversary Complaint Fri 05/03 8:50 AM
Clerk's Extension of Time to Respond to Adversary Complaint. It appears from the record that the Defendant Todd Douglas Briggs filed the Application for Extension of Time within the time period permitted to serve an answer or responsive pleading to a complaint. Therefore, the Defendant Todd Douglas Briggs is granted an additional 14 days, or until 5/20/2024, in which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Adversary Complaint as authorized by Local Rule 7012-1. Related [+]. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official Form for this entry. No document is attached. (JT)
Related: [-] 11
Thursday, May 02, 2024
11 11 motion Extension of Time to Respond. Thu 05/02 6:39 PM
Request for Extension of Time to Respond . Filed by Greggory T. Colpitts on behalf of Todd Douglas Briggs. (Colpitts, Greggory)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
10 10 court Certificate of Service of Summons Mon 04/08 4:24 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons. Served on Todd Douglas Briggs Defendant . Certificate of Service attached. Filed by Brian L. Mitchell on behalf of Dylan & MacKayla Baggett ; Gabriel Beltran ; Melissa & Shea Boman ; Rex & Patricia Mann ; Nic & Jamie Mehas ; Ken & Rachel Morton ; Frank & Heidi Puglia ; Mike & Siera Strawser. (Mitchell, Brian)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
9 9 court Summons Issued Fri 04/05 2:03 PM
Summons Issued for Service by Plaintiff upon Defendant(s) Todd Douglas Briggs Date Issued 4/5/2024, Answer Due 5/6/2024 . (NC)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Generic Order Fri 04/05 1:41 PM
ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT BY THE CLERK. On 04/01/2024, a Request for Entry of Default by the Clerk was filed by Brian L. Mitchell, counsel for Plaintiffs herein, at Docket No.7 . The Request appears to seek an entry of default by the Clerk. On 12/21/2023, the Clerk of this Court issued a summons in this proceeding, Docket No.3 . On 02/07/2024, Mitchell, on behalf of Plaintiffs, filed a Certificate of Service indicating a copy of the summons and complaint had been served on Todd Douglas Briggs, Debtor/Defendant herein, and his counsel Gregory T. Colpitts on February 08, 2024, at Docket No.4 . Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7004(e) requires that "If service is by any authorized form of mail, the summons and complaint shall be deposited in the mail within 7 days after the summons is issued. If a summons is not timely delivered or mailed, another summons shall be issued and served." This rule requires service on both the Debtor and the attorney for Debtor, pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7004(g), within 7 days after the summons is issued. Otherwise, the summons is considered stale, and must be reissued. The Court finds that the Request is procedurally deficient for failure to properly serve the Debtor and his attorney pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7004. In addition, Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m), made applicable to this adversary proceeding by Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7004(a)(1), provides a time limit of 90 days after a complaint is filed for service of a defendant. Pursuant to Rule 4(m), the Court will exercise its discretion to extend the time for service on Defendant and his counsel. The Clerk of this Court shall issue a new summons in this case. If proper service is not effectuated within the time allowed under Rule 7004(e), the Plaintiffs may apply to the Clerk for an alias summons. Plaintiffs are given until May 2, 2024, to effectuate proper service on Defendant, and to certify service of same to this Court. If no certificate of service has been filed by that time, which indicates service of a summons and the complaint on Defendant, this case may be dismissed pursuant to Rule 4(m), or it may be set for further hearing. Accordingly, IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the Request for Entry of Default by the Clerk filed by Brian L. Mitchell, counsel for Plaintiffs herein, be, and the same hereby is, denied without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall immediately issue a new summons in this adversary proceeding, and further summonses upon request of the Plaintiffs if they fail to make service within the 7-day deadline of Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7004(e). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the time under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) to serve a summons and the complaint, and certify same to the Court, is enlarged to May 2, 2024. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that failure to file a certificate of service within the allotted time will result in dismissal of this action without prejudice against the Defendant. BY THE COURT: Chief Judge Terrence L. Michael. Related [+]. This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE to Todd Douglas Briggs, 1109 S. Kalanchoe Ave, Broken Arrow, OK 74012 (AB)
Related: [-] 7 Request for Entry of Default
Monday, April 01, 2024
7 7 misc Request for Entry of Default by the Clerk Mon 04/01 3:49 PM
Plaintiff's Request for Entry of Default by the Clerk Certificate of Service attached. Filed by Brian L. Mitchell on behalf of Dylan & MacKayla Baggett, Gabriel Beltran, Melissa & Shea Boman, Rex & Patricia Mann, Nic & Jamie Mehas, Ken & Rachel Morton, Frank & Heidi Puglia, Mike & Siera Strawser. (Mitchell, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
6 6 answer Response Mon 04/01 3:30 PM
Response to Related [+] of March 26, 2024 . Certificate of Service attached. Filed by Brian L. Mitchell on behalf of Dylan & MacKayla Baggett, Gabriel Beltran, Melissa & Shea Boman, Rex & Patricia Mann, Nic & Jamie Mehas, Ken & Rachel Morton, Frank & Heidi Puglia, Mike & Siera Strawser (Mitchell, Brian)
Related: [-] 5 Order to Show Cause
Att: 1 Exhibit
Att: 2 Exhibit
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
5 5 order Show Cause Tue 03/26 1:20 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ADVERSARY PROCEEDING SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED. THIS MATTER comes before the Court on its own motion. Upon review of the file, the Court notes that a complaint was filed on December 20, 2023, a summons was issued on December 21, 2023, and a Certificate of Service of Summons was filed on February 7, 2024. There has been no additional activity in the adversary proceeding. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that on or before April 9, 2024 , counsel for plaintiff shall show cause in writing as to why this adversary proceeding should not be dismissed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that in the absence of such a filing on or before April 9, 2024 , this adversary proceeding shall be dismissed. BY THE COURT: Chief Judge Terrence L. Michael. This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached. (AB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
4 4 court Certificate of Service of Summons Wed 02/07 10:46 AM
Certificate of Service of Summons. Served on Todd Douglas Briggs February 8, 2024 . Filed by Brian L. Mitchell on behalf of Dylan & MacKayla Baggett ; Gabriel Beltran ; Melissa & Shea Boman ; Rex & Patricia Mann ; Nic & Jamie Mehas ; Ken & Rachel Morton ; Frank & Heidi Puglia ; Mike & Siera Strawser. (Mitchell, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
3 3 court Summons Issued Thu 12/21 8:57 AM
Summons Issued for Service by Plaintiffs upon Defendant(s) Todd Douglas Briggs Date Issued 12/21/2023, Answer Due 1/22/2024 . (JT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 12/20 3:57 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 23-01029 M] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A4681615. Fee amount 350.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 12/20 3:56 PM
Complaint by Ken & Rachel Morton, Nic & Jamie Mehas, Melissa & Shea Boman, Frank & Heidi Puglia, Mike & Siera Strawser, Dylan & MacKayla Baggett, Rex & Patricia Mann, Gabriel Beltran vs. Todd Douglas Briggs. Fee Amount $350. Nature of Suit: 62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud),67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny). Filed by Brian L. Mitchell on behalf of Ken & Rachel Morton, Nic & Jamie Mehas, Melissa & Shea Boman, Frank & Heidi Puglia, Mike & Siera Strawser, Dylan & MacKayla Baggett, Rex & Patricia Mann, Gabriel Beltran. (Mitchell, Brian)
Related: [-]