Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-09308

Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Janet S Baer
Case #: 1:23-ap-00301
Nature of Suit91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
Case Filed:Oct 03, 2023
Terminated:Apr 30, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Michael W. Frerichs
Represented By
Michael W. Frerichs
contact info
Plaintiff
Ariane Holtschlag, Trustee
Represented By
Justin R. Storer
Law Office Of William J. Factor, Ltd.
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
15 15 court Close Adversary Case Tue 04/30 9:40 AM
Adversary Case 1:23-ap-301 Closed . (Batson, Nicole)
Related: [-]
14 14 court Hearing Stricken (Other) Tue 04/30 9:33 AM
The Hearing Scheduled for May 7, 2024 is Stricken Related [+]. Stipulation to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed. (Dragonetti, Alex)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, April 29, 2024
13 13 misc Stipulation to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Mon 04/29 2:41 PM
Stipulation to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Justin R. Storer on behalf of Ariane Holtschlag, Trustee. (Storer, Justin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
12 12 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Tue 03/05 4:19 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 05/07/2024 at 10:00 AM at Appear in Courtroom 615, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Baer, , , . (Dragonetti, Alex)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
11 11 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Tue 02/13 1:01 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 03/05/2024 at 10:00 AM at Appear in Courtroom 615, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Baer. (Dragonetti, Alex)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
10 10 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Tue 01/16 10:53 AM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 02/13/2024 at 10:00 AM at Appear in Courtroom 615, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Baer. (Dragonetti, Alex)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
9 9 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Tue 12/05 11:35 AM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 01/16/2024 at 10:00 AM at Appear in Courtroom 615, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Baer, , , .. Signed on 12/05/2023. (McGee, Kimberly)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, December 04, 2023
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 12/04 12:10 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by John Reding on behalf of Michael W. Frerichs. Related [+]
Related: [-] ding, John
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
7 7 order Scheduling Tue 11/07 2:45 PM
Order Scheduling Related [+]. Answer due by: 12/5/2023. Status hearing to be held on 12/5/2023 at 10:00 AM at Appear In Courtroom 615, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604 or Using Zoom- Judge Baer. Signed on 11/7/2023 (Boyd, Shante)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
6 6 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Tue 11/07 2:34 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 12/05/2023 at 10:00 AM at Appear in Courtroom 615, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Baer.. Signed on 11/07/2023. (Dragonetti, Alex)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, November 06, 2023
5 5 misc Appearance Mon 11/06 4:40 PM
Appearance Filed by John Reding on behalf of Michael W. Frerichs. Related [+]
Related: [-] ding, John
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
4 4 crditcrd none Tue 10/03 11:51 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 23-00301 ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A46997864. Fee Amount $ 350.00 (Storer, Justin) Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 10/03 11:49 AM
Summons Service Executed on Michael W. Frerichs Related [+]. (Storer, Justin)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Tue 10/03 10:55 AM
Summons Issued on Michael W. Frerichs Answer Due 11/2/2023 (Admin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 10/03 10:55 AM
Adversary case 23-00301 (91 (Declaratory judgment)): Complaint by Ariane Holtschlag, Trustee against Michael W. Frerichs. Fee Amount $350. Status hearing to be held on 11/7/2023 at 10:00 AM at Appear In Courtroom 615, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604 or Using Zoom- Judge Baer. (Storer, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A