Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:22-bk-51226

Ohio Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Alan M Koschik
Case #: 5:23-ap-05040
Nature of Suit21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
Case Filed:Oct 04, 2023
Terminated:Jun 11, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
United States of America
Internal Revenue Service PO Box 7346
Philadelphia, PA 19101
Represented By
United States of America
contact info
Defendant
Pennsylvania Department of Revenue
448 W. 11th Street
Erie, PA 16501
Represented By
Pennsylvania Department of Revenue
contact info
Defendant
Indiana Department of Revenue
P.O. Box 7206
Indianapolis, IN 46207
Represented By
Indiana Department of Revenue
contact info
Defendant
Maryland Department of Taxation & Assessments
301 W. Preston Street Suite 801
Baltimore, MD 21201
Represented By
Maryland Department of Taxation & Assessments
contact info
Defendant
Ohio Department of Workers' Compensation
30 W. Spring Street
Columbus, OH 43215
Represented By
Ohio Department of Workers' Compensation
contact info
Defendant
Ohio Department Of Job & Family Services
Revenue Recovery/Litigation PO Box 182404
Columbus, OH 43218
Represented By
Ohio Department Of Job & Family Services
contact info
Defendant
State Of Ohio Department of Taxation
PO Box 530 Attn: Bankruptcy Division
Columbus, OH 43216
Represented By
State Of Ohio Department of Taxation
contact info
Defendant
FZA Note Buyers LLC
1560 Sawgrass Corporate Parkway Attn: Officer, Managing or General Agent
City of Sunrise, FL 33323
Represented By
FZA Note Buyers LLC
contact info
Defendant
Amware Distribution Warehouses, M&M L.L.C.
19801 Holland Road Attn: Officer, Managing or General Agent
Brook Park, OH 44142
Represented By
Amware Distribution Warehouses, M&M L.L.C.
contact info
Defendant
Integra Capital LLC
8900 Indian Creek Parkway Suite 400
Overlook Park, KS 66210
Represented By
Integra Capital LLC
contact info
Defendant
Axis Title LLC
308 N. Locust Street
Grand Island, NE 68801
Represented By
Axis Title LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Melissa M. Macejko
PO Box 266
Cuyahoga Falls, OH 44222
Represented By
Michael J. Moran
Gibson & Moran
contact info
Trustee
Melissa M. Macejko
PO Box 266
Cuyahoga Falls, OH 44222


Docket last updated: 8 minutes ago
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
court Close Adversary Case Tue 06/11 11:33 AM
Adversary Case 5:23-ap-5040 Closed (jwand)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
27 27 BNC Notice of Order (PDF) Fri 05/31 12:13 AM
Notice of Order (PDF) w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 05/30/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 26
Monday, May 27, 2024
26 26 10 pgs order Order (PDF) Tue 05/28 8:50 AM
AGREED ORDER REGARDING CLAIMS OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, STATE OF OHIO DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION, STATE OF OHIO DEPARTMENT OF JOB & FAMILY SERVICES, AND THE STATE OF OHIO BUREAU OF WORKERS' COMPENSATION Signed on 5/27/2024 Related [+]. (jwand crt)
Related: [-] 2 Amended Complaint
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
court Hearing Held - CHAP ADI Wed 04/24 2:57 PM
Pretrial Hearing Held --reported as resolved, Agreed order forthcoming. Related [+] (mk)
Related: [-] 2 Amended Complaint filed by Melissa M. Macejko
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
court Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched No Notice - CHAP ADI Fri 03/08 11:12 AM
Pretrial held and rescheduled Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 04/24/2024 at 01:30 PM at 260 Fed Bldg Akron. (mk)
Related: [-] 2 Amended Complaint filed by Melissa M. Macejko
Friday, January 19, 2024
25 25 BNC Notice of Order (PDF) Sat 01/20 12:14 AM
Notice of Order (PDF) w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 01/19/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 24
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
24 24 3 pgs order Order (PDF) Wed 01/17 1:46 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER GRANTING DEFAULT AGAINST PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE Signed on 1/17/2024 Related [+]. (jwand crt)
Related: [-] 15 Motion for Default Judgment
court Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched No Notice - CHAP ADI Wed 01/17 3:40 PM
Pretrial Hearing held and continued -- Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 03/06/2024 at 01:30 PM at 260 Fed Bldg Akron. (mk)
Related: [-] 2 Amended Complaint filed by Melissa M. Macejko
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
23 23 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 01/16 6:12 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by United States of America. (Hall, John aty)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 31, 2023
22 22 BNC Notice of Order on Motion to Extend Time Mon 01/01 12:10 AM
Notice of Order on Motion to Extend Time w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 12/31/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 20
Saturday, December 30, 2023
21 21 BNC Notice of Order of Default Judgment Sun 12/31 12:08 AM
Notice of Order of Default Judgment w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 12/30/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18
Friday, December 29, 2023
20 20 order Extend Time Fri 12/29 3:18 PM
Order Granting Request for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint Until January 16, 2024 Related [+] Signed on 12/29/2023. (jwand crt)
Related: [-] 19 First Motion to Extend Time Filed by United States of America
19 19 motion Extend Time Fri 12/29 1:28 PM
First Motion to Extend Time Filed by United States of America Related [+] (Hall, John aty)
Related: [-] 2 Amended Complaint
Thursday, December 28, 2023
18 18 order Default Judgment Thu 12/28 1:54 PM
Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment Against Amware Distribution Warehouses, M&M LLC, Axis Title LLC, FZA Note Buyers LLC, Indiana Department of Revenue, Integra Capital LLC, Maryland Department of Taxation and Assessments Related [+] Signed on 12/28/2023. (jwand crt)
Related: [-] 15
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
17 17 misc Certificate of Service Wed 12/20 11:28 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Melissa M. Macejko Related [+]. (Moran, Michael aty)
Related: [-] 15
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
misc Request for Issuance of Alias Summons Tue 12/19 12:30 PM
Request for Issuance of Alias Summons (Moran, Michael aty)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
16 16 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 12/11 12:35 PM
Summons Service Executed on Office of the United States Attorney 12/08/2023; Attorney General of the United States 12/08/2023; Attorney General of the United States 12/08/2023 (Moran, Michael aty) Modified on 12/11/2023 (jwand)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
15 15 motion Default Judgment Mon 12/04 1:06 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Melissa M. Macejko (Moran, Michael aty)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 02, 2023
14 14 BNC Clerks Entry of Default Sun 12/03 12:09 AM
Clerks Entry of Default w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 12/02/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12
Thursday, November 30, 2023
13 13 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 11/30 2:07 PM
Summons Service Executed on Internal Revenue Service 11/30/2023; U.S. Attorneys Office 11/30/2023; Attorney General of the United States 11/30/2023 (Moran, Michael aty)
Related: [-]
12 12 court Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 11/30 10:38 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default Upon Amware Distribution Warehouses, M&M L.L.C.; Axis Title LLC; FZA Note Buyers LLC; Indiana Department of Revenue; Integra Capital LLC; Maryland Department of Taxation & Assessments; and Pennsylvania Department of Revenue. Related [+] (jwand)
Related: [-] 9 Application for Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff Melissa M. Macejko
11 11 cmp Summons Issued Thu 11/30 10:26 AM
ALIAS Summons issued on Plaintiff for service on Defendant(s) United States of America Answer due 1/2/2024. This Court has adopted a paperless procedure for issuing the summons in an adversary proceeding. The attached summons has been sealed, processed, and docketed by the Clerk. Electronic filers will only receive electronic email notice of this docket entry. No paper copy of the summons will be mailed; it must be printed from CM/ECF. Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 7004(a) and F.R.C.P. 4, it is the responsibility of the plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel to promptly serve the summons, a copy of the complaint, and, if applicable, a copy of any pre-trial or adversary case management order on defendant(s). To be timely, the summons and a copy of the complaint must be served within seven (7) days of issuance per Bankruptcy Rule 7004(e). Service of the summons is prescribed by Bankruptcy Rule 7004 and F.R.C.P. 4. If a summons is not timely served, an ''alias'' summons must be requested from the Clerk. Certification or proof of service by plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel is made by completing the Certificate of Service portion of the original summons. Attorneys should docket the summons, once served, using the Summons Service Executed event within CM/ECF. Related [+] TELEPHONIC Pre-Trial Conference set for 1/17/2024 at 01:45 PM Parties must notify Chambers at 330.252.6130(by noon of the day prior) of the number at which they can be reached.(mknot)
Related: [-] Request for Issuance of Alias Summons
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
court Hearing Held - CHAP ADI Thu 11/30 9:13 AM
Pretrial Hearing Held--Agreed order with Ohio dept of Tx, et al to come; a new pretrial will be set with new summons; default to seven defendants; clerk to enter application for default; then counsel to file motion for default; counsel to reserve on U.S. Related [+] (mk)
Related: [-] 2 Amended Complaint filed by Melissa M. Macejko
court Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched No Notice - CHAP ADI Thu 11/30 10:23 AM
Based on request for alias summons filed, the pretrial is reset as to USA/IRS Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 01/17/2024 at 01:45 PM at 260 Fed Bldg Akron. (mk)
Related: [-] 2 Amended Complaint filed by Melissa M. Macejko, Request for Issuance of Alias Summons
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
misc Request for Issuance of Alias Summons Tue 11/28 1:53 PM
Request for Issuance of Alias Summons (Moran, Michael aty)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
10 10 answer Affidavit Wed 11/08 10:37 AM
Affidavit in Support of Application for Entry of Default Judgment Filed by Michael J Moran Related [+]. (Moran, Michael aty)
Related: [-] 9
9 9 misc Application for Entry of Default Wed 11/08 10:34 AM
Application for Entry of Default Filed by Melissa M. Macejko Related [+] (Moran, Michael aty)
Related: [-] 2 Amended Complaint
Thursday, October 12, 2023
8 8 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 10/12 1:04 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice for Ohio Department of Taxation and Ohio Bureau of Workers' Compensation by Joshua Ryan Vaughan Filed by Defendant Ohio Department Of Job & Family Services. (Vaughan, Joshua aty)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
7 7 BNC Notice of Order on Pre-Trial Sat 10/07 12:18 AM
Notice of Order on Pre-Trial w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 10/06/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5
Thursday, October 05, 2023
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 10/05 9:28 AM
Summons Service Executed on Amware Distribution Warehouses, M&M L.L.C. 10/5/2023; Axis Title LLC 10/5/2023; FZA Note Buyers LLC 10/5/2023; Indiana Department of Revenue 10/5/2023; Integra Capital LLC 10/5/2023; Maryland Department of Taxation & Assessments 10/5/2023; Ohio Department Of Job & Family Services 10/5/2023; Ohio Department of Workers' Compensation 10/5/2023; Pennsylvania Department of Revenue 10/5/2023; State Of Ohio Department of Taxation 10/5/2023; United States of America 10/5/2023 (Moran, Michael aty)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
5 5 order Relative to Pre-Trial (PDF) Wed 10/04 1:28 PM
Order Relative to Initial Telephonic Pre-Trial Signed on 10/4/2023 Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 11/29/2023 at 01:45 PM Parties must notify Chambers at 330.252.6130(by noon of the day prior) of the number at which they can be reached.(mknot crt)
Related: [-] 2 Amended Complaint
4 4 cmp Summons Issued Wed 10/04 1:17 PM
Summons issued on Plaintiff for service on Defendant(s) Amware Distribution Warehouses, M&M L.L.C. Answer due 11/3/2023; Axis Title LLC Answer due 11/3/2023; FZA Note Buyers LLC Answer due 11/3/2023; Indiana Department of Revenue Answer due 11/3/2023; Integra Capital LLC Answer due 11/3/2023; Maryland Department of Taxation & Assessments Answer due 11/3/2023; Ohio Department Of Job & Family Services Answer due 11/3/2023; Ohio Department of Workers' Compensation Answer due 11/3/2023; Pennsylvania Department of Revenue Answer due 11/3/2023; State Of Ohio Department of Taxation Answer due 11/3/2023; United States of America Answer due 11/3/2023. This Court has adopted a paperless procedure for issuing the summons in an adversary proceeding. The attached summons has been sealed, processed, and docketed by the Clerk. Electronic filers will only receive electronic email notice of this docket entry. No paper copy of the summons will be mailed; it must be printed from CM/ECF. Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 7004(a) and F.R.C.P. 4, it is the responsibility of the plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel to promptly serve the summons, a copy of the complaint, and, if applicable, a copy of any pre-trial or adversary case management order on defendant(s). To be timely, the summons and a copy of the complaint must be served within seven (7) days of issuance per Bankruptcy Rule 7004(e). Service of the summons is prescribed by Bankruptcy Rule 7004 and F.R.C.P. 4. If a summons is not timely served, an ''alias'' summons must be requested from the Clerk. Certification or proof of service by plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel is made by completing the Certificate of Service portion of the original summons. Attorneys should docket the summons, once served, using the Summons Service Executed event within CM/ECF. Related [+] Initial telephonic Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/29/2023 at 01:45 PM Parties must notify Chambers at 330.252.6130(by noon of the day prior) of the number at which they can be reached. (mknot)
Related: [-] 3 Hearing Set
3 3 court Hearing Set Wed 10/04 1:14 PM
INITIAL TELEPHONIC PRETRIAL Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/29/2023 at 01:45 PM Parties must notify Chambers at 330.252.6130(by noon of the day prior) of the number at which they can be reached. (mknot)
Related: [-] 2 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Melissa M. Macejko
2 2 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 10/04 9:27 AM
Amended Complaint by Michael J. Moran on behalf of Melissa M. Macejko against all defendants. Related [+]. (Moran, Michael aty)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 23-05040 Complaint by Melissa M. Macejko against United States of America, Pennsylvania Department of Revenue, Indiana Department of Revenue, Maryland Department of Taxation & Assessments, Ohio Department of Workers' Compensation, Ohio Department Of Job & Family Services, State Of Ohio Department of Taxation, FZA Note Buyers LLC, Amware Distribution Warehouses, M&M L.L.C., Integra Capital LLC, Axis Title LLC. Fee Amount $0 Nature of Suit:21 (Validity, Priority or Extent of Lien or Other Interest in Property; Rule 7001(2)) (Moran, Michael aty) filed by Plaintiff Melissa M. Macejko
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 10/04 9:15 AM
Adversary case 23-05040 Complaint by Melissa M. Macejko against United States of America, Pennsylvania Department of Revenue, Indiana Department of Revenue, Maryland Department of Taxation & Assessments, Ohio Department of Workers' Compensation, Ohio Department Of Job & Family Services, State Of Ohio Department of Taxation, FZA Note Buyers LLC, Amware Distribution Warehouses, M&M L.L.C., Integra Capital LLC, Axis Title LLC. Fee Amount $0 Nature of Suit:21 (Validity, Priority or Extent of Lien or Other Interest in Property; Rule 7001(2)) (Moran, Michael aty)
Related: [-]